Paul Grondal, et al v. USA, et al
Defendant: ARTHUR DICK, HANNAH RAE DICK, FRANCIS J. REYES, LEONARD WAPATO, KATHLEEN DICK, GABE MARCELLAY, STEPHEN WAPATO, MIKE PALMER, VIVIAN PIERRE, SANDRA COVINGTON, CATHERINE L. GARRISON, JEFFREY M. CONDON, JAMES ABRAHAM, ENID T. MARCHAND, FRANCIS ABRAHAM, MIKE MARCELLAY, LEONARD M. WAPATO, MAUREEN M. MARCELLAY, ANNIE WAPATO, RANDY MARCELLAY, DWANE DICK, TRAVIS E. DICK, MARLENE MARCELLAY, CATHERINE GARRISON, ENID T. WIPPEL, SONIA W. VANWOERKOM, LINDA SAINT, PAUL G. WAPATO, Jr., JUDY ZUNIE, DARLENE MARCELLAY-HYLAND, DEBORAH BACKWELL, LYDIA A. ARNEECHER, HANNAH DICK, MARY JO GARRISON, JACQUELINE L. WAPATO, GABRIEL MARCELLAY and LYNN K. BENSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: MILL BAY MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Washington non-profit corporation and PAUL GRONDAL, a Washington resident
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS and CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE COLVILLE RESERVATION
Defendant / Appellant: WAPATO HERITAGE LLC and GARY REYES
Case Number: 20-35694
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2020 Filing 20 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Meant for case 20-35357. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Gary Reyes and Wapato Heritage LLC. Date of service: 10/02/2020. [11846449] [20-35694] (Jacobowitz, Emanuel) [Entered: 10/03/2020 12:20 AM]
October 3, 2020 Filing 19 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Meant for case 20-35357. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Gary Reyes and Wapato Heritage LLC. Date of service: 10/02/2020. [11846448] [20-35694] (Jacobowitz, Emanuel) [Entered: 10/03/2020 12:05 AM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) : Appellants emergency motion for reconsideration (Docket Entry No. [ # 17 ] ) is denied. See 9th Cir. R. 27-10. The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [11840744] (RT) [Entered: 09/29/2020 11:54 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellants Paul Grondal and Mill Bay Members Association, Inc. EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [Emergency Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal by Appellants Grondal & Mill Bay Members Assoc. - Filed Under Emergency Motion - Cir. 27-3]. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11839097] [20-35694] (Harmeling, Sally) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:37 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Added Attorney(s) Anna Brady for party(s) Appellee Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, in case 20-35694. [11833185] (NAC) [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:51 PM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anna Elza Brady (Ziontz Chestnut, 2101 4th Avenue, Suite 1230, Seattle, WA 98121) for Appellee Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. Date of service: 09/22/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11833177] [20-35694] (Brady, Anna) [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:50 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) : Appellants motion to stay execution of the district courts ejectment judgment (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ] ) is denied. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11828281] (RT) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:31 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant Wapato Heritage LLC reply to response (). Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11827035] [20-35694] (Jacobowitz, Emanuel) [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:10 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellants Paul Grondal and Mill Bay Members Association, Inc. reply to response (). Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11826906] [20-35694] (Harmeling, Sally) [Entered: 09/16/2020 05:13 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellee Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825409] [20-35694] (Chestnut, Brian) [Entered: 09/15/2020 06:08 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823683] [20-35694] (Chestnut, Brian) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:13 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees USDOI, USA and Bureau of Indian Affairs reply to response (motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823612] [20-35694] (Derrig, Joseph) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:43 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Bureau of Indian Affairs, USA and USDOI response to motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823610] [20-35694] (Derrig, Joseph) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:40 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellees Bureau of Indian Affairs, USA and USDOI response to motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823607] [20-35694] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached declarations and exhibits. 9/15/2020 by TYL] (Derrig, Joseph) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:34 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11820208] (LW) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:03 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MN): On September 3, 2020, this court received appellants motion to stay the district courts judgment pending appeal. Any response to the motion is due on September 14, 2020. An optional reply in support of the motion is due September 16, 2020. [11816532] (RT) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:24 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Mill Bay Members Association, Inc. and Paul Grondal Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/03/2020. [11812658] [20-35694] (Harmeling, Sally) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:49 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/17/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11791500]. [20-35694] (AD) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:44 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Paul Grondal and Mill Bay Members Association, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/17/2020. [11791495] [20-35694] (Harmeling, Sally) [Entered: 08/17/2020 12:44 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Paul Grondal, Mill Bay Members Association, Inc., Gary Reyes and Wapato Heritage LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/17/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/08/2020. Transcript due 10/06/2020. Appellants Paul Grondal, Mill Bay Members Association, Inc., Gary Reyes and Wapato Heritage LLC opening brief due 11/16/2020. Appellees Bureau of Indian Affairs, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, U.S. Department of the Interior and United States of America answering brief due 12/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11782362] (RT) [Entered: 08/10/2020 08:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Grondal, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH RAE DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS J. REYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD WAPATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABE MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN WAPATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIVIAN PIERRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA COVINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE L. GARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY M. CONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENID T. MARCHAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS ABRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD M. WAPATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAUREEN M. MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNIE WAPATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWANE DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS E. DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARLENE MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE GARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENID T. WIPPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONIA W. VANWOERKOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA SAINT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL G. WAPATO, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY ZUNIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLENE MARCELLAY-HYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH BACKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYDIA A. ARNEECHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH DICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY JO GARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE L. WAPATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL MARCELLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN K. BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MILL BAY MEMBERS ASSOCIATION, INC., a Washington non-profit corporation
Represented By: Sally W. Harmeling Esquire
Represented By: Robert R. Siderius Esquire
Represented By: Franklin Lyon Smith
Represented By: Joseph Quentin Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL GRONDAL, a Washington resident
Represented By: Sally W. Harmeling Esquire
Represented By: Robert R. Siderius Esquire
Represented By: Franklin Lyon Smith
Represented By: Joseph Quentin Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph P. Derrig Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Joseph P. Derrig Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Represented By: Joseph P. Derrig Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE COLVILLE RESERVATION
Represented By: Brian W. Chestnut
Represented By: Brian C. Gruber
Represented By: Anna Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WAPATO HERITAGE LLC
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz Esquire
Represented By: Tyler Hotchkiss
Represented By: Nathan J. Arnold
Represented By: Dale Melvin Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GARY REYES
Represented By: Manish Borde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?