Janice Altman, et al v. County of Santa Clara, et al
Defendant: GREGORY J. AHERN, COUNTY OF ALAMEDA and NICHOLAS MOSS
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF MOUNTAIN VIEW, SAM LICCARDO, MAX BOSEL, CITY OF PLEASANT HILL, SARA H. CODY, BRYAN HILL, DAVID LIVINGSTON, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, LAURIE SMITH, COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, CITY OF SAN JOSE, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, SCOTT MORROW, CARLOS BOLANOS, CITY OF PACIFICA, JEFFREY ROSEN, EDGARDO GARCIA, DANIEL STEIDLE and CHRIS FARNITANO
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALBERT LEE SWANN, CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, ROMAN KAPLAN, CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC., YAN TRAYTEL, SCOTT CHALMERS, CITY ARMS EAST LLC, RYAN GOODRICH, CUCKOO COLLECTIBLES LLC, DBA Eddy's Shooting Sports, DMITRI DANILEVSKY, GREG DAVID, CITY ARMS LLC, JANICE ALTMAN and NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Case Number: 21-15602
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12100749] (CL) [Entered: 05/03/2021 07:31 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/03/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12079150] (CL) [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:37 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/12/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12070803]. [21-15602] (AD) [Entered: 04/12/2021 12:44 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann and Yan Traytel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/12/2021. [12070663] [21-15602] (Lee, George) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:39 AM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann and Yan Traytel Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/12/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/03/2021. Transcript due 06/01/2021. Appellants Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann and Yan Traytel opening brief due 07/12/2021. Appellees Carlos Bolanos, Max Bosel, City of Mountain View, City of Pacifica, City of Pleasant Hill, City of San Jose, Sara H. Cody, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of Santa Clara, Chris Farnitano, Edgardo Garcia, Bryan Hill, Sam Liccardo, David Livingston, Scott Morrow, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith and Daniel Steidle answering brief due 08/11/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12063883] (JBS) [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Janice Altman, et al v. County of Santa Clara, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MOUNTAIN VIEW
Represented By: Lance Bayer Esquire
Represented By: Lance Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAM LICCARDO
Represented By: Malgorzata Laskowska
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAX BOSEL
Represented By: Lance Bayer Esquire
Represented By: Lance Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF PLEASANT HILL
Represented By: Gene Tanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARA H. CODY
Represented By: Melissa Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Represented By: Jason M. Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN HILL
Represented By: Gene Tanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF SAN MATEO
Represented By: Daniel T. McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURIE SMITH
Represented By: Melissa Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Represented By: Jason M. Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SAN JOSE
Represented By: Malgorzata Laskowska
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA
Represented By: Melissa Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Represented By: Jason M. Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT MORROW
Represented By: Daniel T. McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARLOS BOLANOS
Represented By: Daniel T. McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF PACIFICA
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon Esquire
Represented By: Kevin D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY ROSEN
Represented By: Melissa Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Represented By: Jason M. Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDGARDO GARCIA
Represented By: Malgorzata Laskowska
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL STEIDLE
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon Esquire
Represented By: Kevin D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS FARNITANO
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT LEE SWANN
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROMAN KAPLAN
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL FIREARMS LICENSEES, INC.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YAN TRAYTEL
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT CHALMERS
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CITY ARMS EAST LLC
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN GOODRICH
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CUCKOO COLLECTIBLES LLC, DBA Eddy's Shooting Sports
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DMITRI DANILEVSKY
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREG DAVID
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CITY ARMS LLC
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANICE ALTMAN
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY J. AHERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS MOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?