Paul Harris v. Chris Lyou, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LOUIS SMITH, PA, SCHULAR, CO, SHIRLEY M., Nurse Supervisor, TARA RICH, American Civil Libertys Untion of Alaska, HARPLE, RN, SELL, Sgt. Seg., BOYER, PA, HELM'S, Sgt., CHRIS LYOU, D.O.C. Acting: Superintendent, HOLT, CO, M. STANLEY, D.O.C. Superintendent, BREANNA BRIAN, Disability Law Center, Legal Asst., ANGELA J. STROMMER, ANP, KELLY, CO, ZANE NEIGHSWONGER, D.O.C. Superintendent, POWER'S, CO, INYARDS, Sgt., K. AIKEY, PA, ELMORE, Sgt., DAVID C. FLEURANT, Disability Law Center, Director, H. ZACHMAN, PA-C HPII, DIAL, CO, ANGELL, Seg. R Co IV, TUSH, Mental Health, MICHELE SUSIE, NP-C, BRUECKNER/ENNIS, SSG, EMMERSON, JONES, Sgt., EARL L. HOUSER, D.O.C. Superintendent, TONY UNDERWOOD, PA-C, HAMILTON, Lt., ROGERS, Sgt., DAVID NEWMAN, State ADA Coordinator and GOODING, NP RN
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL ALLEN HARRIS
Case Number: 21-35166
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellees Angell, Boyer, Brueckner/Ennis, Dial, Elmore, Gooding, Hamilton, Helm's, Holt, Earl L. Houser, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, Power's, Tara Rich, Rogers, Schular, Louis Smith, M. Stanley, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood and H. Zachman response opposing motion ([ # 8 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 04/30/2021. [12098656] [21-35166] (Mlcek, Mandee) [Entered: 04/30/2021 03:35 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees Angell, Boyer, Brueckner/Ennis, Dial, Gooding, Hamilton, Helm's, Holt, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, Power's, Tara Rich, Rogers, Sell, Louis Smith, M. Stanley, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood, H. Zachman, Elmore and Schular response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 04/30/2021. [12098275] [21-35166] (Mlcek, Mandee) [Entered: 04/30/2021 12:58 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellees Angell, Boyer, Dial, Elmore, Gooding, Hamilton, Helm's, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, Power's, Rogers, Schular, Louis Smith, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood, H. Zachman and Holt response opposing motion ([ # 5 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 04/30/2021. [12098269] [21-35166] (Mlcek, Mandee) [Entered: 04/30/2021 12:54 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Angell, Boyer, Dial, Elmore, Gooding, Hamilton, Helm's, Holt, Earl L. Houser, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, Power's, Rogers, Schular, Louis Smith, M. Stanley, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood and H. Zachman Motion to extend time to file opposition until 04/30/2021. Date of service: 04/16/2021. [12077108] [21-35166] (Mlcek, Mandee) [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:19 AM]
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Received original and 2 copies of Appellant Paul Allen Harris opening brief of 22 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 04/07/2021. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed (IFP motion pending). [12072388] (KWG) [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:12 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Paul Allen Harris motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/01/2021. [12073508] (DJV) [Entered: 04/14/2021 08:44 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Paul Allen Harris motion transfer to AK. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/01/2021. [12073495] (DJV) [Entered: 04/14/2021 08:33 AM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Paul Allen Harris FORM 27 motion for correction of defendants names. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/31/2021. [12066732] (RL) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:23 PM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees Angell, Boyer, Dial, Elmore, Gooding, Hamilton, Helm's, Holt, Earl L. Houser, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, Power's, Rogers, Schular, Louis Smith, M. Stanley, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood and H. Zachman Correspondence: Letter about appellees' names being incorrect in caption. Date of service: 03/31/2021 [12059135] [21-35166] (Mlcek, Mandee) [Entered: 03/31/2021 09:26 AM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Paul Allen Harris letter re: FORM 29 Request for Rules Book, 9th Circuit docket, copies of informal brief form, FORM 29, FORM 25 certificate of service. Paper filing deficiency: None. (sent requested documents to appellant) [12044853] (RL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 03:04 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12028331] (RL) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:38 PM]
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Paul Allen Harris opening brief due 05/03/2021. Appellees K. Aikey, Angell, Boyer, Breanna Brian, Brueckner/Ennis, Dial, Elmore, Emmerson, David C. Fleurant, Gooding, Hamilton, Harple, Helm's, Holt, Earl L. Houser, Inyards, Jones, Kelly, Chris Lyou, Shirley M., Zane Neighswonger, David Newman, Power's, Tara Rich, Rogers, Schular, Sell, Louis Smith, M. Stanley, Angela J. Strommer, Michele Susie, Tush, Tony Underwood and H. Zachman answering brief due 06/01/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12022759] (JMR) [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Harris v. Chris Lyou, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUIS SMITH, PA
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHULAR, CO
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHIRLEY M., Nurse Supervisor
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARA RICH, American Civil Libertys Untion of Alaska
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARPLE, RN
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELL, Sgt. Seg.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOYER, PA
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HELM'S, Sgt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS LYOU, D.O.C. Acting: Superintendent
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOLT, CO
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. STANLEY, D.O.C. Superintendent
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BREANNA BRIAN, Disability Law Center, Legal Asst.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA J. STROMMER, ANP
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY, CO
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZANE NEIGHSWONGER, D.O.C. Superintendent
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POWER'S, CO
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INYARDS, Sgt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. AIKEY, PA
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELMORE, Sgt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID C. FLEURANT, Disability Law Center, Director
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. ZACHMAN, PA-C HPII
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIAL, CO
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELL, Seg. R Co IV
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUSH, Mental Health
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELE SUSIE, NP-C
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUECKNER/ENNIS, SSG
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMMERSON
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONES, Sgt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EARL L. HOUSER, D.O.C. Superintendent
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY UNDERWOOD, PA-C
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMILTON, Lt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGERS, Sgt.
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID NEWMAN, State ADA Coordinator
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOODING, NP RN
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek Esquire
Represented By: Mandee Suzanne Mlcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL ALLEN HARRIS
Represented By: Paul Allen Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?