Coalition for Responsible Reg v. EPA
Petitioner: Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Rosebud Mining Company, Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc. and Massey Energy Company
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Not Yet Classified: Michigan Manufacturers Association, Glass Packaging Institute, State of Utah, State of South Dakota, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, State of Minnesota, Wetlands Watch, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, State of New Hampshire, Natural Resources Defense Council, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, State of New York, State of Maine, Nicola Scafetta, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Indiana Cast Metals Association, State of Washington, State of Connecticut, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, James P. Wallace, III, Benjamin M. Herman, State of Michigan, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, State of Oklahoma, State of Iowa, National Wildlife Federation, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, America's Great Waters Coalition, George H. Taylor, Environmental Defense Fund, State of Florida, Atlantic Legal Foundation, State of North Dakota, Virginia Manufacturers Association, State of Nebraska, State of Alaska, William Happer, State of Kansas, Union of Concerned Scientists, Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Landmark Legal Foundation, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, City of New York, State of Arizona, State of California, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Conservation Law Foundation, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Roy W. Spencer, The Great Waters Coalition, Associated Industries of Arkansas, State of Oregon, North American Die Casting Association, George T. Wolff, State of Kentucky, Haley Barbour, Governor for the State of Mississippi, State of Maryland, State of Louisiana, Craig D. Idso, State of Indiana, State of Vermont, Steel Manufacturers Association, Sierra Club, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce, Anthonly Finizza, ClientEarth, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, State of New Mexico, State of Illinois, Mountain States Legal Foundation, Richard A. Keen, State of South Carolina, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Anthony R. Lupo, State of Delaware, Don J. Easterbrook, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Portland Cement Association, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island and Timothy F. Ball
Case Number: 09-1322
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 CLERK'S FILE RETIRED [1782280] - The following NARA information may be used to locate the archived clerks file at the Federal Records Center - Accession Number: 276-2018-0014; Location Number: shelved; Box Number: 11. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:13 AM]
April 8, 2019 CLERK'S FILE RETIRED [1781546] - The following NARA information may be used to locate the archived clerks file at the Federal Records Center - Accession Number: 276-2018-0014; Location Number: shelved; Box Number: 6. [10-1024, 09-1322, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:00 PM]
August 7, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1566904] denying petitioners' petition for rehearing [ # 1554365-2 ]. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182] [Entered: 08/07/2015 04:20 PM]
August 7, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, filed [1566902] denying petitioners' motion for leave to file to file a reply [ # 1561311-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly. denying petitioners' petition for rehearing en banc . Before Judges: Garland, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett,* Pillard, Wilkins and Sentelle. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182] (Circuit Judge Millett did not participate in this matter) [Entered: 08/07/2015 04:16 PM]
July 7, 2015 [DENIED BY PER CURIAM ORDER ON 8/7/15] MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--REPLY FILED [1561313] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318 to response [ # 1560520-2 ] [Service Date: 07/07/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 08/07/2015 by MCM] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 07/07/2015 04:31 PM]
July 7, 2015 MOTION filed [1561311] by Landmark Legal Foundation and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318 for leave to file reply (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/20/2015) [Service Date: 07/07/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 07/07/2015 04:25 PM]
July 6, 2015 The following entry was entered in error, please disregard: MOTION filed [1561122]--[Edited 07/08/2015 by LMC] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 07/06/2015 04:57 PM]
July 1, 2015 RESPONSE FILED [1560520] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to petition for rehearing [ # 1554365-2 ], petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1554365-3 ] [Service Date: 07/01/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 07/01/2015 02:03 PM]
June 4, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1555806] granting motions to extend time [ # 1555607-2 ]; [ # 1555611-2 ]; [ # 1555615-2 ] in 09-1322, et al; 10-1073, et al.; and 10-1092, et al. Response to Petition due 07/01/2015. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182]--[Edited 06/05/2015 by AY] [Entered: 06/04/2015 03:41 PM]
June 3, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1555607] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to extend time to file response to 07/01/2015. [Service Date: 06/03/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 06/03/2015 04:49 PM]
June 1, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1555090] directing respondent EPA to file response to petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1554365-3 ] in cases 09-1322, et al. The response may not exceed 15 pages. Response to Petition due within 15 days of the date of this order. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182] [Entered: 06/01/2015 03:48 PM]
May 27, 2015 CORRECTED PETITION filed [1554365] by Petitioners Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Petitioners Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318 for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 05/27/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 05/27/2015 02:17 PM]
May 26, 2015 DISREGARD-to be refiled as a corrected petition for administrative purposes as advised by the clerk--PETITION filed [1554170] by Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Landmark Legal Foundation and Petitioners Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Landmark Legal Foundation and Petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Landmark Legal Foundation and Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. and The Langdale Company in 10-1035 for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 05/26/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1035, 10-1045]--[Edited 05/27/2015 by LMC] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 05/26/2015 07:59 PM]
May 4, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1550630] marked "return to sender - other reason - unable to forward". Mail had been sent to Robb Kapla. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 05/04/2015 04:32 PM]
April 10, 2015 MANDATE ISSUED to EPA [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 04/10/2015 03:08 PM]
April 10, 2015 AMENDED PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1546840] (without memorandum) that this court's judgment filed June 26, 2012, be amended in accordance with the Supreme Court's decision (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) [ # 1380688-2 ], issuing mandate. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180] [Entered: 04/10/2015 03:03 PM]
April 1, 2015 NOTICE FILED [1545329] by State of South Dakota in 09-1322 to terminate attorney [Service Date: 04/01/2015 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Giedd, Roxanne) [Entered: 04/01/2015 10:12 AM]
March 31, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1545059] filed by Steven R. Blair on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner State of South Dakota in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Blair, Steven) [Entered: 03/31/2015 09:52 AM]
March 31, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1545051] filed by Steven R. Blair on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner State of South Dakota in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Blair, Steven) [Entered: 03/31/2015 09:43 AM]
November 21, 2014 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1523857] by Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. in 09-1322, National Mining Association in 10-1024, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, State of Alabama in 10-1039, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281, 10-1320 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518243-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518233-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 11/21/2014 03:25 PM]
November 21, 2014 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1523846] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518242-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Zalzal, Peter) [Entered: 11/21/2014 03:05 PM]
November 21, 2014 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1523805] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518242-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 11/21/2014 02:06 PM]
November 21, 2014 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1523762] by Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518233-2 ], motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1518243-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 11/21/2014 12:55 PM]
November 21, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1523755] filed by Shannon L. Goessling and co-counsel Douglas E. Cloud on behalf of Petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 11/21/2014 12:38 PM]
November 13, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1522133] Upon consideration of respondents motion for leave to file a consolidated 35-page response to petitioners motions to govern future proceedings, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted. EPAs response remains due on or before November 21, 2014. [ # 1521316-2 ] [ # 1521311-2 ] [ # 1521315-2 ] [ # 1521312-2 ] Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180] [Entered: 11/13/2014 02:20 PM]
November 7, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1521316] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to exceed page limits in response [Service Date: 11/07/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 11/07/2014 12:26 PM]
October 21, 2014 The following entry was entered in error, please disregard: MOTION filed [1518284] to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/03/2014) [Service Date: 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (McMackin, John) [Entered: 10/21/2014 03:51 PM]
October 21, 2014 MOTION filed [1518243] by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, 10-1234 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/03/2014) [Service Date: 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/21/2014 02:25 PM]
October 21, 2014 MOTION filed [1518242] by Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, North American Die Casting Association, Portland Cement Association, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. in 09-1322, National Mining Association in 10-1024, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, State of Alabama in 10-1039, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. in 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281, 10-1320 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/03/2014) [Service Date: 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 10/21/2014 02:25 PM]
October 21, 2014 MOTION filed [1518233] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/03/2014) [Service Date: 10/21/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 10/21/2014 01:54 PM]
October 14, 2014 NOTICE FILED [1516931] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, 10-1235 to withdraw attorney Robin S. Conrad who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1235 [Service Date: 10/14/2014 ] [09-1322, 10-1030, 10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/14/2014 02:41 PM]
September 30, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1514762] granting the joint unopposed motion to extend time to file motions to govern [ # 1513595-2 ]. Any motions to govern future proceedings are due by 4:00 p.m. on October 21, 2014, and any responses are due by 4:00 p.m. on November 21, 2014. In addition to electronic filing, the parties are directed to deliver paper copies to the ocurt by the time and date due. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 09/30/2014 02:55 PM]
September 23, 2014 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1513595] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Haley Barbour, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of Alaska, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Wetlands Watch, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, Rosebud Mining Company and EPA in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation, Science and Environmental Policy Project and EPA in 10-1045, National Mining Association and EPA in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company and EPA in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation and EPA in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association, Western States Petroleum Association and EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group and EPA in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company, Lynn Westmoreland and EPA in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1030, Commonwealth of Virginia and EPA in 10-1036, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. and EPA in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute and EPA in 10-1038, State of Alabama and EPA in 10-1039, Ohio Coal Association and EPA in 10-1040, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and EPA in 10-1041, Portland Cement Association and EPA in 10-1046, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Wetlands Watch, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, Rosebud Mining Company and EPA in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company, Lynn Westmoreland and EPA in 10-1239, 10-1245, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and EPA in 10-1281, Pacific Legal Foundation and EPA in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks, Science and Environmental Policy Project and EPA in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to extend time to file motion to 10/21/2014. [Service Date: 09/23/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Martella, Roger) [Entered: 09/23/2014 11:24 AM]
August 26, 2014 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1509348] by Priscilla M. Hubenak and co-counsel Jon Niermann and Mark L. Walters on behalf of Petitioners Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Hubenak, Priscilla) [Entered: 08/26/2014 02:46 PM]
August 25, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1509206] It is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that in light of the Supreme Courts decision in Utility Air Regulatory Group v. EPA, 134 S.Ct. 2427 (2014), the parties file motions to govern future proceedings on or before September 30, 2014. To the extent possible, the parties are strongly encouraged to file jointly. The parties are reminded that the Court looks with disfavor upon duplicative submissions. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180] [Entered: 08/25/2014 04:19 PM]
July 25, 2014 MANDATE RETURNED [1504564] by EPA. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/25/2014 02:47 PM]
July 25, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1504563] recalling mandate [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/25/2014 02:45 PM]
July 25, 2014 JUDGMENT filed [1504498] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following disposition of case Nos. 12-1146, 12-1248, 12-1254, 12-1268, 12-1269, &12-1272: On 07/23/2014, the court affirmed in part and reversed with costs. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/25/2014 12:27 PM]
June 23, 2014 OPINION filed [1499244] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following disposition of case No. 12-1272 argued on 02/24/2014: the lower court decision was affirmed in part and reversed in part on 06/23/2014. [10-1030, 10-1235] [Entered: 06/24/2014 08:03 PM]
June 23, 2014 OPINION filed [1499242] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following disposition of case No. 12-1268 argued on 02/24/2014: the lower court decision was affirmed in part and reversed in part on 06/23/2014. [10-1035, 10-1239] [Entered: 06/24/2014 07:59 PM]
December 30, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1472961] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319, 10-1036 to withdraw attorney Earle Duncan Getchell Jr. who represented Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 and Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319 [Service Date: 12/30/2013 ] [10-1319, 10-1036] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 12/30/2013 03:44 PM]
December 19, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1471382] by State of Michigan to terminate attorney [Service Date: 12/19/2013 ] [09-1322] (Bursch, John) [Entered: 12/19/2013 12:00 PM]
December 13, 2013 LETTER sent [1470540] to the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States transmitting the record on appeal. Record sent electronically. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/13/2013 04:28 PM]
December 13, 2013 LETTER filed [1470536] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States requesting transmittal of the record on appeal. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/13/2013 04:26 PM]
December 11, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1469973] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association and Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce in 09-1322, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044 to withdraw attorney [Service Date: 12/11/2013 ] [09-1322, 10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 12/11/2013 06:30 PM]
October 15, 2013 LETTER filed [1461349] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 12-1268: The petition for writ of certiorari was granted on 10/15/2013. [10-1035, 10-1239] [Entered: 10/15/2013 06:33 PM]
October 15, 2013 LETTER filed [1461346] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 12-1272: The petition for writ of certiorari was granted on 10/15/2013. [10-1030, 10-1235] [Entered: 10/15/2013 06:25 PM]
October 15, 2013 LETTER filed [1461340] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 12-1253: The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 10/15/2013. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 10/15/2013 06:09 PM]
October 15, 2013 LETTER filed [1461339] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 12-1153: The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 10/15/2013. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 10/15/2013 06:08 PM]
October 15, 2013 LETTER filed [1461336] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in case No. 12-1152: The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 10/15/2013. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 10/15/2013 06:05 PM]
July 9, 2013 LETTER filed [1446130] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: The application to file consolidated brief in opposition in excess of word limits in the above-entitled case has been presented to The Chief Justice, who on July 8, 2013 granted the application. The consolidated brief in opposition may not exceed 11,000 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/11/2013 03:13 PM]
June 11, 2013 LETTER filed [1440872] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: The application to file consolidated brief in opposition in excess of word limits in the above-entitled case has been presented to The Chief Justice, who on June 7, 2013 granted the application. The consolidated brief in opposition may not exceed 12,000 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 06/12/2013 10:55 AM]
May 29, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1438363] by State of Minnesota to substitute attorney Jodelyn F. Olson substituted by Max H. Kieley [Service Date: 05/29/2013 ] [09-1322] (Kieley, Max) [Entered: 05/29/2013 03:38 PM]
April 25, 2013 LETTER filed [1432696] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 04/24/2013 as No. 12-1272. [10-1030, 10-1235] [Entered: 04/25/2013 06:25 PM]
April 24, 2013 LETTER filed [1432486] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 04/23/2013 as No. 12-1268. [10-1035, 10-1239] [Entered: 04/24/2013 06:13 PM]
April 22, 2013 CORRECTED NOTICE FILED [1432010] by National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026 to substitute attorney Peter S. Glaser Mark Nagel Matthew Dukes substituted by Douglas A. Henderson [Service Date: 04/22/2013 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Henderson, Douglas) [Entered: 04/22/2013 04:16 PM]
April 22, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1431978] by National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026 to substitute attorney Peter S. Glaser Mark Nagel Matthew Dukes substituted by Douglas A. Henderson [Service Date: 04/22/2013 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Henderson, Douglas) [Entered: 04/22/2013 03:15 PM]
April 19, 2013 LETTER filed [1432478] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 04/19/2013 as No. 12-1253. [09-1322, 10-1234] [Entered: 04/24/2013 05:52 PM]
March 27, 2013 LETTER filed [1428046] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/29/2013 01:35 PM]
March 27, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1427680] by James G. Murphy on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent National Wildlife Federation in 09-1322. [09-1322] (Murphy, James) [Entered: 03/27/2013 06:19 PM]
March 25, 2013 LETTER filed [1427257] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 03/22/2013 as No. 12-1153. [10-1310, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/25/2013 07:25 PM]
March 25, 2013 LETTER filed [1427256] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 03/22/2013 as No. 12-1152. [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/25/2013 07:24 PM]
March 21, 2013 LETTER filed [1426786] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/22/2013 10:26 AM]
March 21, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1426694] by State of California in 09-1322 to substitute attorney Kathleen A. Kenealy substituted by Robert W. Byrne [Service Date: 03/21/2013 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Byrne, Robert) [Entered: 03/21/2013 05:17 PM]
March 14, 2013 LETTER filed [1425616] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/15/2013 11:16 AM]
March 14, 2013 LETTER filed [1425615] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/15/2013 11:15 AM]
March 13, 2013 LETTER filed [1425614] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/15/2013 11:14 AM]
March 13, 2013 LETTER filed [1425613] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/15/2013 11:14 AM]
March 12, 2013 LETTER filed [1425342] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/14/2013 11:53 AM]
March 8, 2013 LETTER filed [1424780] by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court that the time for filing a petition for writ of certiorari has been extended to: 04/19/2013. [09-1322] [Entered: 03/12/2013 12:30 PM]
January 22, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1416471] Upon consideration of the motion for admission of James G. Murphy pro hac vice, it is ORDERED that the motion be denied. The court permits pro hac vice admission solely for the purpose of presenting oral argument, which was heard on February 28, 2012. See D.C. Cir. Rule 46(a); D.C. Circuit Handbook of Practice and Internal Procedures at 6 (2011). The Clerk is directed to send to Mr. Murphy an application for admission to the bar of this court. [ # 1414738-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/22/2013 12:19 PM]
January 11, 2013 NOTICE FILED [1414742] by National Wildlife Federation in 09-1322 to withdraw attorney Joseph Mendelson III who represented National Wildlife Federation in 09-1322 [Service Date: 01/11/2013 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Mendelson, Joseph) [Entered: 01/11/2013 02:14 PM]
January 11, 2013 MOTION filed [1414738] by National Wildlife Federation in 09-1322 to allow pro hac vice attorney (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/25/2013) [Service Date: 01/11/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Mendelson, Joseph) [Entered: 01/11/2013 02:08 PM]
January 2, 2013 MANDATE ISSUED to Environmental Protection Agency [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/02/2013 09:55 AM]
December 20, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1411151] denying petitions for rehearing. Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/20/2012 10:16 AM]
December 20, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, filed [1411148] denying petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1388587-2 ] in 10-1310. Before Judges: Sentelle, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Garland, Brown, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/20/2012 10:14 AM]
December 20, 2012 Publishing Order [ # 1411145-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/20/2012 10:12 AM]
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order PER CURIAM ORDER (in slip opinion format), En Banc, filed [1411145] denying petitions for rehearing en banc. Before Judges: Sentelle*, Henderson, Rogers*, Tatel*, Garland, Brown*, Griffith and Kavanaugh*. (Circuit Judges Brown and Kavanaugh would grant the petitions for rehearing en banc) (A statement by Chief Judge Sentelle and Circuit Judges Rogers and Tatel, concurring in the denials of rehearing en banc, is attached) (A statement by Circuit Judge Brown, dissenting in the denials of rehearing en banc, is attached) (A statement by Circuit Judge Kavanaugh, dissenting from the denials of rehearing en banc, is attached). [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/20/2012 10:09 AM]
November 27, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1406893] by State of Oregon in 09-1322 to substitute attorney Paul S. Logan substituted by Paul A. Garrahan [Service Date: 11/27/2012 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 11/27/2012 03:25 PM]
October 12, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1399463] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to petition for rehearing [ # 1388742-2 ], petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1388742-3 ] [Service Date: 10/12/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/12/2012 06:07 PM]
October 12, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1399291] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to petition for rehearing [ # 1388742-2 ], petition for rehearing en banc [ # 1388742-3 ] [Service Date: 10/12/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 10/12/2012 11:11 AM]
September 14, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1394425] Upon consideration of EPAs unopposed motion filed in No. 09-1322, et al., for 21-day extension of time to file responses to rehearing petitions in the above-captioned cases, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted. The responses of EPA and intervenors-respondents to the petitions of the Chamber of Commerce and the National Association of Manufacturers for rehearing en banc are now due October 12, 2012. [ # 1393923-2 ] in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 09/14/2012 10:58 AM]
September 11, 2012 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1393923] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to extend time to file response to 10/12/2012. [Service Date: 09/11/2012 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 09/11/2012 03:33 PM]
September 6, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1393022] Upon consideration of the petition of the Chamber of Commerce for rehearing en banc and the petition of the Non-State Petitioners for rehearing en banc, it is ORDERED that, within 15 days from the date of this order, respondent EPA file a combined response to the above-referenced en banc petitions, and intervenors for respondent file a combined response to the above-referenced en banc petitions. Each response may not exceed 20 pages. Absent further order of the court, no replies to the responses will be accepted. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 09/06/2012 09:54 AM]
August 10, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1388747] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Langdale Forest Products Company and Langdale Fuel Company in 10-1239 To Join Petition for Rehearing of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 ] [10-1035, 10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 08/10/2012 09:17 PM]
August 10, 2012 PETITION filed [1388742] by Petitioner Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, 10-1235 for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [10-1030, 10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 08/10/2012 08:44 PM]
August 10, 2012 PETITION filed [1388736] by Petitioner Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, 10-1245 for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1025, 10-1245] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 08/10/2012 07:03 PM]
August 10, 2012 PETITION filed [1388725] by Intervenors for Petitioner State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322, Petitioner Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, Petitioner State of Alabama in 10-1039, Petitioners Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Petitioners Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281, 10-1319 for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, 3rd Party] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041, 10-1281, 10-1319] (Murphy, Michael) [Entered: 08/10/2012 06:38 PM]
August 10, 2012 PETITION filed [1388720] by Intervenor for Respondent State of Alaska in 09-1322 for rehearing en banc., for rehearing [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Mulder, Steven) [Entered: 08/10/2012 06:14 PM]
August 10, 2012 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-PETITION filed [1388713] by Petitioner Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. in 09-1322 for rehearing, for rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1234]--[Edited 08/13/2012 by LMC] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 08/10/2012 05:51 PM]
August 10, 2012 PETITION filed [1388587] by Petitioner Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310 for rehearing and rehearing en banc. [Service Date: 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [10-1310] -[Edited 09/07/2012 by TAG-RELIEF ADDED] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 08/10/2012 12:10 PM]
June 26, 2012 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1380694] withholding issuance of the mandate. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 06/26/2012 10:35 AM]
June 26, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1380692] dismissing as moot motion to strike document [ # 1340588-2 ] in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 06/26/2012 10:33 AM]
June 26, 2012 OPINION filed [1380690] PER CURIAM (Pages: 82) [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 06/26/2012 10:30 AM]
June 26, 2012 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1380688] that the Timing and Tailoring petitions for review are dismissed, and the remainder of the petitions be denied for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1182, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 06/26/2012 10:22 AM]
May 14, 2012 NOTICE FILED [1373570] by Conservation Law Foundation in 09-1322 to withdraw attorney Helen Diumenti Silver who represented Conservation Law Foundation in 09-1322, 10-1234 [Service Date: 05/14/2012 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 05/14/2012 by TAG] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 05/14/2012 12:36 PM]
March 15, 2012 TRANSCRIPT [1363774] of oral argument [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/15/2012 07:56 AM]
February 29, 2012 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 02/29/2012 03:30 PM]
February 16, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Harry W. MacDougald, on behalf of Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Goessling, Shannon) [Entered: 02/16/2012 03:46 PM]
February 16, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Angeline Purdy, on behalf of Respondent EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 02/16/2012 02:48 PM]
February 16, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Jon M. Lipshultz, on behalf of Respondent EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 02/16/2012 02:23 PM]
February 16, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 09-1322. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Carol A. Iancu [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 02/16/2012 01:15 PM]
February 15, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Jeffrey Bossert Clark, on behalf of Petitioner Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, 10-1235. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 02/15/2012 08:12 PM]
February 15, 2012 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1358720] by Gavin Geraghty McCabe on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of California in 09-1322. [09-1322] (McCabe, Gavin) [Entered: 02/15/2012 06:17 PM]
February 15, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by on behalf of Petitioner Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. in 09-1322, 10-1234. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Patrick R. Day [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 02/15/2012 03:27 PM]
February 14, 2012 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, E. Duncan Getchell, Jr., on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 02/14/2012 02:06 PM]
February 8, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1357330] allocating oral argument time as follows: Tuesday, February 28, 9:30 A.M.; I. No. 09-1322 (and consolidated cases), Endangerment Finding 1 hour, 30 minutes total. (Petitioners and Supporting Intervenors -- 45 minutes; Respondents and Supporting Intervenors-- 45 minutes); II. No. 10-1092 (and consolidated cases), Tailpipe Rule 40 minutes total (Petitioners and Supporting Intervenors -- 20 minutes; Respondents and Supporting Intervenors -- 20 minutes). Wednesday, February 29, 9:30 A.M.; III. No. 10-1167 (and consolidated cases), Historic Regulations; No. 10-1073 (and consolidated cases), Timing and Tailoring Rules 2 hours, 30 minutes total (Petitioners and Supporting Intervenors -- 75 minutes; Respondents and Supporting Intervenors-- 75 minutes). The panel will hear consolidated argument for Case Nos. 10-1167 and 10-1073. The parties are instructed to address the jurisdictional issues specific to each case first (i.e., the timeliness of the challenge to the historic regulations and standing to challenge the Timing and Tailoring Rules). In each case, parties may divide argument time among counsel for Petitioners/Respondents and supporting Intervenors as they see fit. Form 72, which may be accessed through the link on this order, must be completed and returned to the Clerks office by February 17, 2012. directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 02/17/2012 Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1073, 10-1083, 10-1099, 10-1109, 10-1110, 10-1114, 10-1118, 10-1119, 10-1120, 10-1122, 10-1123, 10-1124, 10-1125, 10-1126, 10-1127, 10-1128, 10-1129, 10-1131, 10-1132, 10-1145, 10-1147, 10-1148, 10-1199, 10-1200, 10-1201, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-1206, 10-1207, 10-1208, 10-1210, 10-1211, 10-1212, 10-1213, 10-1216, 10-1218, 10-1219, 10-1220, 10-1221, 10-1222, 10-1092, 10-1094, 10-1134, 10-1143, 10-1144, 10-1152, 10-1156, 10-1158, 10-1159, 10-1160, 10-1161, 10-1162, 10-1163, 10-1164, 10-1166, 10-1167, 10-1168, 10-1169, 10-1170, 10-1173, 10-1174, 10-1175, 10-1176, 10-1177, 10-1178, 10-1179, 10-1180, 10-1182, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 02/08/2012 by MCM] [Entered: 02/08/2012 03:41 PM]
February 3, 2012 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1356581] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Haley Barbour, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce, State of Alaska and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, State of Alabama in 10-1039, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to letter oral argument format [ # 1351499-2 ] [Service Date: 02/03/2012 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 02/03/2012 09:10 PM]
February 3, 2012 RESPONSE FILED [1356558] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to letter oral argument format [ # 1351499-2 ] [Service Date: 02/03/2012 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 02/03/2012 04:55 PM]
January 13, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1352684] denying motion for judicial notice [ # 1332845-2 ] Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/13/2012 03:25 PM]
January 13, 2012 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1352678] deferring consideration of motion to strike document [ # 1340588-2 ] pending further order of the Court. Before Judges: Sentelle, Rogers and Tatel. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/13/2012 03:17 PM]
January 6, 2012 LETTER SENT [1351499] concerning oral argument format - Proposed formats due 02/03/2012. (SEE LETTER FOR DETAILS) [ # 1339510-3 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/06/2012 03:10 PM]
November 28, 2011 REPLY FILED [1344297] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to response [ # 1343336-2 ], [ # 1342908-2 ] [Service Date: 11/28/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 11/28/2011 09:56 PM]
November 21, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1343336] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce, State of Alaska and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 to motion to strike document [ # 1340588-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/21/2011 09:26 PM]
November 21, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT- AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1343290] filed by America's Great Waters Coalition, ClientEarth, The Great Waters Coalition and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 11/21/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6425 words. [09-1322]--[Edited 11/30/2011 by LMC] (Kraham, Susan) [Entered: 11/21/2011 04:30 PM]
November 18, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1342908] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319 to motion to strike document [ # 1340588-2 ] [Service Date: 11/18/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1319, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/18/2011 04:40 PM]
November 14, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1341740] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 Notice re: Pagination of Joint Appendix and Citations Thereto. [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/14/2011 08:04 PM]
November 14, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1341738] filed by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] Length of Brief: 7,495 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/14/2011 08:00 PM]
November 14, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1341737] filed by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] Length of Brief: 14,999 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/14/2011 07:57 PM]
November 14, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1341703] filed by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] Length of Brief: 1777 words.. [10-1041, 09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039] (Murphy, Michael) [Entered: 11/14/2011 05:21 PM]
November 14, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1341701] filed by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] Length of Brief: 3985 words. [10-1041, 09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039] (Murphy, Michael) [Entered: 11/14/2011 05:14 PM]
November 14, 2011 CORRECTED RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1341401] filed by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/14/2011 ] Length of Brief: 29,624 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 11/14/2011 11:19 AM]
November 12, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT--INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1341315] filed by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 [Service Date: 11/12/2011 ] Length of Brief: 13,984 words.. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by KRM]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by KRM] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 11/12/2011 12:31 PM]
November 10, 2011 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--(corrected brief filed on 11/14/11) RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1341148] filed by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/10/2011 ] Length of Brief: 29,615 Words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 11/21/2011 by HTS] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 11/10/2011 02:20 PM]
November 10, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1341063] filed by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319 [Service Date: 11/10/2011 ] Length of Brief: 3,372 words. [10-1319, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:30 AM]
November 10, 2011 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1341062] filed by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319 [Service Date: 11/10/2011 ] Length of Brief: 7,400 words. [10-1319, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:28 AM]
November 10, 2011 RELIEF REPLACED--NOTICE FILED [1341054] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1319 that they are not filing a separate appendix but are relying on the joint appendix previously filed. [Service Date: 11/10/2011 ] [10-1319, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 11/10/2011 by LMC] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/10/2011 10:16 AM]
November 8, 2011 MOTION filed [1340588] by EPA in 09-1322 to strike the reply (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/21/2011) [Service Date: 11/08/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 11/08/2011 10:44 AM]
November 2, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1339510] scheduling oral argument before Judges SENTELLE, ROGERS, TATEL Tuesday, 02/28/2012 AM. The court anticipates that argument will be schedule over two days [Nos. 09-1322, 10-1073, 10-1092, 10-1167]. Counsel will be notified of the argument format and allotted times at a later date. All counsel in each of these cases, therefore, should plan to be available for argument on both February 28 and February 29, 2012. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 11/02/2011 12:46 PM]
October 31, 2011 JOINT APPENDIX [1339079] filed [Volumes: 10] [Service Date: 10/31/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/31/2011 08:23 PM]
October 24, 2011 REPLY FILED [1337450] by Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1321 to response [ # 1335618-2 ], [ # 1335614-2 ], [ # 1335480-2 ] [Service Date: 10/24/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/24/2011 11:53 PM]
October 17, 2011 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1336052] filed by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 [Service Date: 10/17/2011 ] Length of Brief: 7,498 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/17/2011 11:45 PM]
October 17, 2011 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1336036] filed by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 [Service Date: 10/17/2011 ] Length of Brief: 1,777 words. [10-1041, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Murphy, Michael) [Entered: 10/17/2011 05:59 PM]
October 17, 2011 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1335827] filed by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 10/17/2011 ] Length of Brief: 3,363. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 10/17/2011 02:02 PM]
October 14, 2011 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1335618] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 [Service Date: 10/14/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/14/2011 11:44 PM]
October 14, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1335614] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 to motion for judicial notice [ # 1332845-2 ] [Service Date: 10/14/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/14/2011 07:43 PM]
October 14, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1335480] by EPA [Service Date: 10/14/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 10/14/2011 01:53 PM]
September 30, 2011 MOTION filed [1332845] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1321 for judicial notice. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/14/2011) [Service Date: 09/30/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 09/30/2011 10:13 PM]
September 16, 2011 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1330161] filed by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 [Service Date: 09/16/2011 ] Length of Brief: 14,089 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 09/16/2011 08:08 PM]
August 30, 2011 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1326722] filed by America's Great Waters Coalition, ClientEarth and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 08/30/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6,984 words. [09-1322] (Kraham, Susan) [Entered: 08/30/2011 12:08 PM]
August 25, 2011 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--(CORRECTED ON 8/30/11) AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1326065] filed by ClientEarth, The Great Waters Coalition and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 08/25/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6984 words. [09-1322]--[Edited 08/31/2011 by HTS] (Kraham, Susan) [Entered: 08/25/2011 03:43 PM]
August 18, 2011 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1324992] filed by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 08/18/2011 ] Length of Brief: 29,619 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 08/18/2011 03:53 PM]
August 5, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1322807] granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1318727-2 ] Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection in 09-1322 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 08/05/2011 03:13 PM]
July 27, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1320966] by Megan Ceronsky on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Ceronsky, Megan) [Entered: 07/27/2011 01:30 PM]
July 19, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1319604] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, 10-1320 to change party information [Service Date: 07/19/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 07/19/2011 07:45 PM]
July 19, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1319460] by Sierra Club to change party information [Service Date: 07/19/2011 ] [09-1322] (Segall, Craig) [Entered: 07/19/2011 12:28 PM]
July 14, 2011 MOTION filed [1318727] by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection in 09-1322 to terminate party (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/28/2011) [Service Date: 07/14/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Furlan, Kristen) [Entered: 07/14/2011 04:38 PM]
July 14, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1318678] by Gary C. Rikard on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner Haley Barbour. [09-1322] (Rikard, Gary) [Entered: 07/14/2011 02:55 PM]
July 12, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1318078] by Natural Resources Defense Council in 09-1322 to change party information [Service Date: 07/12/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Geertsma, Meleah) [Entered: 07/12/2011 12:48 PM]
July 7, 2011 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1312027-2 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/07/2011 03:53 PM]
July 7, 2011 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] [1317305] denying the scientists' motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1310929-2 ]; denying motion to strike [ # 1311290-2 ]; granting Kansas's motion for leave to file out of time [ # 1312025-2 ] in 09-1322 Before Judges: Tatel, Garland and Brown. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 07/07/2011 03:52 PM]
June 23, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1314986] by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association to withdraw attorney Adam Jeffrey White who represented Western States Petroleum Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Association of Manufacturers, National Association of Home Builders, Corn Refiners Association, Brick Industry Association and American Petroleum Institute in 10-1044 [Service Date: 06/23/2011 ] [10-1044] (White, Adam) [Entered: 06/23/2011 05:02 PM]
June 17, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1313824] by Peter Zalzal on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund. [09-1322] (Zalzal, Peter) [Entered: 06/17/2011 03:32 PM]
June 10, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1312589] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to motion for leave to file [ # 1312025-2 ] [Service Date: 06/10/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 06/10/2011 10:03 AM]
June 9, 2011 SUPPLEMENT [1312398] to reply [ # 1312344-2 ] filed by Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 06/09/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/09/2011 12:05 PM]
June 9, 2011 REPLY FILED [1312344] by Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff to response [ # 1311290-4 ] [Service Date: 06/09/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/09/2011 10:39 AM]
June 8, 2011 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1312291] filed by Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 06/08/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6688 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/08/2011 06:17 PM]
June 8, 2011 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--FILED INCORRECTLY THIS IS A REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPO--REFILED ON 6/9/11--MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1312290] to motion to strike document [ # 1311290-2 ], motion [ # 1311290-3 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/23/2011) combined with a MOTION FILED by Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 10-1030, 10-1036, Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff in 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 for leave to file [Service Date: 06/08/2011 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 06/09/2011 by KRM]--[Edited 06/09/2011 by HTS] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/08/2011 06:00 PM]
June 8, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1312161] by State of Kansas to motion to strike document [ # 1311290-2 ], motion [ # 1311290-3 ] [Service Date: 06/08/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Campbell, John) [Entered: 06/08/2011 01:05 PM]
June 8, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1312159] to Amicus brief [ # 1312027-2 ], motion for leave to file [ # 1312025-2 ] filed by State of Kansas. [09-1322] (Campbell, John) [Entered: 06/08/2011 12:53 PM]
June 7, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1312027] filed by State of Kansas [Service Date: 06/07/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6,527 words. [09-1322]--[Edited 06/15/2011 by HTS] (Campbell, John) [Entered: 06/07/2011 05:57 PM]
June 7, 2011 MOTION filed [1312025] by State of Kansas for leave to file brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/20/2011) [Service Date: 06/07/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Campbell, John) [Entered: 06/07/2011 05:55 PM]
June 2, 2011 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1311290] to motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1310929-2 ], motion to participate as amicus curiae [1310450-2](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 06/16/2011) combined with a MOTION FILED by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to strike the brief [Service Date: 06/02/2011 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 06/02/2011 05:06 PM]
June 2, 2011 ERRATA FILED [1311041] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, 10-1319 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1309185-2 ] . Reason for errata: Correcting Table of Authorities - - inadvertently omitted Asterisks from Two Cases in Opening Brief.. [Service Date: 06/02/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 06/02/2011 10:26 AM]
June 1, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--MODIFIED PARTY FILER--CORRECTED (THIS CORRECTS THE 5/27/11 BRIEF ATTACHED TO MOTION TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICUS) AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1310978] filed by Dr. Timothy F. Ball, Joseph S. D'Aleo, Dr. Don J. Easterbrook, Dr. Anthonly Finizza, Dr. William Happer, Dr. Benjamin M. Herman, Dr. Craig D. Idso, Dr. Richard A. Keen, Dr. Anthony R. Lupo, Dr. Nicola Scafetta, Dr. Roy W. Spencer, George H. Taylor, Dr. James P. Wallace, III and Dr. George T. Wolff [Service Date: 05/27/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6660 Words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 06/01/2011 by HTS]--[Edited 06/02/2011 by HTS] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/01/2011 05:01 PM]
June 1, 2011 CORRECTED (THIS CORRECTS THE 5/27/11 MOTION) MOTION filed [1310929] by Scientists ISO Petitioners to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 06/01/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/01/2011 02:44 PM]
June 1, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT--CORRECTED (CORRECTS BRIEF OF 5/27/11) AMICUS FOR PETITIONER Brief filed [1310907] by Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center to Amicus brief [1310449-2] [Service Date: 06/01/2011 ] [09-1322]--[Edited 06/06/2011 by HTS] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 06/01/2011 01:53 PM]
May 27, 2011 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--CORRECTED MOTION AND BRIEF FILED ON 6/1/11--MOTION filed [1310450] by Scientists in Support of Petitoners to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 05/27/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 06/02/2011 by HTS] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 05/27/2011 10:52 PM]
May 27, 2011 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--(CORRECTED BRIEF FILED 6/1/11) AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1310449] filed by Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center [Service Date: 05/27/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6,901 words. [09-1322]--[Edited 06/06/2011 by HTS] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 05/27/2011 10:29 PM]
May 25, 2011 ERRATA FILED [1309959] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce, State of Alaska and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1309215-2 ] . Reason for errata: typographical errors (see pleading). [Service Date: 05/25/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 05/25/2011 01:12 PM]
May 25, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1309928] granting ClientEarth's motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1292745-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 05/25/2011 12:07 PM]
May 24, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1309804] to notice for other relief [ # 1309216-2 ] filed by Portland Cement Association and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 05/24/2011 06:14 PM]
May 21, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1309216] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234 Declaration Submitted. [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 05/21/2011 12:00 AM]
May 20, 2011 PETITIONER BRIEF [1309215] filed by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1321 [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] Length of Brief: 14,988. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 05/20/2011 11:55 PM]
May 20, 2011 PETITIONER BRIEF [1309213] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281, 10-1319 [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] Length of Brief: 3,985 words. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Mitchell, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/20/2011 06:09 PM]
May 20, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1309187] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, 10-1319 Deferred Appendix Designation in Support of Opening Brief for State Petitioners. [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 05/20/2011 03:48 PM]
May 20, 2011 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--PETITIONER BRIEF [1309185] filed by State of Texas and Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, 10-1319 [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] Length of Brief: 7,798 Words. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1319]--[Edited 06/01/2011 by HTS] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 05/20/2011 03:40 PM]
May 20, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1309124] by Jonathan F. Mitchell, Solicitor General and co-counsel Michael P. Murphy, Assistant Solicitor General on behalf of Petitioners Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041. [10-1041, 09-1322] (Mitchell, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/20/2011 02:19 PM]
May 6, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1306677] granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1305706-3 ] State of Hawaii in 09-1322 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 05/06/2011 01:25 PM]
April 29, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT--MOTION filed [1305706] by State of Hawaii in 09-1322 to withdraw as intervenor (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/12/2011) [Service Date: 04/29/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 05/02/2011 by HTS] (Bohlen, Edward) [Entered: 04/29/2011 05:23 PM]
March 22, 2011 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1299368] setting briefing schedule: Briefs for State Petitioners AND Supporting Intervenors due 05/20/2011 (no more than two briefs, not to exceed a combined total of 15,000 words). Briefs for Non-State PETITIONERS and Supporting Intervenors due 5/20/11 (no more than two briefs, not to exceed a combine total of 15,000 words). AMICUS for PETITIONERS Brief due 05/27/2011 (not to exceed a combined total of 7,000 words). RESPONDENT Brief due on 08/18/2011 (not to exceed 30,000 words). AMICUS for RESPONDENT Brief due 08/25/2011(not to exceed a combined total of 7,000 words). JOINT INTERVENOR for RESPONDENT Brief due 09/16/2011 (not to exceed 15,000 words). State PETITIONERS Reply Brief due 10/17/2011 (not to exceed a combined total of 7,500 words). Non-State PETITIONERS Reply Brief due 10/17/2011 (not to exceed a combined total of 7,500 words). Deferred Appendix due 10/31/2011. FINAL Briefs for State Petitioners AND Supporting Intervenors due 11/14/2011. FINAL Briefs for Non-State Petitioners AND Supporting Intervenors due 11/14/2011. AMICUS for PETITIONERS Final Brief due 11/14/2011. RESPONDENT Final Brief due on 11/14/2011. AMICUS for RESPONDENT Final Brief due 11/14/2011. INTERVENOR for RESPONDENT Final Brief due 11/14/2011. State and Non-State PETITIONERS Final Reply Brief due 11/14/201. Before Judges: Henderson, Garland and Kavanaugh. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 03/22/2011 01:15 PM]
February 15, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1293437] by Meleah Geertsma on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Natural Resources Defense Council in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 02/15/2011 04:39 PM]
February 15, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1293436] by Natural Resources Defense Council in 09-1322 to withdraw attorney Benjamin Hoyt Longstreth who represented Natural Resources Defense Council in 09-1322, Colin Casey O'Brien who represented Natural Resources Defense Council in 09-1322 [Service Date: 02/15/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 02/15/2011 04:36 PM]
February 11, 2011 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1292745] by ClientEarth to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/11/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 05/24/2011 by LMC] (Ruley, Douglas) [Entered: 02/11/2011 10:14 AM]
January 28, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1290346] granting motion to withdraw document [ # 1290278-2 ], terminating party State of Arizona in 09-1322 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/28/2011 09:18 AM]
January 27, 2011 MOTION filed [1290278] by State of Arizona in 09-1322 to withdraw motion [Service Date: 01/27/2011 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Mikitish, Joseph) [Entered: 01/27/2011 04:38 PM]
January 12, 2011 NOTICE FILED [1287539] by Mountain States Legal Foundation to terminate attorney [Service Date: 01/12/2011 ] [09-1322] (Gallaway, Elizabeth) [Entered: 01/12/2011 12:05 PM]
January 12, 2011 MODIFIED EVENT--SUPPLEMENT [1287522] to CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1287522-2] (to replace the originally filed Endangerment Finding Reconsideration Certification and Index) by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 01/12/2011 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 01/13/2011 by LMC] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 01/12/2011 11:21 AM]
January 10, 2011 RESPONSE FILED [1287188] by Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, Mountain States Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Portland Cement Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association, Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce and Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and National Mining Association in 10-1024, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in 10-1036, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, 10-1039, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center and Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040, 10-1041, Atlantic Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Landmark Legal Foundation and Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1245, Pacific Legal Foundation in 10-1310, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1320, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1321 to order [ # 1285780-3 ],[ # 1285780-2 ], [ # 1282532-3 ],[ # 1282532-2 ] [Service Date: 01/10/2011 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 01/10/2011 11:56 PM]
January 10, 2011 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1287173] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Wetlands Watch and EPA in 09-1322, EPA in 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Wetlands Watch and EPA in 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to order [ # 1282532-3 ],[ # 1282532-2 ], [ # 1285780-3 ],[ # 1285780-2 ] [Service Date: 01/10/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 01/10/2011 06:24 PM]
January 10, 2011 RESPONSE FILED [1287162] by Commonwealth of Virginia to order [ # 1285780-3 ],[ # 1285780-2 ] [Service Date: 01/10/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 01/10/2011 04:58 PM]
January 10, 2011 RESPONSE FILED [1287161] by Commonwealth of Virginia to order [ # 1285780-3 ],[ # 1285780-2 ] [Service Date: 01/10/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 01/10/2011 04:53 PM]
January 7, 2011 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1286916] by Steven J. Lechner on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Mountain States Legal Foundation in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lechner, Steven) [Entered: 01/07/2011 04:58 PM]
January 3, 2011 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1285780] granting motion to extend time [ # 1284988-2 ]; directing response to briefing format Response to Order now due 01/10/2011 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 01/03/2011 11:23 AM]
December 28, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1284988] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to extend time to file suggestion to 01/10/2011. [Service Date: 12/28/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 12/28/2010 07:48 AM]
December 10, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1274454-2 ] and sur-reply [ # 1282545-2 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/10/2010 05:09 PM]
December 10, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] [1282558] granting motion for leave to file a response [ # 1274456-2 ] in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, granting motion to file declarations under seal, granting motion for leave to file sur-reply [ # 1278141-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file response [ # 1274454-2 ] in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, The Clerk is directed to file sur-reply [ # 1282545-2 ]; denying motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, denying motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ] in 10-1041. FURTHER ORDERED that these cases be scheduled for oral argument on the same day before the same panel. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Tatel and Brown. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 12/10/2010 by KRM] [Entered: 12/10/2010 03:56 PM]
December 10, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1282532] directing party to file briefing format - Proposed formats due 01/03/2011. See order for details. [09-1322] [Entered: 12/10/2010 02:51 PM]
December 10, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1282531] granting motion to withdraw document [ # 1279287-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/10/2010 02:47 PM]
December 7, 2010 RESPONSE FILED [1281816] by State of Texas in 10-1281 to letter [ # 1281398-3 ], letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1281398-2 ] [Service Date: 12/07/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1281] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 12/07/2010 06:08 PM]
December 6, 2010 LETTER FILED [1281398] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 12/06/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 12/06/2010 11:28 AM]
December 1, 2010 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1280580] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 12/01/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 01/12/2011 by LMC] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 12/01/2010 01:08 PM]
November 23, 2010 MOTION filed [1279287] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 to withdraw motion (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/06/2010) [Service Date: 11/23/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 11/23/2010 02:15 PM]
November 18, 2010 SURREPLY lodged [1282545] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 to reply [ # 1276368-2 ], [ # 1276361-2 ] [Service Date: 11/18/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 12/10/2010 03:26 PM]
November 18, 2010 MOTION filed [1278141] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 10-1234 for leave to file reply (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/02/2010) [Service Date: 11/18/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 11/18/2010 02:29 PM]
November 18, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277997] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1281] (Clay, John) [Entered: 11/18/2010 09:51 AM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277953] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/17/2010 09:33 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1277952] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/17/2010 09:25 PM]
November 17, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1277951] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/17/2010 09:21 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277949] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/17/2010 09:16 PM]
November 17, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1277948] by Jeffrey A. Rosen, P.C. and co-counsel Robert R. Gasaway, Jeffrey Bossert Clark, William H. Burgess, Robin S. Conrad on behalf of Petitioner Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/17/2010 09:11 PM]
November 17, 2010 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1277941] by Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:56 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277940] by Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:55 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1277939] by Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:54 PM]
November 17, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1277938] by Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:53 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277937] by Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1239] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:52 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1277936] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1245] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:39 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277935] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1245] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:36 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277934] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1245] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:35 PM]
November 17, 2010 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1277931] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [09-1322] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:18 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277929] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1234] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:14 PM]
November 17, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1277927] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1234] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:13 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1277926] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [09-1322] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:12 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277925] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1234] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 11/17/2010 05:08 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277914] by Competitive Enterprise Institute, Freedomworks and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1318 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1318] (Bader, Hans) [Entered: 11/17/2010 04:48 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277906] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1321] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 11/17/2010 04:34 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277903] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1321] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 11/17/2010 04:31 PM]
November 17, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1277894] to statement [ # 1277879-2 ] filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. [10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/17/2010 04:11 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277880] by Commonwealth of Virginia [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/17/2010 03:12 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277879] by Commonwealth of Virginia [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1319] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 11/17/2010 03:06 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1277875] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1281] (Clay, John) [Entered: 11/17/2010 02:57 PM]
November 17, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277871] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1281, 09-1322]--[Edited 11/18/2010 by LMC] (Clay, John) [Entered: 11/17/2010 02:53 PM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277869] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1281 [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1281] (Clay, John) [Entered: 11/17/2010 02:33 PM]
November 17, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1277849] by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1320] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 11/17/2010 11:40 AM]
November 17, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1277848] by Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 11/17/2010 ] [10-1320] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 11/17/2010 11:36 AM]
November 16, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1277634] granting in part and denying in part motion for coordination of related cases: granting request to designate cases complex; denying request to assign cases to single panel for all purposes [granting motions to consolidate No. 10-1073 et al. with 10-1131 et al.; dening motion to consolidate 09-1018 et al. with 10-1073 et al.; granting motion to hold cases 10-1115 and 10-1215 in abeyance and to sever claim in No. 10-1025 and hold in abeyance; relevant claim in 10-1205 involving timing issues severed and assigned separate docket number, No. 10-1388; Nos. 10-1115, 10-1215 and 10-1388 consolidated with 09-1018 et al. and held in abeyance pending further order of the court. deferring consideration of motion for phased briefing by Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers. Before Judges: Henderson, Garland and Brown. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Note: order also entered in case Nos. 09-1018 et al., 10-1073 et al., 10-1092 et al. and 10-1131 et al. ] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 11/16/2010 11:20 AM]
November 15, 2010 LETTER FILED [1277541] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 11/15/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 11/15/2010 05:24 PM]
November 15, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1277479] unconsolidating case [10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321 (Consolidation termed 11/15/2010) with 10-1234; 10-1234 (Pending Consolidation termed 11/15/2010) with 09-1322; 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321 (Pending Consolidation started 11/15/2010) with 10-1234], consolidating cases 10-1234 (Consolidation started 11/15/2010) with 09-1322; RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/01/2010 [10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 11/15/2010 03:43 PM]
November 12, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1265428-4 ] is filed [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 11/12/2010 03:08 PM]
November 12, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1277208] granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1265135-2 ] in 10-1234; granting motion for leave to file response to motion for coordination of related cases [ # 1265423-2 ] in 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245. The Clerk is directed to file response [ # 1265428-4 ] in 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245 [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] [Entered: 11/12/2010 02:52 PM]
November 12, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1268688-4 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] [Entered: 11/12/2010 02:39 PM]
November 12, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1277198] granting motions for leave to file environmental intervenors' response [ # 1268682-2 ] and to extend time [ # 1267762-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to file response [ # 1268688-4 ] in 09-1322 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] [Entered: 11/12/2010 02:34 PM]
November 8, 2010 REPLY FILED [1276368] by Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc. to response [ # 1274378-2 ] [Service Date: 11/08/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 21-30. [09-1322] (Groten, Eric) [Entered: 11/08/2010 08:18 PM]
November 8, 2010 REPLY FILED [1276361] by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041 to response [ # 1274378-2 ], [ # 1274847-2 ] [Service Date: 11/08/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [10-1041, 09-1322] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 11/08/2010 06:18 PM]
November 8, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1276251] by David B. Rivkin, Jr. and co-counsel Mark W. DeLaquil Andrew M. Grossman on behalf of Petitioners Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041. [10-1041, 09-1322] (Grossman, Andrew) [Entered: 11/08/2010 04:00 PM]
November 5, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1275834] by Pacific Legal Foundation [Service Date: 11/05/2010 ] [10-1310] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 11/05/2010 12:31 PM]
November 5, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1275831] by Pacific Legal Foundation [Service Date: 11/05/2010 ] [10-1310] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 11/05/2010 12:28 PM]
November 4, 2010 SUPPLEMENT [1275628] to response [ # 1274378-2 ] filed by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 [Service Date: 11/04/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 11/04/2010 03:31 PM]
November 2, 2010 REPLY FILED [1275110] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 to response [ # 1274563-2 ] [Service Date: 11/02/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1239] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 11/02/2010 07:30 PM]
November 1, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1274847] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ] [Service Date: 11/01/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 11/01/2010 11:14 PM]
October 29, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1274563] by EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1030, EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to motion for leave to file [ # 1274456-2 ] [Service Date: 10/29/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 10/29/2010 04:47 PM]
October 29, 2010 MOTION filed [1274456] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2010) [Service Date: 10/28/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/29/2010 11:52 AM]
October 29, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--RESPONSE IN SUPPORT LODGED [1274454] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] [Service Date: 10/28/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046]--[Edited 11/10/2010 by MAL] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/29/2010 11:48 AM]
October 28, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1274378] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] [Service Date: 10/28/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 10/28/2010 11:45 PM]
October 28, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1274372] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America to withdraw attorney Amar D. Sarwal who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1235 [Service Date: 10/28/2010 ] [10-1235] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/28/2010 05:49 PM]
October 28, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1274362] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America to withdraw attorney Amar D. Sarwal who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 [Service Date: 10/28/2010 ] [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/28/2010 05:07 PM]
October 28, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION filed [1274359] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, 10-1235 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2010) [Service Date: 10/28/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321]--[Edited 10/29/2010 by MAL] (Parrish, Ashley) [Entered: 10/28/2010 05:02 PM]
October 28, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION filed [1274338] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 for leave to file response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2010) [Service Date: 10/28/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046]--[Edited 10/29/2010 by MAL] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 10/28/2010 04:29 PM]
October 26, 2010 CORRECTED MOTION filed [1273827] by EPA in 10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/08/2010), to extend time to file certified index (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/08/2010) [Service Date: 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 10/26/2010 05:12 PM]
October 26, 2010 MOTION filed [1273770] by EPA in 10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1320, 10-1319, 10-1321 to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/08/2010), to extend time to file certified index (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/08/2010) [Service Date: 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 10/26/2010 03:15 PM]
October 25, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1273604] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 10-1234, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc. and Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. in 10-1239 to extend time to file initial submissions to 11/17/2010. Pages: 1-10. [10-1234, 10-1239] (Elwood, John) [Entered: 10/25/2010 07:44 PM]
October 25, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1273418] by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center to withdraw attorney Karen R. Harned who represented National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in 09-1322 [Service Date: 10/20/2010 ] [09-1322] (Gaudio, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/25/2010 11:11 AM]
October 18, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1272015] consolidating cases 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321 (Consolidation started 10/18/2010) with 10-1234; directing party to file in 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 11/17/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 11/17/2010 [10-1234, 10-1318, 10-1319, 10-1320, 10-1321] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 10/18/2010 10:52 AM]
October 15, 2010 REPLY FILED [1271845] by Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 09-1322, 10-1234 to response [ # 1271151-2 ],[ # 1271151-3 ] [Service Date: 10/15/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 10/15/2010 01:27 PM]
October 14, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1269183-2 ], response [ # 1269211-2 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310] [Entered: 10/14/2010 05:38 PM]
October 14, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310] [Entered: 10/14/2010 04:43 PM]
October 14, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1271659] granting motion to exceed page limits [ # 1264132-2 ] The Clerk is directed to file lodged motions to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ] [ # 1266030-2 ] denying in part motion to strike document [ # 1270369-2 ] granting in part motion to strike document [ # 1270369-2 ] The Clerk is directed to file responses in support of motions for stay. Further Ordered that the following format and schedule shall apply to the briefing of stay motions in these cases: Consolidated response of respondents to motion to stay and to responses in support of motion to stay (not to exceed 100 pages) due 10/28/2010. Joint response of state and environmental intervenors to motions to stay and to responses in support of motions to stay (not to exceed 50 pages) Responses due on 11/01/2010. Joint response of auto industry intervenors to motions to stay and to response in support of motions to stay (not to exceed 20 pages) Responses due 11/1/10. Replies in support of motions to stay (not to exceed a combined total of 50 pages, allocated as stay movants see fit) Reply to responses due 11/08/2010. Before Judges: Rogers, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310] [Entered: 10/14/2010 04:28 PM]
October 12, 2010 REPLY FILED [1271151] by National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1268688-3 ],[ # 1268688-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 10/22/2010) [Service Date: 10/12/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [10-1024, 09-1322, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1044] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 10/12/2010 04:39 PM]
October 12, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1270927] by Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042 to motion to strike responses to motions for stay [ # 1270369-2 ] [Service Date: 10/12/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1042] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 10/12/2010 10:35 AM]
October 8, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1270725] consolidating cases 10-1310 (Consolidation started 10/08/2010) with 10-1234; directing petitioner in in 10-1310 to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 11/08/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 11/08/2010 [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281, 10-1310] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 10/08/2010 02:42 PM]
October 7, 2010 MOTION filed [1270369] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046 to strike the response (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/21/2010), seeking Order striking certain responses in support of stay motions and prohibiting filing of further such responses in support. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/21/2010) [Service Date: 10/07/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 10/07/2010 01:07 PM]
October 6, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1270083] by Ann Brewster Weeks and co-counsel Helen D. Silver on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Conservation Law Foundation. [10-1234] (Silver, Helen) [Entered: 10/06/2010 10:35 AM]
October 6, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1270071] by Ann Brewster Weeks and co-counsel Helen D. Silver on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Conservation Law Foundation. [09-1322] (Silver, Helen) [Entered: 10/06/2010 10:23 AM]
October 5, 2010 CORRECTED REPLY FILED [1269823] by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, 10-1234 to response [1269741-2] [Service Date: 10/05/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1234] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 10/05/2010 11:49 AM]
October 4, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--(Corrected reply filed on 10/5/10) REPLY FILED [1269741] by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322, 10-1234 to response [ # 1267771-2 ],[ # 1267771-3 ] [Service Date: 10/04/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281]--[Edited 10/06/2010 by HTS] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 10/04/2010 10:55 PM]
September 30, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1269211] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042 to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] [Service Date: 09/30/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [10-1042]--[Edited 10/01/2010 by HTS] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 09/30/2010 06:09 PM]
September 30, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--RESPONSE IN SUPPORT LODGED [1269183] by Haley Barbour, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of South Dakota in 09-1322, State of Alabama in 10-1039 to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ] [Service Date: 09/30/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1039]--[Edited 10/01/2010 by MAL] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 09/30/2010 04:13 PM]
September 30, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1269141] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1266100-2 ] [Service Date: 09/30/2005 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 09/30/2010 03:02 PM]
September 30, 2010 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1269137] by Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025 to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1266030-2 ] [Service Date: 09/30/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [10-1025, 10-1041] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 09/30/2010 02:58 PM]
September 29, 2010 REPLY FILED [1268983] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1265743-3 ],[ # 1265743-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 10/12/2010) [Service Date: 09/29/2010 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Melnick, Marc) [Entered: 09/29/2010 06:20 PM]
September 28, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1268688] to combined with a MOTION FILED by Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 09/28/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322] (Segall, Craig) [Entered: 09/28/2010 06:11 PM]
September 28, 2010 MOTION filed [1268682] by Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club for leave to file motion (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/12/2010) [Service Date: 09/28/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Segall, Craig) [Entered: 09/28/2010 05:44 PM]
September 28, 2010 REPLY FILED [1268679] by EPA in 09-1322 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1265242-3 ],[ # 1265242-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 10/08/2010) [Service Date: 09/28/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 09/28/2010 05:34 PM]
September 28, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1268665] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 to motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1266100-2 ] [Service Date: 09/28/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 09/28/2010 04:59 PM]
September 27, 2010 REPLY FILED [1268403] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281 to response [Service Date: 09/27/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 09/27/2010 04:26 PM]
September 24, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1267946] by Margaret I. Olson on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner State of North Dakota. [09-1322] (Olson, Margaret) [Entered: 09/24/2010 02:22 PM]
September 23, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT--REPLY FILED [1267776] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1235, Michele Bachmann, Marsha Blackburn, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Dan Burton, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J&M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steve King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shadegg, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1239 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1265428-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 10/04/2010) [Service Date: 09/23/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281]]--[Edited 09/27/2010 by LMC (Burgess, William) [Entered: 09/23/2010 11:21 PM]
September 23, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT AND PARTY FILER--REPLY FILED TO RESPONSE AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED [1267771] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046, by Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045 to response RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1265438-4 ], [ # 1265248-2 ], [ # 1265242-4 ], [ # 1265206-2 ] [Service Date: 09/23/2010 by US Mail] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046]--[Edited 09/24/2010 by LMC]--[Edited 09/27/2010 by HTS] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 09/23/2010 10:58 PM]
September 23, 2010 MOTION filed [1267762] by Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 09-1322 to extend time to file response to 09/28/2010. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/07/2010) [Service Date: 09/23/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 09/23/2010 07:03 PM]
September 23, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1267729] by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041 to motion [ # 1265200-3 ], motion concerning briefing format [ # 1265200-2 ], motion [ # 1265743-3 ], motion concerning briefing format [ # 1265743-2 ] [Service Date: 09/23/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [10-1041, 09-1322] (Clay, John) [Entered: 09/23/2010 03:57 PM]
September 22, 2010 REPLY FILED [1267519] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044 to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [ # 1265743-3 ],[ # 1265743-2 ], [ # 1265200-3 ],[ # 1265200-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 10/04/2010) [Service Date: 09/22/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Webster, Timothy) [Entered: 09/22/2010 07:47 PM]
September 16, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1266240] by EPA in 10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281 to extend time to file initial submissions to 10/26/2010. [Service Date: 09/16/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [10-1234, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 09/16/2010 01:10 PM]
September 16, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1266207] by Jon M. Lipshultz and co-counsel Thomas Allen Lorenzen on behalf of Respondent EPA in 10-1234, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281. [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 09/16/2010 11:56 AM]
September 16, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1266205] by Jon M. Lipshultz and co-counsel Thomas Allen Lorenzen on behalf of Respondent EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 09/16/2010 11:54 AM]
September 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1266103] to motion to stay case [ # 1266089-2 ] filed by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. [10-1041] (Clay, John) [Entered: 09/15/2010 07:07 PM]
September 15, 2010 MOTION filed [1266100] by EPA in 09-1322 to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/30/2010) [Service Date: 09/15/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 09/15/2010 06:39 PM]
September 15, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--MOTION LODGED [1266089] by Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to stay underlying order in case Pages: Exceeds Limits. [10-1041]--[Edited 09/16/2010 by MAL] (Clay, John) [Entered: 09/15/2010 05:47 PM]
September 15, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--MOTION filed [1266030] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Landmark Legal Foundation in 10-1024, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/30/2010) [Service Date: 09/15/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046]--[Edited 09/16/2010 by HTS] (Phillips, Paul) [Entered: 09/15/2010 03:31 PM]
September 15, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1265848] consolidating cases 10-1281 (Consolidation started 09/15/2010) with 10-1234 [10-1234, 10-1235, 10-1239, 10-1245, 10-1281] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 09/15/2010 09:46 AM]
September 14, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265743] to motion to exceed page limits [ # 1264132-2 ], motion [ # 1265200-3 ], motion concerning briefing format [ # 1265200-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/27/2010)(Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/27/2010) combined with a MOTION FILED by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 concerning briefing format [Service Date: 09/14/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/14/2010 03:14 PM]
September 13, 2010 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265438] to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/27/2010) combined with a MOTION FILED by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to consolidate cases [Service Date: 09/13/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 09/13/2010 02:12 PM]
September 10, 2010 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1265261] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042 [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 09/10/2010 07:30 PM]
September 10, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265248] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046 to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ] [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 09/10/2010 06:26 PM]
September 10, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265242] to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/23/2010) combined with a MOTION FILED by National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038. [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 21-30. [10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1044] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 09/10/2010 05:56 PM]
September 10, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--(CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED ON 9/13/10). RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265207] to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/23/2010) combined with a MOTION FILED by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to consolidate cases [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046]--[Edited 09/15/2010 by HTS] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 09/10/2010 04:57 PM]
September 10, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265206] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 09-1322 to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ] [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Melnick, Marc) [Entered: 09/10/2010 04:56 PM]
September 10, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1265200] to motion to exceed page limits [ # 1264132-2 ](Reply to Response by Mail and Response to Cross Motion due on 09/23/2010) combined with a MOTION FILED by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046 concerning briefing format [Service Date: 09/10/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 09/10/2010 04:48 PM]
September 9, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1264965] considering order of docketing fee payment [ # 1230748-2 ] and order ifp in this Court [ # 1230748-3 ], dismissing case for lack of prosecution [10-1049 (Consolidation termed 09/09/2010) with 09-1322], withholding issuance of the mandate. [10-1049] [Entered: 09/09/2010 03:49 PM]
September 9, 2010 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1264861] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 to motion for other relief [ # 1262770-3 ], motion to assign cases to same panel [ # 1262770-2 ] [Service Date: 09/09/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1044, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 09/09/2010 12:46 PM]
September 3, 2010 MOTION filed [1264132] by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association in 10-1044, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, Gregory Wayne Abbott, Rick Perry, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041 to exceed page limits in motion (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/16/2010) [Service Date: 09/03/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [10-1044, 09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1045, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Webster, Timothy) [Entered: 09/03/2010 02:36 PM]
August 26, 2010 MOTION filed [1262770] by Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045, Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046 to assign cases on the same day and to same panel (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/10/2010), designation of cases as "complex" and assignment of related cases to a single panel for briefing, argument, and decision. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/10/2010) [Service Date: 08/26/2010 by US mail] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 08/26/2010 09:18 PM]
August 16, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1260696] granting motion to extend time [ # 1260299-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/15/2010 [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 08/16/2010 01:40 PM]
August 12, 2010 MOTION filed [1260299] by EPA in 10-1045 to extend time to file motion to 09/15/2010. Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 08/12/2010 08:44 PM]
July 23, 2010 RECEIPT [1257738] RECEIVED from William Orr [signed for on 07/10/2010] for documents [ # 1254864-2 ] sent to Petitioner William Orr [10-1049] [Entered: 07/28/2010 12:18 PM]
July 13, 2010 LETTER SENT [1254868] to warden sending order ifp prisoner submission[ # 1254864-2 ] . Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 08/12/2010 [10-1049] [Entered: 07/13/2010 02:39 PM]
July 13, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1254864] directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: PETITIONER prisoner trust account report due 08/12/2010. PETITIONER consent to collection form due 08/12/2010, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to petitioner by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [10-1049] [Entered: 07/13/2010 02:33 PM]
July 12, 2010 RESPONSE FILED [1254807] to order [ # 1249965-4 ] combined with a MOTION FILED by William Orr to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/22/2010) [Service Date: 07/09/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [10-1049] [Entered: 07/13/2010 01:11 PM]
July 7, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1253751] by Peter S. Glaser and co-counsel Mark E. Nagle on behalf of Petitioner American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026. [10-1026] (Nagle, Mark) [Entered: 07/07/2010 02:41 PM]
July 7, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1253748] by Peter S. Glaser and co-counsel Mark E. Nagle on behalf of Petitioner National Mining Association in 10-1024. [10-1024] (Nagle, Mark) [Entered: 07/07/2010 02:39 PM]
July 7, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1253739] by Peter S. Glaser and co-counsel Mark E. Nagle on behalf of Petitioner Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025. [10-1025] (Nagle, Mark) [Entered: 07/07/2010 02:29 PM]
June 28, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1252263] to notice to substitute attorney [ # 1252261-2 ] filed by Sierra Club in 09-1322. [09-1322] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 06/28/2010 03:58 PM]
June 28, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1252261] by Sierra Club in 09-1322 to substitute attorney [Service Date: 06/28/2010 ] [09-1322] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 06/28/2010 03:54 PM]
June 28, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1252257] by Joanne Spalding and co-counsel Craig Segall on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club in 09-1322. [09-1322] (Spalding, Joanne) [Entered: 06/28/2010 03:49 PM]
June 16, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1250245] denying motions for leave to adduce additional evidence [ # 1240105-2 ] [ # 1240105-3 ] [ # 1240064-2 ],[ # 1239917-2 ] [ # 1240145-2 ], Cases 09-1322,10-1045,10-1024,10-1025,10-1026,10-1044,10-1042,10-1035,10-1030,10-1036,10-1037,10-1038,10-1039,10-1040,10-1041,10-1046,10-1049 held in abeyance pending decision from proceedings at agency; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 08/16/2010 Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 06/16/2010 01:22 PM]
June 15, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1250067] by Donald M. Falk on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Falk, Donald) [Entered: 06/15/2010 07:03 PM]
June 15, 2010 LETTER SENT [1249976] to warden sending order of docketing fee payment[ # 1249965-2 ] . Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 07/15/2010 [10-1049] [Entered: 06/15/2010 01:59 PM]
June 15, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1249965] extending orders to show cause [ # 1230758-2 ] and docketing fee payment [ # 1230748-2 ]. PETITIONER payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis due 07/15/2010. Response to Order regarding dismissing case due 07/15/2010. Response may not exceed 20 pages. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to petitioner by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [10-1049] [Entered: 06/15/2010 01:44 PM]
June 15, 2010 LETTER FILED [1249845] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 to change party information [Service Date: 06/15/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 06/15/2010 09:17 AM]
June 14, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1249897] by William Orr advising the court of his change of address [Service Date: 06/15/2010 by Clerk] [10-1049] [Entered: 06/15/2010 11:26 AM]
June 10, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1249262] granting motion for leave to intervene. The motion is granted to the extent that the Portland Cement Association seeks to intervene in its own case No. 10-1046 [ # 1235109-2 ] in 09-1322 Before Judges: Rogers, Garland and Brown. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 06/10/2010 02:43 PM]
May 21, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1246050] to notice for other relief [ # 1246046-2 ] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 05/21/2010 03:44 PM]
May 21, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1246046] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322 Notification of Intention to Participate in Briefing. [Service Date: 05/21/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 05/21/2010 03:40 PM]
May 20, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1245724] by William J. Cobb III on behalf of Petitioners Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041. [10-1041, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Cobb, William) [Entered: 05/20/2010 11:05 AM]
May 19, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1245666] to statement [ # 1245665-2 ] filed by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association and Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce. [09-1322] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 05/19/2010 05:02 PM]
May 19, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1245665] by Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce, Associated Industries of Arkansas, Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry, Glass Packaging Institute, Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry, Independent Petroleum Association of America, Indiana Cast Metals Association, Louisiana Oil and Gas Association, Michigan Manufacturers Association, Mississippi Manufacturers Association, National Electrical Manufacturers Association, Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry, North American Die Casting Association, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association, Steel Manufacturers Association, Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry, The Ohio Manufacturers Association, Virginia Manufacturers Association, West Virginia Manufacturers Association and Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce [Service Date: 05/19/2010 ] [09-1322] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 05/19/2010 04:58 PM]
May 12, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1242759-2 ] is filed [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 05/12/2010 02:06 PM]
May 12, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1244327] granting motion to extend time [ # 1243389-2 ] in 09-1322,10-1040; The Clerk is directed to file response [ # 1242759-2 ] in 09-1322,10-1040 [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 05/12/2010 02:02 PM]
May 10, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1244023] to reply [ # 1244022-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 05/10/2010 09:32 PM]
May 10, 2010 REPLY FILED [1244022] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to response [ # 1242502-2 ], [ # 1242455-2 ], [ # 1242335-2 ] [Service Date: 05/10/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 1-10. [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 05/10/2010 09:27 PM]
May 10, 2010 REPLY FILED [1243955] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 to response [ # 1236245-2 ] [Service Date: 05/10/2010 by US mail, clerk] Pages: 1-10. [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 05/10/2010 03:50 PM]
May 10, 2010 REPLY FILED [1243893] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049 to response [ # 1242538-2 ], [ # 1242513-2 ], [ # 1242471-2 ], [ # 1242441-2 ], [ # 1241656-2 ] [Service Date: 05/10/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 05/10/2010 02:18 PM]
May 10, 2010 JOINT REPLY FILED [1243878] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 to response [ # 1242455-2 ] [Service Date: 05/10/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [10-1036, 10-1039] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 05/10/2010 01:06 PM]
May 5, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1243390] to motion to extend time [ # 1243389-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040, 09-1322] (Hudson, Virginia) [Entered: 05/05/2010 10:44 PM]
May 5, 2010 MOTION filed [1243389] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to extend time to file response to 04/30/2010. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/20/2010) [Service Date: 05/05/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [10-1040, 09-1322] (Hudson, Virginia) [Entered: 05/05/2010 10:42 PM]
May 5, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1243339] granting motions for leave to intervene for State of Michigan, et al. 09-1322] [Entered: 05/05/2010 03:07 PM]
May 5, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1243328] granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227110-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227053-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227011-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235051-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235302-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235587-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235611-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235616-2 ], granting motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235617-2 ] [09-1322] [Entered: 05/05/2010 02:16 PM]
May 3, 2010 NOTICE FILED [1242970] by State of Illinois to terminate attorney [Service Date: 05/03/2010 ] [09-1322] (Karr, Gerald) [Entered: 05/03/2010 03:44 PM]
April 30, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1242760] to response [ # 1242759-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040, 09-1322] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/30/2010 03:42 PM]
April 30, 2010 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT filed [1242759] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to motion for leave to adduce additional evidence [ # 1240105-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240105-3 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240064-2 ] [Service Date: 04/30/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 1-10. [10-1040, 09-1322]--[Edited 05/04/2010 by MAL]--[Edited 05/18/2010 by HTS] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/30/2010 03:41 PM]
April 30, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1242729] granting motion to extend time [ # 1242682-2 ]; reply to response [ # 1241656-2 ] to motion to hold in abeyance due 05/10/2010 [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 04/30/2010 03:07 PM]
April 30, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1242682] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049 to extend time to file reply to 05/10/2010. [Service Date: 04/30/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 04/30/2010 12:52 PM]
April 30, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1242579] granting motion of Great Waters Coalition to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1240187-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 04/30/2010 09:57 AM]
April 29, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242538] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030, Portland Cement Association in 10-1046 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail] Pages: 11-15. [10-1030, 10-1046] (Clark, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/29/2010 10:07 PM]
April 29, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1242514] to response [ # 1242513-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/29/2010 07:19 PM]
April 29, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242513] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 1-10. [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/29/2010 07:18 PM]
April 29, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242502] by Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Wetlands Watch in 09-1322 to motion to remand case [ # 1239917-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240064-2 ], motion for leave to adduce additional evidence [ # 1240105-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240105-3 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/29/2010 04:46 PM]
April 29, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242471] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035, Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 16-20. [10-1035, 10-1045] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 04/29/2010 04:02 PM]
April 29, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242455] by EPA in 09-1322 to motion for leave to adduce additional evidence [ # 1240105-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240105-3 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240064-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1239917-2 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 04/29/2010 03:39 PM]
April 29, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242441] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322, National Mining Association in 10-1024, Peabody Energy Company in 10-1025, American Farm Bureau Federation in 10-1026, Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037, American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038, Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality in 10-1041 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/29/2010 by US mail] Pages: 16-20. [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1041] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/29/2010 02:51 PM]
April 29, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1242335] by City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 09-1322 to motion to remand case [ # 1239917-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240064-2 ], motion for leave to adduce additional evidence [ # 1240105-2 ], motion to remand case [ # 1240105-3 ] [Service Date: 04/14/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322]--[Edited 05/05/2010 by HTS] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 04/29/2010 12:12 PM]
April 28, 2010 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1242323] RECEIVED from unreadable, assumed to be Bonner Cohen [signed for on 04/24/2010] for order [1241381-2] sent to Petitioner William Orr [10-1049] [Entered: 04/29/2010 11:50 AM]
April 28, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1242238] by Jeffrey A. Rosen, P.C. and co-counsel Jeffrey Bossert Clark on behalf of Petitioner Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030. [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/28/2010 07:37 PM]
April 28, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1242201] granting motion of Atlantic Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1239436-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 04/28/2010 04:03 PM]
April 28, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1242135] to response [ # 1241745-2 ] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Indiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 04/28/2010 02:27 PM]
April 28, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1242133] to response [ # 1241744-2 ] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 04/28/2010 02:22 PM]
April 27, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1241848] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 to motion to remand case [ # 1239917-2 ] [Service Date: 04/27/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/27/2010 11:36 AM]
April 26, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN SUPPORT FILED [1241745] by Haley Barbour, State of Indiana, State of Nebraska, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322 to motion to remand case [ # 1240064-2 ] [Service Date: 04/26/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041]--[Edited 05/05/2010 by HTS] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 04/26/2010 05:54 PM]
April 26, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1241744] by Haley Barbour, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/26/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041]--[Edited 05/05/2010 by HTS] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 04/26/2010 05:48 PM]
April 26, 2010 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1241656] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Alabama in 10-1039 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1240145-2 ] [Service Date: 04/26/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/26/2010 01:59 PM]
April 23, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1241437] by Morgan Butler on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Wetlands Watch in 09-1322. [09-1322] (Butler, Morgan) [Entered: 04/23/2010 02:39 PM]
April 23, 2010 FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1241382] of order [ # 1241339-2 ] to petitioner [10-1049] Mr. Orr. (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 04/23/2010 11:25 AM]
April 23, 2010 CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1241381] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7007-0710-0004-7189-8634] of order [ # 1241339-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/24/2010 from William Orr. [10-1049] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 04/23/2010 11:24 AM]
April 23, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1241339] extending time to respond to the court's orders of February 18, 2010; Responses to Order due 05/24/2010. Responses may not exceed 20 pages; Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to petitioner by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [10-1049] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 04/23/2010 10:14 AM]
April 22, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1241296] by Atlantic Legal Foundation in 10-1030 [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ] [10-1030, 09-1322] (Kaufman, Martin) [Entered: 04/22/2010 05:25 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240189] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1025] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 10:36 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240188] by National Mining Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1024] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 10:20 PM]
April 15, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1240187] by GREAT WATERS COALITION to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 04/16/2010 by HTS] (Sivas, Deborah) [Entered: 04/15/2010 10:14 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240186] by State of Alaska in 09-1322 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Mulder, Steven) [Entered: 04/15/2010 09:34 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240184] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1025] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:33 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240183] by National Mining Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1024] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:29 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240182] by National Mining Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1024] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:28 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240181] by Peabody Energy Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1025] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:26 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240180] by American Farm Bureau Federation [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1026] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:23 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1240179] to certificate [ # 1240149-2 ], statement [ # 1240148-2 ] filed by American Farm Bureau Federation. [10-1026] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 07:14 PM]
April 15, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1240178] by Robert R. Gasaway and co-counsel William H. Burgess IV on behalf of Petitioner Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030. [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:48 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1240177] to record [ # 1240175-2 ], statement [ # 1240174-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:48 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240176] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:46 PM]
April 15, 2010 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1240175] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:46 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1240174] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1040] (Oostdyk, Scott) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:44 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240173] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:44 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240172] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:42 PM]
April 15, 2010 LETTER FILED [1240171] by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 10-1030 regarding case status [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1030] (Burgess, William) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:41 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1240169] to statement [ # 1240167-2 ], statement [ # 1240166-2 ], certificate [ # 1240165-2 ] filed by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association. [10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:24 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240167] by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:16 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240166] by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:15 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240165] by American Petroleum Institute, Brick Industry Association, Corn Refiners Association, Inc., National Association of Home Builders, National Association of Manufacturers, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Petrochemical & Refiners Association and Western States Petroleum Association [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 04/15/2010 06:13 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240156] by Portland Cement Association in 10-1046 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1046] (Parrish, Ashley) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:37 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240154] by Portland Cement Association in 10-1046 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1046] (Parrish, Ashley) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:33 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240151] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1042] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:24 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240150] by Utility Air Regulatory Group in 10-1042 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1042] (Fichthorn, Norman) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:22 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240149] by American Farm Bureau Federation [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1026] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:15 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240148] by American Farm Bureau Federation [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1026] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:13 PM]
April 15, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240147] by American Farm Bureau Federation [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1026]--[Edited 04/16/2010 by LMF] DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240147] by [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1026] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:11 PM]
April 15, 2010 MOTION filed [1240145] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049 to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/29/2010) [Service Date: 04/15/2010 by email] Pages: 11-15. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 04/15/2010 05:02 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1240134] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [10-1036] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/15/2010 04:26 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240132] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/15/2010 04:24 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240118] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:36 PM]
April 15, 2010 MODIFIED EVENT--MOTION filed [1240105] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 to remand case for leave to adduce additional evidence. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/29/2010) [Service Date: 04/15/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 16-20. [10-1035, 09-1322]--[Edited 04/19/2010 by LMF] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:22 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240103] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:16 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240096] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:08 PM]
April 15, 2010 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1240093] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:05 PM]
April 15, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1240090] by Shannon L. Goessling and co-counsel Edward A. Kazmarek, Harry W. MacDougald on behalf of Petitioners Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035. [10-1035, 09-1322] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 03:03 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240089] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langboard, Inc. - OSB, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland in 10-1035 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:58 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240085] by Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1045] (Bader, Hans) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:54 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240079] by Competitive Enterprise Institute, FreedomWorks Foundation and Science and Environmental Policy Project in 10-1045 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045] (Bader, Hans) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:48 PM]
April 15, 2010 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1240065] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:22 PM]
April 15, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- JOINT MOTION filed [1240064] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 and State of Alabama in 10-1039 to remand case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/29/2010) [Service Date: 04/15/2010 by US mail] Pages: 16-20. [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 04/15/2010 by JMC] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:21 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1240063] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:20 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240060] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:14 PM]
April 15, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1240058] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 04/15/2010 02:11 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240016] by American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1038] (Thompson, Chet) [Entered: 04/15/2010 12:12 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240015] by American Iron and Steel Institute in 10-1038 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1038] (Thompson, Chet) [Entered: 04/15/2010 12:11 PM]
April 15, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1240014] by Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1037] (Thompson, Chet) [Entered: 04/15/2010 12:06 PM]
April 15, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1240012] by Gerdau Ameristeel Corp. in 10-1037 [Service Date: 04/15/2010 ] [10-1037] (Thompson, Chet) [Entered: 04/15/2010 12:04 PM]
April 14, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1239918] to motion to remand case [ # 1239917-2 ], certificate [ # 1239915-2 ], statement [ # 1239914-2 ] filed by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040. [10-1040, 09-1322] (Cabral, Neal) [Entered: 04/14/2010 06:48 PM]
April 14, 2010 MOTION filed [1239917] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 to remand case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/29/2010) [Service Date: 04/14/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 16-20. [10-1040, 09-1322] (Cabral, Neal) [Entered: 04/14/2010 06:43 PM]
April 14, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1239915] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1040] (Cabral, Neal) [Entered: 04/14/2010 06:36 PM]
April 14, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1239914] by Ohio Coal Association in 10-1040 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1040] (Cabral, Neal) [Entered: 04/14/2010 06:34 PM]
April 14, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1239912] by State of Alabama in 10-1039 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1039]--[Edited 04/15/2010 by SMC] (Tambling, Robert) [Entered: 04/14/2010 05:50 PM]
April 14, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1239908] by State of Alabama in 10-1039, Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036, State of Texas in 10-1041 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041]--[Edited 04/15/2010 by SMC] (Tambling, Robert) [Entered: 04/14/2010 05:07 PM]
April 14, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1239905] to notice [ # 1239862-2 ], statement [ # 1239868-2 ], statement [ # 1239872-2 ] filed by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. [10-1041] (Clay, John) [Entered: 04/14/2010 05:03 PM]
April 14, 2010 CORRECTED DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1239873] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1036] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/14/2010 03:25 PM]
April 14, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1239872] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1041] (Clay, John) [Entered: 04/14/2010 03:24 PM]
April 14, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1239868] by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1041] (Clay, John) [Entered: 04/14/2010 03:10 PM]
April 14, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1239862] by J. Reed Clay, Jr. on behalf of Petitioners Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, Barry Smitherman, State of Texas, Texas Agriculture Commission and Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. [10-1041] (Clay, John) [Entered: 04/14/2010 02:59 PM]
April 14, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1239799] granting motion of Landmark Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1239595-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 04/14/2010 11:41 AM]
April 14, 2010 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1239780] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1036] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/14/2010 11:00 AM]
April 14, 2010 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1239777] by Commonwealth of Virginia in 10-1036 [Service Date: 04/14/2010 ] [10-1036] (Getchell, Earle) [Entered: 04/14/2010 10:58 AM]
April 13, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1239595] by Landmark Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/13/2010 ] [10-1036, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 04/13/2010 by JMC] (Hutchison, Richard) [Entered: 04/13/2010 11:47 AM]
April 12, 2010 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION filed [1239436] by Atlantic Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae in support of petitioners. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/12/2010 ] [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 04/14/2010 by MAL] (Kaufman, Martin) [Entered: 04/12/2010 03:43 PM]
April 9, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1238959] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1238457-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 04/09/2010 09:00 AM]
April 8, 2010 LETTER SENT [1238923] regarding attorney membership to Ms. Karen R. Harned for National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center. Application for Admission due 05/10/2010. [09-1322] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 04/08/2010 04:34 PM]
April 7, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1238457] by National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/07/2010 ] [10-1030, 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Gaudio, Elizabeth) [Entered: 04/07/2010 09:32 AM]
March 31, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1237509] by David S. Baron on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund. [09-1322] (Baron, David) [Entered: 03/31/2010 01:37 PM]
March 31, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1237426] granting motion of Union of Concerned Scientists to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1234871-2 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 03/31/2010 09:25 AM]
March 30, 2010 REPLY FILED [1237385] by Portland Cement Association in 09-1322 to response [ # 1236245-2 ] [Service Date: 03/30/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1049] (Parrish, Ashley) [Entered: 03/30/2010 05:08 PM]
March 30, 2010 RESPONSE FILED [1237339] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company in 09-1322 to motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235302-2 ], motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235587-2 ] [Service Date: 03/30/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 03/30/2010 03:32 PM]
March 23, 2010 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1236318] to certificate [ # 1235618-2 ] filed by Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 03/23/2010 03:55 PM]
March 23, 2010 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1236245] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049 [Service Date: 03/23/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 03/23/2010 12:38 PM]
March 19, 2010 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1235860] to motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1235587-2 ] filed by Wetlands Watch in 09-1322. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Murray, Deborah) [Entered: 03/19/2010 04:37 PM]
March 18, 2010 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1235618] by Haley Barbour, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota and State of Utah in 09-1322 [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 03/18/2010 06:46 PM]
March 18, 2010 AMENDED MOTION filed [1235617] by State of Nebraska, Florida, Hawaii, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Govenor Haley Barbour for the State of Mississippi, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Utah for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 03/18/2010 06:41 PM]
March 18, 2010 MOTION filed [1235616] by Glass Packaging Institute and Aligned Industry Associations and Chambers of Commerce for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1044] (Paulson, Matthew) [Entered: 03/18/2010 06:01 PM]
March 18, 2010 MOTION filed [1235611] by State of Michigan - Attorney General Michael A. Cox for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1041] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 03/18/2010 05:21 PM]
March 18, 2010 MOTION filed [1235587] by Wetlands Watch for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Murray, Deborah) [Entered: 03/18/2010 04:24 PM]
March 18, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-MOTION WAS AMENDED--DISREGARD--MOTION filed [1235563] by State of Nebraska, Florida, Hawaii, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Govenor Haley Barbour for the State of Mississippi, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Utah for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/18/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1036, 10-1039, 10-1041]--[Edited 03/23/2010 by HTS] (Spohn, Katherine) [Entered: 03/18/2010 03:28 PM]
March 17, 2010 JOINT MOTION filed [1235302] by PennsylvaniaDEP and State of Minnesota for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] [Service Date: 03/17/2010 ] [09-1322] (Reiley, Robert) [Entered: 03/17/2010 02:03 PM]
March 16, 2010 MOTION filed [1235109] by Portland Cement Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/10/2010 ] [09-1322] (Parrish, Ashley) [Entered: 03/16/2010 12:27 PM]
March 15, 2010 MOTION filed [1235051] by State of Alaska for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/15/2010 ] [09-1322] (Mulder, Steven) [Entered: 03/15/2010 11:23 PM]
March 15, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1234936] granting motion to extend time [ # 1234633-2 ] to file initial submissions. All initial submissions and procedural motions due 4/15/10; all dispositive motions and certified index to record due 4/29/10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lister, Mary) [Entered: 03/15/2010 01:49 PM]
March 15, 2010 CORRECTED (as to PDF) MOTION filed [1234871] by UNION OF CONCERNED SCIENTISTS to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/15/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 03/15/2010 by HTS] (Kraham, Susan) [Entered: 03/15/2010 11:31 AM]
March 12, 2010 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD (MOTION CORRECTED ON 3/15)--MOTION filed [1234687] by Union of Concerned Scientists to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/12/2010 ] [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049]--[Edited 03/15/2010 by HTS] (Kraham, Susan) [Entered: 03/12/2010 12:59 PM]
March 12, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1234633] by EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049 to extend time to file initial submissions to 04/15/2010. [Service Date: 03/12/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 03/12/2010 10:57 AM]
March 11, 2010 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1234541] granting in part motion for leave to amend the petition for review [ # 1231096-2 ] in 10-1035 with respect to the first two requests; Denying in part motion for leave to name additional petitioners [ # 1231096-2 ] in 10-1035 [See Order for Details]. Judge Henderson, Tatel and Garland [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 03/11/2010 02:59 PM]
March 3, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1233068] by Jon M. Lipshultz and co-counsel Angeline Purdy on behalf of Respondent EPA in 09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, Respondents EPA and Lisa Perez Jackson in 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049. [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 03/03/2010 01:36 PM]
February 24, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1231781] granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1231452-2 ] in 09-1322 [09-1322, 10-1045, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 02/24/2010 11:18 AM]
February 22, 2010 MOTION filed [1231452] by Mountain States Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/22/2010 ] [09-1322] (Gallaway, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/22/2010 10:23 PM]
February 19, 2010 FIRST CLASS MAIL [1233306] RETURNED marked "Forwarding time expired". Mail had been sent to Petitioner Competitive Enterprise Institute. [10-1045]. They have moved. See private communication on 3/4/10. Order was resent to new address and docket updated. [Entered: 03/04/2010 02:25 PM]
February 19, 2010 MOTION filed [1231096] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, Horizon Freight System, Inc., J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Langdale, Inc. - OSB, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland for leave to file petition (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/04/2010) [Service Date: 02/19/2010 by US mail, email] Pages: 1-10. [10-1035] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 02/19/2010 03:27 PM]
February 19, 2010 LODGED Amended Petiton for Review (to add and dismiss parties)[1230959] by Michele Bachmann, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Collins Industries, Inc., Collins Trucking Company, Inc., Nathan Deal, Georgia Agribusiness Council, Inc., Georgia Motor Trucking Association, Inc., Phil Gingrey, Horizon Freight System, Inc., J & M Tank Lines, Inc., Kennesaw Transportation, Inc., Steven King, Jack Kingston, Langboard, Inc. - MDF, Langdale Chevrolet-Pontiac, Inc., Langdale Farms, LLC, Langdale Ford Company, Langdale Forest Products Company, Langdale Fuel Company, Langdale, Inc. - OSB, John Linder`, Tom Price, Dana Rohrabacher, John Shimkus, Southeast Trailer Mart, Inc., Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., The Langdale Company and Lynn Westmoreland to change party information [Service Date: 02/19/2010 ] [10-1035]--[Edited 02/19/2010 by TAG] (Kazmarek, Edward) [Entered: 02/19/2010 11:14 AM]
February 18, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1230768] consolidating cases 10-1030, 10-1035, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1042, 10-1046, and 10-1049 (Consolidation started 02/18/2010) with 09-1322; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/22/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/22/2010 [09-1322, 10-1042, 10-1035, 10-1030, 10-1036, 10-1037, 10-1038, 10-1039, 10-1040, 10-1041, 10-1046, 10-1049] [Entered: 02/18/2010 02:41 PM]
February 18, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1230586] consolidating cases 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044 (Consolidation started 02/18/2010) with 09-1322; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/22/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/22/2010 [09-1322, 10-1024, 10-1025, 10-1026, 10-1044] [Entered: 02/18/2010 09:23 AM]
February 17, 2010 CERTIFIED COPY [1230474] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1230329-2 ] [10-1045] [Entered: 02/17/2010 02:46 PM]
February 17, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1230466] consolidating cases 10-1045 (Consolidation started 02/17/2010) with 09-1322; Initial Submission Deadlines remain in effect for case 09-1322. directing party to file in 10-1045 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/19/2010. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 04/05/2010; directing party to file in 10-1045 initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/19/2010. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/19/2010. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 04/05/2010. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 04/05/2010 [09-1322, 10-1045] [Entered: 02/17/2010 02:18 PM]
February 3, 2010 RESPONSE FILED [1229130] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company to motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227110-2 ], motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227053-2 ], motion for leave to intervene. [ # 1227011-2 ] [Service Date: 02/03/2010 by US mail] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Bryson, John) [Entered: 02/03/2010 03:18 PM]
January 22, 2010 MOTION filed [1227110] by Conservation Law Foundation for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/22/2010 ] [09-1322] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 01/22/2010 06:13 PM]
January 22, 2010 JOINT MOTION filed [1227053] by National Wildlife Federation, Environmental Defense Fund, Sierra Club and Natural Resources Defense Council for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/22/2010 ] [09-1322] (O'Brien, Colin) [Entered: 01/22/2010 04:26 PM]
January 22, 2010 MOTION filed [1227011] by City of New York, State of Washington, State of Vermont, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, State of New Mexico, State of New Hampshire, State of Maryland, State of Maine, State of Iowa, State of Illinois, State of Delaware, State of Connecticut, State of California, State of Arizona and Commonwealth of Massachusetts for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 01/22/2010 ] [09-1322] (Iancu, Carol) [Entered: 01/22/2010 02:41 PM]
January 22, 2010 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1226873] granting motion to extend time [ # 1226659-2 ]; extending order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1222316-2 ] PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/15/2010. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/15/2010. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/29/2010. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 03/15/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/15/2010. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/15/2010. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/15/2010; extending order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1222316-3 ] RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/29/2010. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/15/2010. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/29/2010 [09-1322] [Entered: 01/22/2010 10:03 AM]
January 21, 2010 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1226659] by EPA to extend time to file initial submissions to 03/15/2010. [Service Date: 01/21/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-1322] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 01/21/2010 11:22 AM]
December 29, 2009 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1222778] by Jon M. Lipshultz on behalf of Respondent EPA. [09-1322] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 12/29/2009 03:50 PM]
December 28, 2009 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1222316] directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/27/2010. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 02/11/2010; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/27/2010. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/27/2010. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 02/11/2010. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 02/11/2010 [09-1322] [Entered: 12/28/2009 10:15 AM]
December 23, 2009 STATEMENT FILED [1222298] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, Rosebud Mining Company and EPA with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 12/23/2009 ] [09-1322] [Entered: 12/28/2009 09:57 AM]
December 23, 2009 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed [1222297] by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc., Great Northern Project Development, L.P., Industrial Minerals Association - North America, Massey Energy Company, National Cattlemen's Beef Association and Rosebud Mining Company of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 12/23/2009 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing [09-1322] [Entered: 12/28/2009 09:55 AM]
December 23, 2009 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [09-1322] [Entered: 12/28/2009 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Coalition for Responsible Reg v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Michigan Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Glass Packaging Institute
Represented By: Roger Romulus Martella Jr.
Represented By: Adam Jeffrey White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Utah
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Steven Robert Blair Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Colorado Association of Commerce & Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Max Hollister Kieley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wetlands Watch
Represented By: Morgan Wyatt Butler
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: The Ohio Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of New Hampshire
Represented By: Kelvin Allen Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: David D. Doniger
Represented By: John DuVal Walke Esquire
Represented By: Meleah Anne Geertsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: National Electrical Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of New York
Represented By: Yueh-Ru Chu Esquire
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Maine
Represented By: Gerald Donohue Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Nicola Scafetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Idaho Association of Commerce and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Indiana Cast Metals Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Washington
Represented By: Leslie Riley Seffern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Kimberly P. Massicotte
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Represented By: Donald Manwell Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James P. Wallace, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Benjamin M. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Michigan
Represented By: Neil David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Louisiana Oil and Gas Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Iowa
Represented By: David Robert Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: James Graham Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: America's Great Waters Coalition
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: George H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Megan Ceronsky
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal Esquire
Represented By: David S. Baron
Represented By: Vickie Lynn Patton
Represented By: Sean H. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Florida
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Represented By: Martin S. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Wayne Kevin Stenehjem
Represented By: Margaret I. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Virginia Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Represented By: Jon Cumberland Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Alaska
Represented By: Steven E. Mulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: William Happer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Kansas
Represented By: John William Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Union of Concerned Scientists
Represented By: Edward L. Lloyd Esquire
Represented By: Susan Jill Kraham Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Landmark Legal Foundation
Represented By: Mark Reed Levin
Represented By: Richard P. Hutchison Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Carol A. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of California
Represented By: Nicholas Stern
Represented By: Robert William Byrne Esquire
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Represented By: Marc Nathaniel Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Nebraska Chamber of Commerce and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Tennessee Chamber of Commerce and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Roy W. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: The Great Waters Coalition
Represented By: Robb William Kapla Esquire
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Associated Industries of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Oregon
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: North American Die Casting Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: George T. Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Kentucky
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Haley Barbour, Governor for the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Represented By: Gary Culley Rikard Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Maryland
Represented By: Mary E. Raivel
Represented By: Douglas Friend Gansler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Craig D. Idso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Indiana
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Vermont
Represented By: William H. Sorrell
Represented By: Thea J. Schwartz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Steel Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Sierra Club
Represented By: Joanne Marie Spalding
Represented By: Craig Holt Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wisconsin Manufacturers and Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthonly Finizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ClientEarth
Represented By: James Kevin Thornton
Represented By: Douglas Avery Ruley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: West Virginia Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Stephen Robert Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Illinois
Represented By: Gerald T. Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Represented By: Steven James Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Richard A. Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Neil David Gordon
Represented By: Katherine Jean Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mississippi Manufacturers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: The Kansas Chamber of Commerce and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony R. Lupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Don J. Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Joseph S. D'Aleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Portland Cement Association
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Cynthia Anne May Stroman
Represented By: Ashley Charles Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Timothy F. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Great Northern Project Development, L.P.
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coalition for Responsible Regulation, Inc.
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosebud Mining Company
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Industrial Minerals Association - North America
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Cattlemen's Beef Association
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alpha Natural Resources, Inc.
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massey Energy Company
Represented By: John Alan Bryson
Represented By: Eric A. Groten
Represented By: Paul David Phillips Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: John Thomas Hannon
Represented By: Jon M. Lipshultz
Represented By: Angeline Purdy
Represented By: Steven E. Silverman Esquire
Represented By: Thomas Allen Lorenzen
Represented By: Carol S. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?