American Lung Association, et al v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: American Lung Association and American Public Health Association
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, Administrator, Environmental Protection Agency and Jane Nishida, Acting Administrator
Intervenor: State of Kansas, Phil Bryant, Governor of the State of Mississippi, State of Texas, State of Ohio, State of Alabama, Indiana Utility Group, State of Missouri, Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of North Dakota, State of Georgia, Murray Energy Corporation, AEP Generation Resources Inc., Nevada Gold Energy LLC, America's Power, State of South Dakota, State of Louisiana, Indiana Energy Association, Georgia Power Company, State of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC, Appalachian Power Company, National Mining Association, State of Oklahoma, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, Kentucky Power Company, State of Nevada, State of Alaska, State of Indiana, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, AEP Generating Company, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, State of Wyoming, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, State of Utah, State of Montana, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Wheeling Power Company, State of Nebraska, State of Arkansas, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC and State of West Virginia
Amicus Curiae: City of Portland, Debra A. Haaland, Michael Oppenheimer, Edward J. Markey, Anna G. Eshoo, Katherine Mach, John Norris, Maximilian Auffhammer, Benjamin L. Cardin, Dianne Feinstein, Sisters of Mercy of the Americas, Eliot L. Engel, Brendan Kirby, Bobby Rush, Peter A. DeFazio, Steny H. Hoyer, Elizabeth Anne Moler, Andy Levin, Jesus G. Garcia, Environment America, Coalition on the Environment and Jewish Life, Detroit Mayor Mike Duggan, Joellen L. Russell, Suzanne Bonamici, Abigail Swann, Raul Ruiz, Town of Chapel Hill, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Doris Matsui, Lawrence H. Goulder, Peter Welch, Dallas Burtraw, Michael F. Bennet, Scott H. Peters, Charles B. Curtis, Kathy Fallon Lambert, Emanuel Cleaver, Mario J. Molina, Gernot Wagner, Paul Tonko, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, American Thoracic Society, U.S. Conference of Mayors, American College of Chest Physicians, City of Coral Gables, National Parks Conservation Association, Thomas R. Carper, National Association of Home Builders of the United States, Ted Lieu, Diana H. Wall, Harris County, Kim Cobb, City of Providence, Gerald Connolly, Dina Titus, Jared Huffman, Evangelical Environmental Network, Women of Reform Judaism, Kenneth J. Lutz, John P. Sarbanes, Joyce Beatty, Mark Pocan, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, Kevin Trenberth, Deborah Wasserman Schultz, Maryknoll Sisters, James C. McWilliams, Mayor of Salt Lake City, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Richard J. Lazarus, Prof., Union of Concerned Scientists, Yvette D. Clarke, Union for Reform Judaism, Kerry Emanuel, Donald S. Beyer, Jr., Mayor of the Borough of Glen Rock, Mike Levin, Kathy Castor, City of Phoenix, Colette Honorable, Pamela Matson,, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., National League of Cities, Jason Crow, City of Albuquerque, National Medical Association, City of New Orleans, Nora Mead Brownell, David Battisti, Nina Alexandra Mendelson, Grace Napolitano, James John Hoecker, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, City of Asheville, National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc., Michael F. Doyle, James E. Clyburn, County of Boulder, James D. McCalley, Earl Blumenauer, Nancy Pelosi, Sean Casten, Ronald Levin, Benjamin F. Hobbs, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Chellie Pingree, Brian Higgins, Steve Cohen, Town of Cutler Bay, Adriano Espaillat, Alan S. Lowenthal, Al Green, Debbie Dingell, A, Donald McEachin, Men of Reform Judaism, Rashida Tlaib, Philip Duffy, Jon Wellinghoff, Service Employees International Union, Frank Pallone, Jr., Nanette Diaz Barragan, Institute Leadership Team, City of Saint Paul, Daniel Farber, Prof., National Council of Churches USA, Alcee L. Hastings, City of Houston, Ann M. Kuster, Michael Greenstone, Marcy Kaptur, Darren Soto, Thomas C. Jorling, Noelle Eckley Selin, John Harte, Todd S. Aagaard, James Stock, Chris Van Hollen, City of Las Cruces, Ben Ray Lujan, Ed Perlmutter, James P. McGovern, Amelia Keyes, Julia Brownley, Hazon, Marc Veasey, Joe Neguse, Diana DeGette, Drew Shindell, City of Minneapolis, Mayor of City of Durham, Kathryn E. Kovacs, Attorney, Prof., Lisa Blunt Rochester,, Blake Emerson, Janice D. Schakowsky, Andrew E. Dessler, Sheldon Whitehouse, Senator, Ilhan Omar, National Trust for Historic Preservation, Norman C. Bay, City of Boston, Jose E. Serrano, Columbia Sportswear Company, Salud O. Carbajal, Eddie Bernice Johnson, City of Pittsburgh, Mike Quigley, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Michael MacCracken, American Academy of Allergy, Asthma, & Immunology, City of Santa Fe, Patagonia Works, Tony Cardenas, Raul M. Grijalva, Jerry McNerney, Daniel Kirk-Davidoff and Kenneth Gillingham
Case Number: 19-1140
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 19, 2021 Summary American Lung Association v. Environmental Protection Agency

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 PARTIAL MANDATE ISSUED to Environmental Protection Agency. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:37 PM]
February 26, 2021 PER CURIAM ORDER [1887414] filed granting Public Health & Environmental petitioners' bill of costs in the amount of $1,942.35 [ # 1883404-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:22 PM]
February 26, 2021 PER CURIAM ORDER [1887410] filed granting State and Municipal petitioners' bill of costs in the amount of $1,051.04 [ # 1883352-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1165. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:16 PM]
February 26, 2021 PER CURIAM ORDER [1887406] filed granting Biogenic CO2 Coalition petitioners' bill of costs in the amount of $774.18 [ # 1883250-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1185. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:09 PM]
February 24, 2021 NOTICE [1886793] to withdraw attorney Allison D. Wood who represented America's Power in 19-1140 filed by America's Power in 19-1140 [Service Date: 02/24/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 02/24/2021 12:41 AM]
February 22, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1886400] filed recalling partial mandate to agency [ # 1886390-2 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:39 AM]
February 22, 2021 [RECALLED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 02/22/2021] --PARTIAL MANDATE ISSUED to Environmental Protection Agency. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:12 AM]
February 22, 2021 PER CURIAM ORDER [1886386] ORDERED that the respondents' unopposed motion for a partial stay of issuance of the mandate be granted [ # 1885168-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of the mandate with respect to the vacatur of the Clean Power Plan Repeal Rule until the EPA responds to the courts remand in a new rulemaking action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to issue a partial mandate in the normal course as to the vacatur of the ACE Rule and the vacatur of the challenged timing provisions within the implementing regulations. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondents file status reports at 90-day intervals, beginning 90 days from the date of this order. Respondents are further directed to notify the court promptly upon completion of the agency rulemaking so that the remainder of the mandate may issue. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 02/22/2021 10:02 AM]
February 17, 2021 CORRECTED NOTICE [1885892] to terminate attorney filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 02/17/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:26 PM]
February 17, 2021 NOTICE [1885886] to terminate attorney filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 01/17/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:39 PM]
February 12, 2021 MOTION [1885168] for a partial stay of mandate filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (Service Date: 02/12/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 788 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:30 PM]
February 2, 2021 NOTICE [1883409] to withdraw attorney Matthew Thompson Cochenour who represented State of Montana in 19-1140 filed by State of Montana [Service Date: 02/02/2021 ] [19-1140] (Cochenour, Matthew) [Entered: 02/02/2021 06:37 PM]
February 2, 2021 BILL OF COSTS [1883404] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 02/02/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 02/02/2021 05:48 PM]
February 2, 2021 BILL OF COSTS [1883352] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165 [Service Date: 02/02/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:41 PM]
February 2, 2021 BILL OF COSTS [1883250] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 02/02/2021 ] [19-1185, 19-1140] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:31 AM]
January 31, 2021 CORRECTED NOTICE [1882946] to withdraw attorney Tomas Carbonell who represented Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1175, Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1176, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Defense Fund and Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1179 and Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1185 filed by Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 [Service Date: 01/31/2021 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Levitan, Benjamin) [Entered: 01/31/2021 11:06 PM]
January 29, 2021 NOTICE [1882937] to withdraw attorney Alejandra Nunez who represented Sierra Club in 19-1166 filed by Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1166] (Nunez, Alejandra) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:31 PM]
January 21, 2021 NOTICE [1880871] to withdraw attorney Jonathan Brightbill who represented Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, EPA in 19-1166, EPA in 19-1173, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1175, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1176, EPA in 19-1177, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1179, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1185, EPA in 19-1186, EPA in 19-1187 and EPA in 19-1188, Jeffrey Bossert Clark Sr. who represented Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, EPA in 19-1166, EPA in 19-1173, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1175, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1176, EPA in 19-1177, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1179, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1185, EPA in 19-1186, EPA in 19-1187 and EPA in 19-1188 filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:15 AM]
January 20, 2021 NOTICE [1880841] to withdraw attorney Tomas Carbonell who represented Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 filed by Environmental Defense Fund [Service Date: 01/20/2021 ] [19-1166] (Levitan, Benjamin) [Entered: 01/20/2021 07:22 PM]
January 20, 2021 NOTICE [1880807] to withdraw attorney Melissa Ann Hoffer who represented Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 19-1175 and Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 19-1176 filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 19-1165, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179 [Service Date: 01/20/2021 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:46 AM]
January 19, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1880547] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 01/19/2021 10:10 AM]
January 19, 2021 OPINION [1880546] filed PER CURIAM OPINION (Pages: 147); OPINION CONCURRING IN PART, CONCURRING IN THE JUDGMENT IN PART, AND DISSENTING IN PART (Pages: 38) by Judge Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 01/19/2021 10:08 AM]
January 19, 2021 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1880543] filed that the ACE Rule be vacated and remanded to the Agency; the amendments to the implementing regulations that extend the compliance timeline be vacated; the Coal Petitioners petitions for review be denied; and the Robinson Petitioners petition for review be dismissed for lack of standing, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:59 AM]
January 7, 2021 NOTICE [1878942] to substitute party filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188] (Tabak, Gabriel) [Entered: 01/07/2021 05:32 PM]
November 12, 2020 NOTICE [1870868] to withdraw attorney Shay Dvoretzky who represented The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 11/12/2020 ] [19-1179, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:56 PM]
October 26, 2020 RESPONSE [1868199] to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1866787-2 ], letter [ # 1866787-3 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/26/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 347 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 10/26/2020 10:50 PM]
October 26, 2020 TRANSCRIPT [1868068] of oral argument [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:14 PM]
October 16, 2020 LETTER [1866787] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/16/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:38 PM]
October 14, 2020 LETTER [1866078] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/14/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 10/14/2020 10:20 AM]
October 8, 2020 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Millett, Pillard and Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:00 PM]
October 1, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Mark W. DeLaquil, on behalf of Petitioner Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:20 PM]
October 1, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Meghan E. Greenfield, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, Respondent EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:35 PM]
October 1, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Jonathan D. Brightbill, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, Respondent EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Brightbill, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:31 PM]
October 1, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Lindsay See, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent State of West Virginia, AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Phil Bryant, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Indiana Utility Group, Kentucky Power Company, Mississippi Public Service Commission, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC and Wheeling Power Company in 19-1140, Intervenors for Respondent Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, Intervenors for Respondent International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 10/01/2020 11:56 AM]
September 30, 2020 NOTICE [1864225] concerning oral argument format filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/30/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/30/2020 07:06 PM]
September 30, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Benjamin Carlisle, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, Respondent EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:00 PM]
September 29, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Kevin Poloncarz, on behalf of Petitioners Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 09/29/2020 08:37 PM]
September 29, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sean H. Donahue, on behalf of Petitioners American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Petitioners Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Petitioner Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 09/29/2020 12:01 PM]
September 29, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Steven C. Wu, on behalf of Petitioners State of New York, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Philadelphia, City of New York, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Petitioner City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Wu, Steven) [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:06 AM]
September 29, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Michael J. Myers, on behalf of Petitioners City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, People of the State of Michigan, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Petitioner City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:57 AM]
September 29, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, James P. Duffy, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 09/29/2020 09:17 AM]
September 28, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Theodore Hadzi-Antich, on behalf of Petitioners Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:36 PM]
September 28, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863656] filed by Steven C. Wu on behalf of Petitioner State of New York in 19-1165. [19-1165, 19-1140] (Wu, Steven) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:14 PM]
September 28, 2020 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, David M. Williamson, on behalf of Petitioner Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-1140, 19-1185] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:04 AM]
September 25, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1863510] filed allocating oral argument time (see order for details). Directing parties to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 10/01/2020. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 09/25/2020 06:27 PM]
September 14, 2020 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged appendix [ # 1856469-2 ], appendix [ # 1856238-2 ] are filed [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:41 AM]
September 14, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1861235] filed granting petitioner Westmoreland Mining Holdings Company's motion to supplement the joint appendix [ # 1856227-2 ]; granting petitioner Biogenic CO2 Coalition's motion to supplement the deferred joint appendix [ # 1856455-2 ], The Clerk is directed to file the lodged appendices [ # 1856469-2 ], [ # 1856238-2 ]. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Walker. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:31 AM]
September 10, 2020 RESPONSE [1860916] to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1859588-2 ], letter [ # 1859588-3 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/10/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 332 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/10/2020 07:35 PM]
September 3, 2020 CORRECTED RESPONSE [1859892] to letter oral argument format [ # 1855060-2 ] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177, Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185, Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,363 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:12 PM]
September 3, 2020 JOINT RESPONSE [1859889] to letter oral argument format [ # 1855060-2 ] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177, Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185, Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,363 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:54 PM]
September 3, 2020 NOTICE [1859886] concerning oral argument format filed by State of North Dakota in 19-1140 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:21 PM]
September 3, 2020 JOINT RESPONSE [1859884] to letter [ # 1855060-2 ] filed by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Mississippi Public Service Commission, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Wheeling Power Company, Indiana Utility Group, State of South Carolina and State of Texas in 19-1140, Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 125 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 09/03/2020 07:47 PM]
September 3, 2020 NOTICE [1859882] concerning oral argument format filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/03/2020 07:15 PM]
September 3, 2020 LETTER [1859765] concerning oral argument format filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179, Robinson Enterprises, Inc., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Dalton Trucking, Inc., Norman R. Brown, Joanne Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1175] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 09/03/2020 12:16 PM]
September 2, 2020 LETTER [1859588] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 09/02/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:12 PM]
August 28, 2020 RESPONSE [1858886] to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1856940-3 ], letter [ # 1856940-4 ] filed by Appalachian Power Company in 19-1140, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185 [Service Date: 08/28/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 316. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:31 PM]
August 25, 2020 RESPONSE [1858284] to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1856940-3 ], letter [ # 1856940-4 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 349 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/25/2020 05:38 PM]
August 17, 2020 LETTER [1856940] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 08/17/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1179]--[Edited 08/19/2020 by SHA - Document Type Modified by the Clerk's Office] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:21 PM]
August 13, 2020 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856495] filed by Mr. Sheldon Whitehouse in 19-1140 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,472 words.. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Isaacson, Eric) [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:53 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856481] filed by American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2375 words.. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Tabak, Gabriel) [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:23 PM]
August 13, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX [1856469] lodged by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Phil Bryant, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Wheeling Power Company, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, EPA, Andrew Wheeler and State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and EPA in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, EPA and Indiana Energy Association in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., EPA and International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 19-1173, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc., Texas Public Policy Foundation and EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1175, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, EPA, Andrew Wheeler and Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, City and County of Denver Colorado and EPA in 19-1177, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, EPA, Andrew Wheeler and The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Biogenic CO2 Coalition and EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1185, Advanced Energy Economy and EPA in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association, Solar Energy Industries Association and EPA in 19-1187, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and EPA in 19-1188. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:08/13/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:45 PM]
August 13, 2020 ERRATA [1856463] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1838680-2 ], Intervenor brief [ # 1852053-2 ], Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1854310-2 ]. Reason for errata: correction of typographical errors in initial briefs. [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:13 PM]
August 13, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856461] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,197 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:03 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856459] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,429 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:00 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856458] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 10,127 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:57 PM]
August 13, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1856455] to supplement the appendix filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length Certification: 255. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:55 PM]
August 13, 2020 CORRECTED INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856454] filed by State of North Dakota in 19-1140 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4002 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:53 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856453] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,763. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:53 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856452] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 7,665. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:52 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856447] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 8,496 words. [19-1176, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:19 PM]
August 13, 2020 ADDENDUM [1856436] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 08/18/2020 by LMC] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:54 PM]
August 13, 2020 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1856431] to Appellee/Respondent final brief [ # 1856430-2 ] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date:08/13/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:35 PM]
August 13, 2020 CORRECTED RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856430] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 52,515 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:25 PM]
August 13, 2020 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856424] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 52,515 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:56 PM]
August 13, 2020 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856416] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 52,515 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:32 PM]
August 13, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856408] filed by State of North Dakota in 19-1140 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4002 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:57 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856397] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,000 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:11 PM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856396] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,962 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:09 PM]
August 13, 2020 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856393] filed by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Utility Group, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC, Wheeling Power Company, State of West Virginia, State of Alaska, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, Phil Bryant and Georgia Power Company in 19-1140, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 8634 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:48 AM]
August 13, 2020 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856359] filed by State of West Virginia, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, Phil Bryant, Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, National Mining Association, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, America's Power, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., Appalachian Power Company, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Wheeling Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Energy Association, Murray Energy Corporation, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC and Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1140, Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 9,015 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:37 AM]
August 13, 2020 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1856327] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,607 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:02 AM]
August 13, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856325] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,242 Words. [19-1140, 19-1176, 19-1179] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 08/13/2020 08:33 AM]
August 12, 2020 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856309] filed by Benjamin F. Hobbs, Brendan Kirby, Kenneth J. Lutz and James D. McCalley in 19-1140 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,461 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Horowitz, Cara) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:17 PM]
August 12, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856308] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2,247. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:09 PM]
August 12, 2020 CORRECTED PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856307] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,457. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:04 PM]
August 12, 2020 PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856301] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,457. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 08/12/2020 05:49 PM]
August 12, 2020 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1856253] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,565 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED EVENT-Edited 08/14/2020 by LMC] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:59 PM]
August 12, 2020 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1856252] to Appellant/Petitioner final brief [ # 1856250-2 ] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date:08/12/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:55 PM]
August 12, 2020 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1856250] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] Length of Brief: 13,414 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:47 PM]
August 12, 2020 JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX [1856238] lodged by State of Nevada, AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Phil Bryant, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Mississippi Public Service Commission, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC, Wheeling Power Company, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association and Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, EPA and Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166, 19-1173, Andrew Wheeler, EPA and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:08/12/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[Edited 08/13/2020 by LMC] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:12 PM]
August 12, 2020 MOTION [1856227] to supplement the appendix filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1140 (Service Date: 08/12/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 139 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/12/2020 12:47 PM]
August 6, 2020 JOINT APPENDIX [1855485] filed by State of Nevada, AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Phil Bryant, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Public Health Association, American Lung Association and Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, City of Los Angeles, City of Chicago, City of Boulder, City of New York, City of South Miami, City of Philadelphia, State of Wisconsin, State of Washington, State of Vermont, State of Rhode Island, State of Oregon, State of North Carolina, State of New York, State of New Mexico, State of New Jersey, State of Minnesota, State of Maine, State of Illinois, State of Hawaii, State of Delaware, State of Connecticut, State of California, People of the State of Michigan, DC, Commonwealth of Virginia, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts and EPA in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Environmental Defense Fund, Conservation Law Foundation, Clean Wisconsin, Clean Air Council and EPA in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. and EPA in 19-1173, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, State of Nevada, Andrew Wheeler, EPA and Texas Public Policy Foundation, Robinson Enterprises, Inc., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Dalton Trucking, Inc., Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition and Competitive Enterprise Institute in 19-1175, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, State of Nevada, Andrew Wheeler, EPA and Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, City and County of Denver Colorado and EPA in 19-1177, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, State of Nevada, Andrew Wheeler, EPA and The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. and Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1185, EPA in 19-1186, EPA and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187, EPA and Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated, Power Companies Climate Coalition, New York Power Authority, National Grid USA, Exelon Corporation and Consolidated Edison, Inc. in 19-1188. [Volumes: 5] [Service Date: 08/06/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/06/2020 10:43 PM]
August 4, 2020 LETTER [1855060] sent concerning oral argument format - Proposed formats due 09/03/2020. [ # 1854843-3 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 08/04/2020 05:35 PM]
August 3, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1854843] filed scheduling oral argument on Thursday, 10/08/2020. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 08/03/2020 05:36 PM]
July 31, 2020 NOTICE [1854601] to withdraw attorney Robert Johnson who represented The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 07/31/2020 ] [19-1179, 19-1140, 19-1176] (Johnson, Robert) [Entered: 07/31/2020 03:12 PM]
July 30, 2020 JOINT PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1854431] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,565 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:59 PM]
July 30, 2020 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1854430] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,000 Words. [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 07/30/2020 06:17 PM]
July 30, 2020 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1854330] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,242 words. [19-1179, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 07/30/2020 03:51 PM]
July 30, 2020 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1854310] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Conservation Law Foundation in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6424 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:58 PM]
July 30, 2020 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1854199] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,763. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:52 AM]
July 30, 2020 NOTICE [1854170] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 07/30/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 07/30/2020 09:02 AM]
July 29, 2020 NOTICE [1854135] to withdraw attorney Robert David Cheren who represented Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1140 and Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC and Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176 filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176 [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [19-1176, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 07/29/2020 06:55 PM]
July 28, 2020 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1853787] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 07/28/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2,247 words. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:27 PM]
July 16, 2020 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1852121] filed by City and County of Denver Colorado, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179 [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,607 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 07/16/2020 05:58 PM]
July 16, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1852108] filed by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Indiana Utility Group, Kentucky Power Company, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC, Wheeling Power Company, State of West Virginia, State of Alaska, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, Phil Bryant and Georgia Power Company in 19-1140, Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 8,635 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 07/16/2020 05:25 PM]
July 16, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1852093] filed by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Phil Bryant, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Georgia Power Company, Indiana Energy Association, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Mississippi Public Service Commission, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Nevada Gold Energy LLC, Nevada Gold Mines LLC, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC and Wheeling Power Company in 19-1140, Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 9,015 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 07/16/2020 04:51 PM]
July 16, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1852053] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185 [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,207 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lynch, Melissa) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:24 PM]
July 16, 2020 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1851999] filed by State of North Dakota in 19-1140 [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,002 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:23 PM]
July 14, 2020 NOTICE [1851625] to substitute attorney Howard M. Crystal substituted by Elizabeth A. Jones filed by Center for Biological Diversity in 19-1166, 19-1179, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1175 [Service Date: 07/14/2020 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1179, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1175] (Jones, Elizabeth) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:10 PM]
July 10, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1851103] filed granting the motion of amici curiae Local Government Coalition to continue the deadline for filing paper copies [ # 1849984-2 ]. Paper copies of the amici brief for the Local Government Coalition are now due September 8, 2020. [19-1140] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:23 PM]
July 2, 2020 MOTION [1849984] To continue deadline to file paper copies filed by City of Albuquerque, City of Asheville, City of Boston, City of Coral Gables, City of Houston, City of Las Cruces, City of Minneapolis, City of New Orleans, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Saint Paul, City of Santa Fe, County of Boulder, Detroit Mayor Mike Duggan, Harris County, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Mayor of City of Durham, Mayor of Salt Lake City, Mayor of the Borough of Glen Rock, National League of Cities, Town of Chapel Hill, Town of Cutler Bay and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (Service Date: 07/02/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 316 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 07/02/2020 11:49 AM]
June 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1848668] filed by Megan H. Berge and co-counsel Jared R. Wigginton on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Respondent National Association of Home Builders of the United States in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 06/23/2020 06:48 PM]
June 23, 2020 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1848667] filed by National Association of Home Builders of the United States in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 06/23/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,244. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 06/23/2020 06:41 PM]
June 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1848665] filed by Joseph A. Newberg, II on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Kentucky in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Newberg, Joseph) [Entered: 06/23/2020 06:04 PM]
June 16, 2020 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1847608] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 06/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 52,335 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 06/16/2020 06:17 PM]
June 12, 2020 ERRATA [1846920] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin and People of the State of Michigan in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1838735-2 ]. Reason for errata: Correction of citation and typographical errors. [Service Date: 06/12/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 06/12/2020 09:24 AM]
June 11, 2020 NOTICE [1846740] Withdraw the appearance of Margaret Claiborne Campbell, to substitute attorney Margaret Claiborne Campbell substituted by Angela Jean Levin and Melissa Horne filed by Georgia Power Company in 19-1140 [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Horne, Melissa) [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:51 AM]
May 15, 2020 NOTICE [1842898] to substitute attorney Roberta R. James substituted by Cynthia M. Weisz filed by Diana H. Wall in 19-1140, Diana H. Wall and State of Maryland in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 05/15/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Weisz, Cynthia) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:22 AM]
April 28, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1840273] filed by Emily C. Schilling and co-counsel Kristina (Tina) R. Van Bockern on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative. [19-1140] (Van Bockern, Kristina) [Entered: 04/28/2020 02:42 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839823] filed by Environment America and National Trust for Historic Preservation in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5802 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Sassman, Wyatt) [Entered: 04/24/2020 06:17 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839820] filed by Mr. Sheldon Whitehouse in 19-1140 amici curiae United States Senators: Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse, Sen. Jeff Merkley, Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand, Sen. Brian Schatz, Sen. Edward J. Markey [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,472 words [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Isaacson, Eric) [Entered: 04/24/2020 06:02 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1839812] filed by Norman C. Bay, Nora Mead Brownell, Charles B. Curtis, James John Hoecker, Colette Honorable, Elizabeth Anne Moler, John Norris and Jon Wellinghoff in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,869 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 06/03/2020 by LMC] (Konschnik, Katherine) [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:27 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1839799] filed by Dallas Burtraw, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., Amelia Keyes and Kathy Fallon Lambert in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,891 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Monast, Jonas) [Entered: 04/24/2020 05:04 PM]
April 24, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839792] filed by Eric Alan Isaacson - appearing for amici curiae U.S. Senators supporting State & Municipal Petitioners et al.: Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse; Sen. Jeff Merkley; Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand; Sen. Edward J. Markey on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Mr. Sheldon Whitehouse in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Isaacson, Eric) [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:45 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839772] filed by Nanette Diaz Barragan, Joyce Beatty, Michael F. Bennet, Donald S. Beyer, Jr., Earl Blumenauer, Suzanne Bonamici, Julia Brownley, Salud O. Carbajal, Tony Cardenas, Benjamin L. Cardin, Thomas R. Carper, Sean Casten, Kathy Castor, Yvette D. Clarke, Emanuel Cleaver, James E. Clyburn, Steve Cohen, Gerald Connolly, Jason Crow, Peter A. DeFazio, Diana DeGette, Debbie Dingell, Michael F. Doyle, Eliot L. Engel, Anna G. Eshoo, Adriano Espaillat, Dianne Feinstein, Jesus G. Garcia, Al Green, Raul M. Grijalva, Debra A. Haaland, Alcee L. Hastings, Brian Higgins, Steny H. Hoyer, Jared Huffman, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Marcy Kaptur, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Ann M. Kuster, Andy Levin, Mike Levin, Ted Lieu, Alan S. Lowenthal, Ben Ray Lujan, Edward J. Markey, Doris Matsui, A, Donald McEachin, James P. McGovern, Jerry McNerney, Grace Napolitano, Joe Neguse, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Ilhan Omar, Frank Pallone, Jr., Nancy Pelosi, Ed Perlmutter, Scott H. Peters, Chellie Pingree, Mark Pocan, Mike Quigley, Lisa Blunt Rochester,, Raul Ruiz, Bobby Rush, John P. Sarbanes, Janice D. Schakowsky, Jose E. Serrano, Darren Soto, Dina Titus, Rashida Tlaib, Paul Tonko, Chris Van Hollen, Marc Veasey, Deborah Wasserman Schultz and Peter Welch in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 3,738 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 06/08/2020 by LMC] (Gorod, Brianne) [Entered: 04/24/2020 04:07 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839766] filed by Service Employees International Union [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5787 Words. [19-1140] (Gerni, Renee) [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:54 PM]
April 24, 2020 NOTICE [1839764] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Gorod, Brianne) [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:51 PM]
April 24, 2020 NOTICE [1839760] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Former Commissioners of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Charles B. Curtis, Elizabeth A. Moler, James J. Hoecker, Nora Mead Brownell, Jon Wellinghoff, John Norris, Norman C. Bay, and Colette D. Honorable [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Konschnik, Katherine) [Entered: 04/24/2020 03:37 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839719] filed by Prof. Michael Greenstone in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,466 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Templeton, Mark) [Entered: 04/24/2020 01:36 PM]
April 24, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839716] filed by Michael Burger on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner City of Albuquerque, City of Asheville, City of Boston, City of Coral Gables, City of Houston, City of Las Cruces, City of Minneapolis, City of New Orleans, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Saint Paul, City of Santa Fe, County of Boulder, Detroit Mayor Mike Duggan, Harris County, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Mayor of City of Durham, Mayor of Salt Lake City, Mayor of the Borough of Glen Rock, National League of Cities, Town of Chapel Hill, Town of Cutler Bay and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 04/24/2020 01:28 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839705] filed by Columbia Sportswear Company and Patagonia Works in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,499 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Shenkman, Ethan) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:57 PM]
April 24, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839693] filed by Renee M. Gerni and co-counsel Nicole G. Berner on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Service Employees International Union. [19-1140] (Gerni, Renee) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:11 PM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839691] filed by Maximilian Auffhammer, Philip Duffy, Kenneth Gillingham, Lawrence H. Goulder, James Stock, Union of Concerned Scientists and Gernot Wagner in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6424 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:52 AM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1839668] filed by Central Conference of American Rabbis, Coalition on the Environment and Jewish Life, Evangelical Environmental Network, Hazon, Institute Leadership Team, Maryknoll Sisters, Men of Reform Judaism, National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc., National Council of Churches USA, Sisters of Mercy of the Americas, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,721 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Steffes, Keri) [Entered: 04/24/2020 11:04 AM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839641] filed by City of Asheville, City of Boston, City of Coral Gables, City of Houston, City of Las Cruces, City of Minneapolis, City of New Orleans, City of Phoenix, City of Pittsburgh, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Saint Paul, City of Santa Fe, County of Boulder, Detroit Mayor Mike Duggan, Harris County, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Mayor of City of Durham, Mayor of Salt Lake City, Mayor of the Borough of Glen Rock, National League of Cities, Town of Chapel Hill, Town of Cutler Bay and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,499 worfs. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/24/2020 by LMC] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:10 AM]
April 24, 2020 NOTICE [1839640] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National League of Cities, et al. [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/24/2020 by LMC] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 04/24/2020 10:04 AM]
April 24, 2020 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1839624] filed by David Battisti, Kim Cobb, Andrew E. Dessler, Kerry Emanuel, John Harte, Daniel Kirk-Davidoff, Michael MacCracken, Katherine Mach, Pamela Matson,, James C. McWilliams, Mario J. Molina, Michael Oppenheimer, Joellen L. Russell, Noelle Eckley Selin, Drew Shindell, Abigail Swann, Kevin Trenberth and Diana H. Wall in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/24/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,701 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/24/2020 by LMC] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:05 AM]
April 24, 2020 SUPPLEMENT [1839623] to notice to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1839350-3 ] filed by 19-1188 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:03 AM]
April 23, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1839619] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,474 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 04/23/2020 10:20 PM]
April 23, 2020 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839614] filed by American Academy of Allergy, Asthma, & Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American Thoracic Society and National Medical Association in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 Hope M. Babcock [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,475. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Babcock, Hope) [Entered: 04/23/2020 05:40 PM]
April 23, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839544] filed by Benjamin F. Hobbs, Brendan Kirby, Kenneth J. Lutz and James D. McCalley in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,470 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Horowitz, Cara) [Entered: 04/23/2020 02:07 PM]
April 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839537] filed by Jonas J. Monast on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner Dallas Burtraw, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr., Amelia Keyes and Kathy Fallon Lambert in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Monast, Jonas) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:46 PM]
April 23, 2020 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1839536] filed by American Academy of Allergy, Asthma, & Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American Thoracic Society and National Medical Association in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,475 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by LMC] (Babcock, Hope) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:37 PM]
April 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839518] filed by Hope M. Babcock on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner American Academy of Allergy, Asthma, & Immunology, American College of Chest Physicians, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American Thoracic Society and National Medical Association in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Babcock, Hope) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:35 PM]
April 23, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839444] filed by Ethan G. Shenkman and co-counsel Stephen K. Wirth on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner Patagonia Works and Columbia Sportswear Company in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Shenkman, Ethan) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:15 AM]
April 22, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1839431] filed by Prof. Todd S. Aagaard, Prof. Blake Emerson, Daniel Farber, Kathryn E. Kovacs, Richard J. Lazarus, Ronald Levin and Ms. Nina Alexandra Mendelson in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/22/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,491 words.. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Sivas, Deborah) [Entered: 04/22/2020 08:16 PM]
April 22, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839430] filed by Deborah A. Sivas and co-counsel Matthew J. Sanders on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner Prof. Todd S. Aagaard, Prof. Blake Emerson, Daniel Farber, Kathryn E. Kovacs, Richard J. Lazarus, Ronald Levin and Ms. Nina Alexandra Mendelson in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Sivas, Deborah) [Entered: 04/22/2020 07:40 PM]
April 22, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839361] filed by Richard L. Revesz and co-counsel Jack Lienke on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. [19-1140] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:35 PM]
April 22, 2020 NOTICE [1839350] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by [Service Date: 04/22/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 04/23/2020 by LMC] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:17 PM]
April 22, 2020 NOTICE [1839333] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Benjamin F. Hobbs, Brendan Kirby, Kenneth J. Lutz, and James D. McCalley [Service Date: 04/22/2020] [MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Service Date: 04/22/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Horowitz, Cara) [Entered: 04/22/2020 01:52 PM]
April 22, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839275] filed by Mark Norman Templeton and co-counsel Robert Adam Weinstock, Alexander Valdes (U.Chicago clinical law student), and Benjamin Nickerson (U.Chicago clinical law student) on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Prof. Michael Greenstone in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Templeton, Mark) [Entered: 04/22/2020 11:48 AM]
April 22, 2020 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1839261] filed by Coalition to Protect America's National Parks and National Parks Conservation Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/22/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,491 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Pacyniak, Gabriel) [Entered: 04/22/2020 11:17 AM]
April 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839140] filed by Allison D. Wood on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent America's Power in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 04/21/2020 04:59 PM]
April 21, 2020 NOTICE [1839072] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Kathy Fallon Lambert, Amelia Keyes, Charles T. Driscoll, Jr. and Dallas Burtraw in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/21/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Monast, Jonas) [Entered: 04/21/2020 12:43 PM]
April 21, 2020 NOTICE [1839060] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc., Central Conference of American Rabbis, Men of Reform Judaism, Women of Reform Judaism, Union for Reform Judaism, Institute Leadership Team, Sisters of Mercy of the Americas, Maryknoll Sisters, Hazon, Coalition on the Environment and Jewish Life, Evangelical Environmental Network and National Council of Churches USA in 19-1140 [Service Date: 04/21/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Steffes, Keri) [Entered: 04/21/2020 12:13 PM]
April 21, 2020 NOTICE [1839052] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Professor Michael Greenstone [Service Date: 04/21/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Templeton, Mark) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:49 AM]
April 20, 2020 NOTICE [1838945] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Senator Sheldon Whitehouse [Service Date: 04/20/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Isaacson, Eric) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:52 PM]
April 20, 2020 NOTICE [1838941] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Service Employees International Union [Service Date: 04/21/2020 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Gerni, Renee) [Entered: 04/20/2020 09:14 PM]
April 20, 2020 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1838934] filed by Mr. Thomas C. Jorling in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/20/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,890 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Lamm, Theodore) [Entered: 04/20/2020 06:30 PM]
April 20, 2020 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-- CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1838836] filed by Mr. Thomas C. Jorling in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/20/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5,890 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[Edited 04/22/2020 by LMC] (Lamm, Theodore) [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:23 PM]
April 17, 2020 PETITIONER BRIEF [1838745] filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2373 words. [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 04/17/2020 11:06 PM]
April 17, 2020 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1838737] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1838735-2 ] [Service Date:04/17/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 04/17/2020 06:12 PM]
April 17, 2020 JOINT APPELLANT BRIEF [1838735] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 13,414 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 04/17/2020 05:46 PM]
April 17, 2020 NOTICE [1838729] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Patagonia Works and Columbia Sportswear Company [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/20/2020 by LMC] (Shenkman, Ethan) [Entered: 04/17/2020 05:12 PM]
April 17, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1838721] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 7,662. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 04/17/2020 04:54 PM]
April 17, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1838691] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 5962 words. [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:27 PM]
April 17, 2020 SEPARATE ADDENDUM [1838689] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1838680-2 ] [Service Date:04/17/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 04/20/2020 by LMC] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:10 PM]
April 17, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1838680] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 10,119 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:44 PM]
April 17, 2020 NOTICE [1838671] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Environment America and the National Trust for Historic Preservation [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/20/2020 by LMC] (Sassman, Wyatt) [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:21 PM]
April 17, 2020 PETITIONER BRIEF [1838666] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1176, The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 8,496 Words. [19-1176, 19-1179] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 04/17/2020 02:12 PM]
April 17, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1838611] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 04/17/2020 ] Length of Brief: 4,459 words. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 04/17/2020 11:47 AM]
April 16, 2020 AMENDED NOTICE [1838485] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The American Thoracic Society, The American Academy of Allergy, Asthma & Immunology, The American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, The National Medical Association, The American College of Chest Physicians [Service Date: 04/16/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/17/2020 by LMC] (Babcock, Hope) [Entered: 04/16/2020 04:27 PM]
April 16, 2020 NOTICE [1838424] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Administrative Law Professors [Service Date: 04/16/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/17/2020 by LMC] (Sivas, Deborah) [Entered: 04/16/2020 01:38 PM]
April 16, 2020 NOTICE [1838348] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The American Thoracic Society, The American Academy of Allergy, Asthma & Immunology, The American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, and The National Medical Association [Service Date: 04/16/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/16/2020 by LMC] (Babcock, Hope) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:51 AM]
April 14, 2020 CONSENT NOTICE [1838045] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Mr. Thomas C. Jorling in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 [Service Date: 04/14/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/14/2020 by LMC] (Lamm, Theodore) [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:50 PM]
April 9, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1837569] filed by Gabriel Pacyniak and co-counsel Stephanie Kodish, Brent Chapman (UNM clinical law student), Graciela Esquivel (UNM clinical law student) on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner Coalition to Protect America's National Parks and National Parks Conservation Association. [19-1140] (Pacyniak, Gabriel) [Entered: 04/09/2020 11:37 PM]
April 8, 2020 NOTICE [1837353] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National Parks Conservation Association and Coalition to Protect America's National Parks [Service Date: 04/08/2020 ][19-1140] --[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/09/2020 by LMC] (Pacyniak, Gabriel) [Entered: 04/08/2020 04:08 PM]
April 3, 2020 NOTICE [1836772] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law [Service Date: 04/03/2020 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/07/2020 by LMC] (Lienke, Jack) [Entered: 04/03/2020 04:25 PM]
April 3, 2020 NOTICE [1836683] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Maximilian Auffhammer, Philip Duffy, Kenneth Gillingham, Lawrence H. Goulder, James Stock, Gernot Wagner, and the Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 04/03/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 04/07/2020 by LMC] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 04/03/2020 12:43 PM]
April 2, 2020 NOTICE [1836522] to withdraw attorney Allison D. Wood who represented America's Power in 19-1140, Andrew Duncan Knudsen who represented America's Power in 19-1140 filed by America's Power [Service Date: 04/02/2020 ] [19-1140] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:02 PM]
March 27, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1835777] filed by Megan Berge on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Respondent National Association of Home Builders of the United States in 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:45 PM]
March 24, 2020 NOTICE [1835105] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National Association of Home Builders of the United States [Service Date: 03/24/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[Edited 03/25/2020 by AY] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 03/24/2020 05:47 PM]
March 23, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1834847] filed granting the motion of Coordinating Petitioners for extension and modification of the briefing schedule [ # 1834423-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners due 04/17/2020. Brief for Biogenic CO2 Coalition due 04/17/2020. Brief for Coal Industry Petitioners due 04/17/2020. Brief for Robinson Petitioners due 04/17/2020. Brief(s) for Amici Curiae for Petitioners due 04/24/2020. Brief for Respondents due on 06/16/2020. Brief(s) for Amici Curiae for Respondents due 06/23/2020. Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners as Intervenors for Respondents due 07/16/2020. Briefs for Industry & State Intervenors as Intervenors for Respondents due 07/16/2020. Brief for State of North Dakota as Intervenor for Respondents due 07/16/2020. Reply Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners due 07/30/2020. Reply Brief for Biogenic CO2 Coalition due 07/30/2020. Reply Brief for Coal Industry Petitioners due 07/30/2020. Reply Brief for Robinson Petitioners due 07/30/2020. Deferred Appendix due 08/6/2020. Final Briefs due 08/13/2020. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:46 PM]
March 20, 2020 NOTICE [1834502] regarding consent of all parties to submission of amicus briefs. filed by Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 [Service Date: 03/20/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/20/2020 12:41 PM]
March 20, 2020 NOTICE [1834476] Notifying the Court of additional statements of consent or non-opposition concerning pending motion filed by State of New York in 19-1165 [Service Date: 03/20/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:22 AM]
March 19, 2020 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1834423] Modification of briefing schedule to extend time for filing briefs and joint appendix filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association and State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177, Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 03/19/2020 ] Length Certification: 1,140 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:47 PM]
March 19, 2020 NOTICE [1834260] to withdraw attorney Harry James Vorhoff who represented State of Louisiana in 19-1140 filed by State of Louisiana [Service Date: 03/19/2020 ] [19-1140] (Vorhoff, Harry) [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:03 PM]
March 16, 2020 NOTICE [1833717] to withdraw attorney Martha Roberts who represented Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 and Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1179 filed by Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 [Service Date: 03/16/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:38 PM]
March 12, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1833302] filed by S. Travis Mayo and co-counsel Taylor Payne on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Kentucky. [19-1140] (Mayo, Steven) [Entered: 03/12/2020 04:47 PM]
February 26, 2020 NOTICE [1830302] to withdraw attorney Christina Finzel Gomez who represented Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 19-1140 filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 19-1140 [Service Date: 02/26/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 02/26/2020 03:01 PM]
February 18, 2020 NOTICE [1828936] to change party information filed by Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC [Service Date: 02/18/2020 ] [19-1140] (Santini, Jacob) [Entered: 02/18/2020 03:56 PM]
February 13, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1828524] filed by William Daniel Booth (previously entered an appearance as lead counsel) and co-counsel Obianuju Okasi (now entering an appearance) on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Mississippi Public Service Commission. [19-1140] (Okasi, Obianuju) [Entered: 02/13/2020 04:33 PM]
February 11, 2020 NOTICE [1828169] regarding consent of enumerated parties to filing of amicus briefs filed by Environmental Defense Fund in 19-1166 [Service Date: 02/11/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 02/11/2020 11:00 PM]
February 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1828080] filed by Scott A. Keller (previously entered an appearance as lead counsel) and co-counsel Jeremy Evan Maltz (now entering an appearance) on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [19-1140] (Maltz, Jeremy) [Entered: 02/11/2020 01:49 PM]
February 7, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1827626] filed by David Doniger and co-counsel Lucas May on behalf of Petitioner Natural Resources Defense Council in 19-1166. [19-1166, 19-1140] (May, Lucas) [Entered: 02/07/2020 02:19 PM]
January 31, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1826621] Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners, Brief for Biogenic CO2 Coalition, Brief for Coal Industry Petitioners and Brief for Robinson Petitioners due March 27, 2020. Brief(s) of Amici Curiae for Petitioners due April 3, 2020. Brief for Respondents due May 26, 2020. Brief(s) of Amici Curiae for Respondents due June 2, 2020. Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners as Intervenors for Respondents, Briefs for Industry & State Intervenors as Intervenors for Respondents and Brief for the State of North Dakota as Intervenor for Respondents due June 25, 2020. Reply Briefs for Coordinating Petitioners, Reply Brief for Biogenic CO2 Coalition, Reply Brief for Coal Industry Petitioners and Reply Brief for Robinson Petitioners due July 9, 2020. Deferred Appendix due July 23, 2020. All final briefs due July 30, 2020. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Before Judges: Henderson and Srinivasan. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:37 PM]
January 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1824960] filed by Scott A. Keller (previously entered an appearance as lead counsel) and co-counsel Jeffrey H. Wood (now entering an appearance) on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1187] (Wood, Jeffrey) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:09 PM]
January 13, 2020 NOTICE [1823901] to withdraw attorney Zachary C. Larsen who represented People of the State of Michigan in 19-1165 and State of Michigan in 19-1179 filed by State of Michigan in 19-1179 [Service Date: 01/13/2020 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1179] (Larsen, Zachary) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:44 PM]
January 7, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1822999] filed by Robert E. Johnson on behalf of Petitioner The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179. [19-1140, 19-1179] (Johnson, Robert) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:52 PM]
January 7, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1822996] filed by Jeffrey D. Ubersax on behalf of Petitioner The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179. [19-1140, 19-1179] (Ubersax, Jeffery) [Entered: 01/07/2020 03:45 PM]
December 23, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE [1821433] to order [ # 1817249-2 ], [ # 1817249-3 ] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177, Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185, Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 19-1187, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 (Service Date: 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5165. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:22 PM]
December 19, 2019 NOTICE [1820995] Join in proposal filed by State of Texas in 19-1140 [Service Date: 12/19/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Hawkins, Kyle) [Entered: 12/19/2019 06:31 PM]
December 18, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE [1820685] to order [ # 1817249-2 ], [ # 1817249-3 ] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188 (Service Date: 12/18/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,420 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:03 PM]
December 13, 2019 NOTICE [1820119] to substitute attorney C. Frederick Beckner III; Ryan C. Morris; Christopher S. Ross substituted by Scott A. Keller filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America [Service Date: 12/13/2019 ] [19-1140] (Keller, Scott) [Entered: 12/13/2019 02:10 PM]
December 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1819114] filed by John A. Rego and co-counsel Reed W. Sirak, James R. Bedell on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Murray Energy Corporation. [19-1140] (Sirak, Reed) [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:25 PM]
November 27, 2019 NOTICE [1817997] filed advising of their support of appellant filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140 [Service Date: 11/27/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Stern, Heidi) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:32 PM]
November 27, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1817982] filed by Kevin Poloncarz and co-counsel Jake C. Levine on behalf of Petitioners Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Levine, Jacob) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:00 PM]
November 22, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1817249] filed denying motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165; denying motions to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808208-2 ], [ # 1808103-2 ], [ # 1807492-2 ]; denying motion to sever issue [ # 1808208-3 ] in 19-1140, 19-1185; directing party to file briefing format - Proposed formats due 12/23/2019. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Before Judges: Rogers and Griffith. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:05 PM]
November 20, 2019 NOTICE [1816853] regarding Motion for Abeyance (ECF No. 1807492) filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 11/20/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 11/20/2019 05:06 PM]
November 19, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1816431] filed dismissing as moot motion to complete the record [ # 1809826-2 ]; granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1809529-3 ] in 19-1189 [19-1189 (Consolidation termed 11/19/2019) with 19-1140]. The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith the mandate in No. 19-1189. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:11 AM]
November 18, 2019 NOTICE [1816377] to withdraw attorney Robert A. Wolf who represented City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 filed by City and County of Denver Colorado [Service Date: 11/18/2019 ] [19-1177] (Wolf, Robert) [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:07 PM]
November 18, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1816311] filed granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1809833-2 ], [ # 1809825-2 ], [ # 1809803-2 ], [ # 1809530-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1185, 19-1177, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1809451-2 ], [ # 1806915-2 ], [ # 1806911-2 ], [ # 1806910-2 ], [ # 1806337-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1165, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1805769-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1166, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1805447-2 ] in 19-1140, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1809842-2 ] in 19-1179, 19-1175, 19-1176 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 11/18/2019 02:54 PM]
November 15, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1816159] filed by John A. Rego on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Murray Energy Corporation. [19-1140] (Rego, John) [Entered: 11/15/2019 05:18 PM]
November 12, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1815339] filed by Kristin M. Bronson and co-counsel Edward J. Gorman on behalf of Petitioner City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177. [19-1177, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Gorman, Edward) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:28 PM]
October 30, 2019 SUGGESTION [1813342] of bankruptcy and automatic stay of proceedings filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Lazzaretti, John) [Entered: 10/30/2019 01:22 PM]
October 16, 2019 NOTICE [1811193] Advise that relief sought in Motion to Complete the Record for Review (ECF No. 1809826) has been provided. filed by American Lung Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/16/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/16/2019 09:54 PM]
October 16, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1811182] filed by Michael J. Bostrom on behalf of Petitioner City of Los Angeles. [19-1165] (Bostrom, Michael) [Entered: 10/16/2019 05:59 PM]
October 11, 2019 CORRECTED CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1810646] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 [Service Date: 10/11/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 10/11/2019 05:16 PM]
October 11, 2019 REPLY [1810629] filed by State of Nevada in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Hawaii, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of New York and State of Washington in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 to response [ # 1809478-2 ], [ # 1808711-2 ], [ # 1808554-2 ], [ # 1808726-2 ], [ # 1809834-2 ] [Service Date: 10/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,595 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Sullivan, Timothy) [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:48 PM]
October 11, 2019 REPLY [1810597] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 to response [ # 1809478-2 ], [ # 1809834-2 ], [ # 1808554-2 ], [ # 1808711-2 ], [ # 1808726-2 ], [ # 1809532-2 ] [Service Date: 10/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2513. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:32 PM]
October 9, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1810093] filed by Brittany E. Wright and co-counsel Jon A. Mueller on behalf of Petitioner Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.. [19-1173] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:55 AM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT MOTION [1809842] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by New York, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, Washington, D.C., et al. [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by JAD] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:12 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809840] submitted by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1186, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Dennis, Jeffery) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:26 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809839] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1186, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Dennis, Jeffery) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:23 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809838] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1186, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Dennis, Jeffery) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:22 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809836] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1186, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Dennis, Jeffery) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:19 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809835] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 19-1186 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1186, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Dennis, Jeffery) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:18 PM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1809834] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808103-2 ] filed by State of West Virginia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, Phil Bryant, Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 4,089 words. [19-1140, 19-1165] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:12 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809833] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by PowerSouth Energy Cooperative [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 10/08/2019 by LMC] (Moore, C.) [Entered: 10/07/2019 07:10 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809832] submitted by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:39 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809831] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:37 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809830] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:33 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809829] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:31 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809828] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1176] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:31 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809827] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:29 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809826] complete the administrative record filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 (Service Date: 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5064 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:16 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809825] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Nevada Gold Mines LLC and Newmont Nevada Energy Investment LLC [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 10/08/2019 by LMC] (Santini, Jacob) [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:06 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809822] filed by City and County of Denver Colorado [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1177] (Wolf, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:51 PM]
October 7, 2019 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1809821] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808103-2 ] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 666 Words. [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:44 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809817] filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:35 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809816] filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:34 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809815] filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:33 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809814] filed by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:33 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809812] submitted by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:32 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809811] submitted by American Wind Energy Association in 19-1187 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1187, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:31 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809809] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:29 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809807] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:26 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809804] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:23 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809803] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Georgia Power Company [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 10/08/2019 by LMC] (Campbell, Margaret) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:22 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809801] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1188, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1189] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:20 PM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809777] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1165, 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:29 PM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809774] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1165, 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:26 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809773] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1179, 19-1140] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:25 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809772] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1179, 19-1140] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:24 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809771] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1179, 19-1140] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:23 PM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809770] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1165, 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:22 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809769] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1179, 19-1140] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:21 PM]
October 7, 2019 JOINT CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809759] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1165, 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:04 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809736] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:43 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809732] submitted by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:38 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809730] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:35 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809727] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:32 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809724] filed by Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wright, Brittany) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:29 PM]
October 7, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1809715] to motion [ # 1808208-2 ], motion [ # 1808208-3 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1801 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:15 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809706] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1176] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:01 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809705] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] filed by Sierra Club, et al. [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1179, 19-1185]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by JAD] (Restrepo, Andres) [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:00 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809703] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1176] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:59 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809701] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1176] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:57 PM]
October 7, 2019 CORRECTED CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1809688] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:05 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809665] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1175, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:08 PM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809662] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:04 PM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809658] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:00 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809650] submitted by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:50 PM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809646] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1175, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:46 PM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809598] submitted by Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:16 AM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809597] filed by Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:15 AM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809594] filed by Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:13 AM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809593] filed by Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:11 AM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809592] filed by Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1166, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:09 AM]
October 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1809588] submitted by American Public Health Association and American Lung Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:06 AM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1809587] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:05 AM]
October 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1809583] filed by American Public Health Association and American Lung Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:03 AM]
October 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1809582] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:01 AM]
October 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1809581] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:00 AM]
October 4, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1809532] to motion [ # 1808103-2 ], motion [ # 1807492-2 ] filed by AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., America's Power, Appalachian Power Company, Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Murray Energy Corporation, National Mining Association, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, Wheeling Power Company and Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group in 19-1140, Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group in 19-1166, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO and United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 10/04/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 61 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:09 PM]
October 4, 2019 MOTION [1809530] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of Nevada [Service Date: 10/04/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 10/07/2019 by LMC] (Stern, Heidi) [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:19 PM]
October 4, 2019 MOTION [1809529] to dismiss case voluntarily in 19-1189 filed by State of Nevada in 19-1189 [Service Date: 11/04/2019 ] Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-1140, 19-1189, 19-1188, 19-1187, 19-1186, 19-1185, 19-1179, 19-1177, 19-1176, 19-1175, 19-1173, 19-1166, 19-1165]--MODIFIED EVENT--[Edited 11/19/2019 by LMC] (Stern, Heidi) [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:08 PM]
October 4, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1809478] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1807492-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808098-2 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 [Service Date: 10/04/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3753 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:00 PM]
October 4, 2019 MOTION [1809451] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 19-1140 [Service Date: 10/04/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 10/04/2019 by LMC] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 10/04/2019 01:24 PM]
October 3, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1809221] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1809146-2 ]; reply in support of motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1807492-2 ], reply in support of motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808103-2 ] due 10/11/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:27 AM]
October 2, 2019 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1809146] to extend time to file reply to 10/11/2019 filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 10/02/2019 ] Length Certification: 612 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/02/2019 05:28 PM]
October 1, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1808830] filed by Jeremiah Langston on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of Montana in 19-1140. [19-1140, 19-1165] (Langston, Jeremiah) [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:41 PM]
September 30, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1808726] to motion [ # 1807492-2 ], motion [ # 1808103-2 ] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 19-1140, 19-1176 [Service Date: 09/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3112. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:57 PM]
September 30, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1808711] to motion [ # 1807492-2 ] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 09/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,190. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 09/30/2019 07:15 PM]
September 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1808709] filed by Theodore Hadzi-Antich and co-counsel Robert Henneke; Ryan Walters on behalf of Petitioners Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175. [19-1175, 19-1140] (Henneke, Robert) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:56 PM]
September 30, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1808554] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1807492-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808103-2 ] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 09/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,641 Words. [19-1140, 19-1179] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:26 PM]
September 27, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1808347] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1808272-2 ]; directing response to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1807492-2 ], directing response to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1808103-2 ] Response due on 10/04/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 09/27/2019 10:53 AM]
September 26, 2019 CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1808272] to extend time to file response to 10/04/2019 filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 [Service Date: 09/26/2019 ] Length Certification: 262 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:34 PM]
September 26, 2019 MOTION [1808208] to hold case in abeyance, to sever issue filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition in 19-1185 (Service Date: 09/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,264 Words. [19-1185, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:29 PM]
September 25, 2019 CORRECTED MOTION [1808103] to hold case in abeyance filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177, State of Nevada in 19-1189 (Service Date: 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,700 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Sullivan, Timothy) [Entered: 09/25/2019 07:01 PM]
September 25, 2019 MOTION [1808098] to hold case in abeyance filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, State of Nevada in 19-1189 (Service Date: 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2700 words. [19-1165, 19-1189] (Sullivan, Timothy) [Entered: 09/25/2019 05:36 PM]
September 24, 2019 LETTER [1807791] sent regarding attorney membership to Joseph Anthony Scalfani for Phil Bryant. Application for Admission due 10/24/2019. [19-1140] [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:09 PM]
September 20, 2019 MOTION [1807492] to hold case in abeyance filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 (Service Date: 09/20/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5186. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:39 PM]
September 19, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1807284] to motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by Joanne Brown, Norman R. Brown, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Construction Industry Air Quality Coalition, Dalton Trucking, Inc., Liberty Packing Company, LLC., Nuckles Oil Company, Inc., Robinson Enterprises, Inc. and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 19-1175 [Service Date: 09/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 468. [19-1140, 19-1175] (Walters, Ryan) [Entered: 09/19/2019 02:36 PM]
September 17, 2019 MOTION [1806915] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by United Mine Workers of America, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 09/17/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[Edited 09/18/2019 by AH] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:35 PM]
September 17, 2019 MOTION [1806911] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 09/17/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[Edited 09/18/2019 by AH] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:27 PM]
September 17, 2019 MOTION [1806910] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 19-1173 [Service Date: 09/17/2019 ] [19-1173, 19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189]--[Edited 09/18/2019 by AH] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:22 PM]
September 16, 2019 REPLY [1806760] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189 to response [ # 1805699-2 ], [ # 1805732-2 ], [ # 1805952-2 ] [Service Date: 09/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2.013 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:54 PM]
September 12, 2019 JOINT MOTION [1806337] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of Wyoming, State of Utah, State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of Oklahoma, State of Ohio, State of Nebraska, State of Montana, State of Missouri, Mississippi Public Service Commission, Phil Bryant, State of Louisiana, State of Kentucky, State of Kansas, State of Indiana, State of Georgia, State of Arkansas, State of Alaska, State of Alabama and State of West Virginia [Service Date: 09/12/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 09/24/2019 by LMC] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 09/12/2019 06:29 PM]
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1806066] filed granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1801182-2 ] [ # 1801180-2 ] [ # 1801137-2 ] [ # 1801050-2 ] [ # 1801004-2 ] [ # 1800958-2 ] [ # 1800270-2 ]. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:52 PM]
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1806060] filed granting motion to extend and align deadlines for initial filings and procedural and dispositive motions [ # 1803230-2 ] in 19-1140, 19-1166, 19-1165. The deadlines established by the courts order entered in No. 19-1140 on August 2, 2019, will now apply to the petitions for review that have been filed after that date and consolidated with No. 19-1140. The following deadlines apply in these consolidated cases: Petitioners Docketing Statement Form due 10/07/2019; Petitioners Statement of Issues to be Raised due 10/07/2019; Petitioners Certificate as to Parties, Rulings, and Related Cases due 10/07/2019; Petitioners Joint Statement of Intent to Utilize Deferred Joint Appendix due 10/07/2019; Procedural Motions, if any, by Petitioners or Respondents due 10/07/2019; Respondents Certified Index to the Record due 10/21/2019; and Dispositive Motions, if any, by Petitioners or Respondents due 10/21/2019. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:43 PM]
September 11, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1806018] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1806009-2 ]. [19-1189] [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:23 PM]
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1806013] filed consolidating cases 19-1189 (Consolidation started 09/11/2019) with 19-1140, et al. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188, 19-1189] [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:16 PM]
September 10, 2019 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1805952] to motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 534 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:07 PM]
September 10, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1805951] to motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in 19-1188 [Service Date: 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 529 Words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 09/10/2019 08:29 PM]
September 10, 2019 MOTION [1805769] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Indiana Energy Association and Indiana Utility Group [Service Date: 09/10/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1166] (Flannery, David) [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:48 AM]
September 9, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1805732] to motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association in 19-1140, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy in 19-1166, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. in 19-1173 [Service Date: 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2641. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:04 PM]
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805728] filed consolidating cases 19-1188 (Consolidation started 09/09/2019) with 19-1140, et al. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188] [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:27 PM]
September 9, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1805727] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1805719-2 ]. [19-1188] [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:25 PM]
September 9, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1805699] to motion to expedite case [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, City and County of Denver Colorado in 19-1177 [Service Date: 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,329 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1177] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:10 PM]
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805671] filed consolidating cases 19-1186, 19-1187 (Consolidation started 09/09/2019) with 19-1140 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:10 PM]
September 9, 2019 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1805626] to motion [ # 1803976-2 ] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 19-1179 [Service Date: 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 503 Words. [19-1140, 19-1179] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:19 PM]
September 6, 2019 MOTION [1805447] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by State of North Dakota [Service Date: 09/06/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by AY] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:38 PM]
September 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805359] filed consolidating cases 19-1177, 19-1175, 19-1185 (Consolidation started 09/06/2019) with 19-1140 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185] [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:52 PM]
September 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805339] filed consolidating cases 19-1176 (Consolidation started 09/06/2019) with 19-1140 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1176, 19-1179] [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:17 PM]
September 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805317] filed consolidating cases 19-1179 (Consolidation started 09/06/2019) with 19-1140 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1179] [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:24 AM]
August 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1804335] filed consolidating cases 19-1173 (Consolidation started 08/30/2019) with 19-1140; directing party to file in 19-1173 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/30/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/30/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173] [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:14 AM]
August 28, 2019 MOTION [1803976] to expedite case filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166 (Service Date: 08/28/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,430 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:28 AM]
August 23, 2019 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1803445] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 19-1140, EPA in 19-1165, 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:08 PM]
August 22, 2019 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1803230] Align deadlines for initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions, and certified index to record with deadlines in the lead case, American Lung Assoc. v. EPA filed by City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, People of the State of Michigan, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 19-1165, Appalachian Mountain Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Minnesota Center for Environmental Advocacy, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 19-1166 [Service Date: 08/22/2019 ] Length Certification: 717 words. [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:42 AM]
August 21, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1803158] filed by Paul Garrahan and co-counsel Steven Novick on behalf of Petitioner State of Oregon. [19-1165] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:07 PM]
August 20, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802881] filed by Aimee D. Thomson on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [19-1165] (Thomson, Aimee) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:14 AM]
August 16, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1802500] filed consolidating cases 19-1165 (Consolidation started 08/16/2019) with 19-1140; directing party to file in 19-1165 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/16/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/16/2019 [19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:29 AM]
August 14, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1802141] filed consolidating cases 19-1166 (Consolidation started 08/14/2019) with 19-1140; directing party to file in 19-1166 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/13/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/13/2019 [19-1140, 19-1166] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:03 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801182] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Murray Energy Corporation [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/08/2019 by LMC] (Lazzaretti, John) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:33 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801180] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/08/2019 by LMC] (Cheren, Robert) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:56 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801137] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Appalachian Power Company, AEP Generating Company, AEP Generation Resources Inc., Indiana Michigan Power Company, Kentucky Power Company, Public Service Company of Oklahoma, Southwestern Electric Power Company, and Wheeling Power Company [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/08/2019 by LMC] (Smith, Amy) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:49 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801050] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by America's Power [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/07/2019 by LMC] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 08/07/2019 11:47 AM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801004] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National Mining Association [Service Date: 08/07/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/07/2019 by LMC] (McGuffey, Carroll) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:01 AM]
August 6, 2019 MOTION [1800958] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States [Service Date: 08/06/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/07/2019 by LMC] (Beckner, C.) [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:15 PM]
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1800451] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1800179-2 ]; PETITIONER docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement due 10/07/2019. PETITIONER and RESPONDENT procedural motions due 10/07/2019. PETITIONER and RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 10/21/2019; RESPONDENT certified index to record due 10/21/2019. [19-1140] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:25 PM]
August 1, 2019 MOTION [1800270] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by National Rural Electric Cooperative Association [Service Date: 08/01/2019 ] [19-1140]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 08/02/2019 by LMC] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:24 PM]
August 1, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1800238] for motion to extend time [ # 1800179-2 ] filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association. [19-1140] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:17 PM]
August 1, 2019 MOTION [1800179] to extend time to file initial submissions to 10/07/2019 filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association (Service Date: 08/01/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 555 words. [19-1140] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:09 AM]
July 31, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799953] filed by James P. Duffy on behalf of Petitioners American Lung Association and American Public Health Association. [19-1140] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:13 PM]
July 9, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796352] filed by Benjamin R. Carlisle on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler. [19-1140] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:45 AM]
July 9, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796331] filed by Meghan E. Greenfield on behalf of Respondents EPA and Andrew Wheeler. [19-1140] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:16 AM]
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1796320] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 08/08/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/23/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 08/08/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/08/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 08/23/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 08/23/2019 [19-1140] [Entered: 07/09/2019 10:58 AM]
July 9, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1796319] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1796317-2 ] [19-1140] [Entered: 07/09/2019 10:56 AM]
July 8, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1796317] of a decision by federal agency filed by American Lung Association and American Public Health Association [Service Date: 07/08/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1140] [Entered: 07/09/2019 10:55 AM]
July 8, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1140] [Entered: 07/09/2019 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Lung Association, et al v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, Administrator
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Represented By: Jonathan Brightbill
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Represented By: Jonathan Brightbill
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Nishida, Acting Administrator
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Lung Association
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: James Patrick Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: James Patrick Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Kansas
Represented By: Jeffrey Allyn Chanay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Phil Bryant, Governor of the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Scalfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Texas
Represented By: Kyle D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Ohio
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Cameron Farrow Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Alabama
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Indiana Utility Group
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Missouri
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mississippi Public Service Commission
Represented By: William Daniel Booth Esquire
Represented By: Obianuju Okasi
Represented By: Todd Palmer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Margaret I. Olson
Represented By: Paul Martin Seby
Represented By: Jerry Stouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Georgia
Represented By: Andrew Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Murray Energy Corporation
Represented By: John David Lazzaretti
Represented By: John A. Rego
Represented By: James Richard Bedell
Represented By: Erik David Lange
Represented By: Reed Sirak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AEP Generation Resources Inc.
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nevada Gold Energy LLC
Represented By: Jacob Santini Esquire
Represented By: Michael A. Zody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: America's Power
Represented By: Allison D. Wood
Represented By: Elbert Lin Esquire
Represented By: F. William Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Steven Robert Blair Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Indiana Energy Association
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Georgia Power Company
Represented By: Margaret Claiborne Campbell
Represented By: Melissa Horne
Represented By: Angela Jean Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin
Represented By: Stephen Chad Meredith
Represented By: Taylor Payne
Represented By: Steven Travis Mayo
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Newberg II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Appalachian Power Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Mining Association
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Carroll Wade McGuffey Esquire III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Mithun Mansinghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Indiana Michigan Power Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of South Carolina
Represented By: James Emory Smith Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kentucky Power Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Nevada
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Alaska
Represented By: Clyde E. Sniffen Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Powersouth Energy Cooperative
Represented By: C. Grady Moore III
Represented By: Julia Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AEP Generating Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nevada Gold Mines LLC
Represented By: Jacob Santini Esquire
Represented By: Michael A. Zody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: C. Frederick Beckner III
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Jeremy Evan Maltz
Represented By: Jeffrey Heath Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Wyoming
Represented By: James Kaste
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Rural Electric Cooperative Association
Represented By: Thomas Allen Lorenzen
Represented By: Rae Evans Cronmiller Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth Boucher Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Utah
Represented By: Tyler Richard Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Montana
Represented By: Matthew Thompson Cochenour
Represented By: Jeremiah Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Represented By: Kristina R. Van Bockern Esquire
Represented By: Emily Church Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wheeling Power Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Justin D. Lavene Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Southwestern Electric Power Company
Represented By: Kathy G. Beckett Esquire
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Janet J. Henry
Represented By: Edward Louis Kropp
Represented By: David Michael Flannery Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Lindsay S. See
Represented By: Thomas T. Lampman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Portland
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Debra A. Haaland
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Oppenheimer
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward J. Markey
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anna G. Eshoo
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Katherine Mach
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Norris
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maximilian Auffhammer
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin L. Cardin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dianne Feinstein
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sisters of Mercy of the Americas
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eliot L. Engel
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brendan Kirby
Represented By: Cara Ann Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bobby Rush
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter A. DeFazio
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steny H. Hoyer
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth Anne Moler
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andy Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jesus G. Garcia
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Environment America
Represented By: Wyatt Gregory Sassman
Represented By: Michael Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition on the Environment and Jewish Life
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Detroit Mayor Mike Duggan
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joellen L. Russell
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Suzanne Bonamici
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Abigail Swann
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Raul Ruiz
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Town of Chapel Hill
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Doris Matsui
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence H. Goulder
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Welch
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dallas Burtraw
Represented By: Jonas Monast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael F. Bennet
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Scott H. Peters
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles B. Curtis
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathy Fallon Lambert
Represented By: Jonas Monast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emanuel Cleaver
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mario J. Molina
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gernot Wagner
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul Tonko
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Jack Lienke
Represented By: Richard L. Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Thoracic Society
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Conference of Mayors
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Chest Physicians
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Coral Gables
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Gabriel Pacyniak
Represented By: Graciela Esquivel
Represented By: Brent Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas R. Carper
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Represented By: Megan Heuberger Berge Esquire
Represented By: Jared R. Wigginton
Represented By: Thomas Jon Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ted Lieu
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diana H. Wall
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harris County
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kim Cobb
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Providence
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gerald Connolly
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dina Titus
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jared Huffman
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Evangelical Environmental Network
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women of Reform Judaism
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kenneth J. Lutz
Represented By: Cara Ann Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John P. Sarbanes
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joyce Beatty
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Pocan
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin Trenberth
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deborah Wasserman Schultz
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maryknoll Sisters
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James C. McWilliams
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mayor of Salt Lake City
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Central Conference of American Rabbis
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard J. Lazarus, Prof.
Represented By: Matthew J. Sanders
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Union of Concerned Scientists
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yvette D. Clarke
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Union for Reform Judaism
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kerry Emanuel
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Donald S. Beyer, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mayor of the Borough of Glen Rock
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mike Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathy Castor
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Phoenix
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colette Honorable
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pamela Matson,
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles T. Driscoll, Jr.
Represented By: Jonas Monast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National League of Cities
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jason Crow
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Medical Association
Represented By: Hope Madeline Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of New Orleans
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nora Mead Brownell
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: David Battisti
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nina Alexandra Mendelson
Represented By: Matthew J. Sanders
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Grace Napolitano
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James John Hoecker
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition to Protect America's National Parks
Represented By: Gabriel Pacyniak
Represented By: Graciela Esquivel
Represented By: Brent Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Asheville
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Baptist Convention, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael F. Doyle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James E. Clyburn
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Boulder
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James D. McCalley
Represented By: Cara Ann Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Earl Blumenauer
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nancy Pelosi
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sean Casten
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronald Levin
Represented By: Matthew J. Sanders
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin F. Hobbs
Represented By: Cara Ann Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eleanor Holmes Norton
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chellie Pingree
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Higgins
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steve Cohen
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Town of Cutler Bay
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adriano Espaillat
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alan S. Lowenthal
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Al Green
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Debbie Dingell
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: A, Donald McEachin
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Men of Reform Judaism
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rashida Tlaib
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philip Duffy
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jon Wellinghoff
Represented By: Katherine Erin Konschnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Renee Marie Gerni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frank Pallone, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nanette Diaz Barragan
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute Leadership Team
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Saint Paul
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Farber, Prof.
Represented By: Matthew J. Sanders
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council of Churches USA
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alcee L. Hastings
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Houston
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ann M. Kuster
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Greenstone
Represented By: Alexander Valdes
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Benjamin NIckerson
Represented By: Robert Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marcy Kaptur
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Darren Soto
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas C. Jorling
Represented By: Theodore Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Noelle Eckley Selin
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Harte
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Todd S. Aagaard
Represented By: Matthew J. Sanders
Represented By: Deborah A. Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Stock
Represented By: Shaun Alaric Goho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chris Van Hollen
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Las Cruces
Represented By: Michael Burger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ben Ray Lujan
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ed Perlmutter
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James P. McGovern
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amelia Keyes
Represented By: Jonas Monast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Julia Brownley
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hazon
Represented By: Keri Rae Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marc Veasey
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joe Neguse
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diana DeGette
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Drew Shindell
Represented By: Stephanie Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |