NLRB v. American Eagle Protective Serv, et al
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Paragon Systems, Inc. and American Eagle Protective Services Corporation
Case Number: 19-1205
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1810523] filed by David Habenstreit and co-counsel Amy Ginn and Heather Beard on behalf of Petitioner NLRB. [19-1205] (Habenstreit, David) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:20 PM]
October 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1810341] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER procedural motions due 11/12/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 11/25/2019. PETITIONER certified index to record due 11/25/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT certificate as to parties due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT deferred appendix statement due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT docketing statement due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT statement of issues due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT underlying decision due 11/12/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 11/25/2019 [19-1205] [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:24 PM]
October 10, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1810309] of Application for Enforcement sent to respondent [ # 1810295-2 ] [19-1205] [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:11 PM]
October 10, 2019 LETTER [1810299] sent regarding attorney membership to Frank D. Davis for American Eagle Protective Services Corporation and Laura M. Hagan for Paragon Systems, Inc.. Application for Admission due 11/12/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:04 PM]
October 8, 2019 APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT [1810295] of a decision by federal agency Response to Application for Enforcement due on 10/29/2019 filed by NLRB [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] [19-1205] [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:58 AM]
October 8, 2019 ENFORCEMENT CASE docketed. [19-1205] [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NLRB v. American Eagle Protective Serv, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: David S. Habenstreit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M. Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: American Eagle Protective Services Corporation
Represented By: Frank D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?