Union of Concerned Scientists, et al v. NHTSA
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity, Environment America, Conservation Law Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Environmental Defense Fund, Union of Concerned Scientists, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Sierra Club and Public Citizen, Inc.
Respondent: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Case Number: 19-1230
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813677] filed by Jonathan D. Brightbill, Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General and co-counsel Chloe H. Kolman, Daniel R. Dertke on behalf of Respondent NHTSA. [19-1230] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 10/31/2019 06:31 PM]
October 31, 2019 MOTION [1813676] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The Coalition for Sustainable Automotive Regulation and the Association of Global Automakers, Inc. [Service Date: 10/31/2019 ] [19-1230] (Ludwiszewski, Raymond) [Entered: 10/31/2019 06:18 PM]
October 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813287] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 12/02/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 12/16/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 12/02/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 12/02/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/16/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 12/16/2019 [19-1230] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:13 AM]
October 30, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1813283] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1813281-2 ] [19-1230] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:04 AM]
October 28, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1813281] of a decision by federal agency filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Public Citizen, Inc., Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1230] [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:59 AM]
October 28, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1230] [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union of Concerned Scientists, et al v. NHTSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Represented By: Chloe Hamity Kolman
Represented By: Daniel R. Dertke
Represented By: Jonathan Brightbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Anchun Jean Su
Represented By: Maya Golden-Krasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environment America
Represented By: Michael Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Emily Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: David D. Doniger
Represented By: Ian Fein
Represented By: Brenden Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal Esquire
Represented By: Alice Henderson
Represented By: Vickie Lynn Patton
Represented By: Sean H. Donahue
Represented By: Martha Roberts
Represented By: Matthew Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Union of Concerned Scientists
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Travis Annatoyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Represented By: Robert Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Alejandra Nunez
Represented By: Joanne Marie Spalding
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Vera P. Pardee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Citizen, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?