John Demos, Jr. v. United States Washington D.C., et al

Defendant / Appellee: United States Washington D.C., United States Attorney General, United States of America, President of the United States of America, United States Solicitor General and Speaker of the House
Plaintiff / Appellant: John Robert Demos, Jr.
Case Number: 19-5158
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 LETTER [1798073] sent to warden sending Special Panel order [ # 1798072-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 08/19/2019. [19-5158] [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:10 PM]
July 19, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1798072] filed discharging order to show cause [ # 1789807-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that appellants in forma pauperis status be revoked. While incarcerated, appellant has brought at least three civil actions or appeals that were dismissed on the ground that they were frivolous or malicious or failed to state a claim. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant pay the $505 filing fee to the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, within 30 days of the date of this order. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 08/19/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Sentelle. [19-5158]--[RELIEFS ADDED--Edited 07/24/2019 by LMC] [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:08 PM]
July 1, 2019 RECEIPT [1795558] received from John Demos [signed for on 06/05/2019] for documents [ # 1789812-2 ] sent to Appellant John Robert Demos, Jr. [19-5158] [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:13 PM]
June 10, 2019 RESPONSE [1792346] to order [ # 1789807-2 ] filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (Service Date: 06/12/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4 pages. [19-5158] [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:05 PM]
May 28, 2019 LETTER [1789812] sent to warden sending Clerk order of docketing fee payment [ # 1789807-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/27/2019. [19-5158] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:15 PM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789807] filed to show cause regarding payment of docketing fee. Response to Order due 06/27/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5158] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:04 PM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789804] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00253-UNA filed by John Robert Demos, Jr.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5158. [19-5158] [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:59 PM]
May 28, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5158] [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Demos, Jr. v. United States Washington D.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Washington D.C.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Attorney General
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: President of the United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Solicitor General
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Speaker of the House
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Robert Demos, Jr.
Represented By: John Robert Demos Jr.
Represented By: Warden (Walla Walla)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?