Oscar Dantzler v. DOJ, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Agents One-Five, United States Department of Justice Office, Louisiana Commission of Human Rights Office of the Governor, Micheal McClananhan, Individually and in his capacity as the State of Louisiana President, Deash Gay, Esq; Individually and in her capacity as the Executive Assistant/EQS Supervisor, William P. Barr, Individually and in his capacity as the U.S Attorney General, Agents One-Five, Louisiana Commission of Human Rights Office of the Governor, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, John Bel Edwards, Individually and in his capacity as the State of Louisiana Governor, Bryan A. Vorndran, Individually and his capacity as the U.S FBI Special Agent, Agents One-Five, N.A.A.C.P. Office, Keith Hills, Individually and in his capacity as the Director, Derrick Johnson, Individually and in his capacity as the National President, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Christa David, MPA, Individually and in her capacity as the Administrative Assistant/ Intake Officer, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Leah Raby, Dr; Individually and in her capacity as the Executive Director, Agents One-Five, U.S.E.E.O.C. Office, Ruby Sustaita, Individually and in her capacity as the Regional Attorney, Travis Nicholson, Individually and his capacity as the Acting Director, Christopher A. Wray, Individually and in his capacity as the F.B.I. Director, United States Department of Justice and Agents One-Five, United States Federal Bureau of Investigation Office
Plaintiff / Appellant: Oscar Dantzler
Case Number: 20-5334
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1877747] marked "Return to sender. Unclaimed. Unable to forward. ". Certified Mail [1871200-2] had been sent to Party Oscar Dantzler. [20-5334] [Entered: 12/30/2020 09:46 AM]
December 11, 2020 MOTION [1875602] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [Case Number 20-5334: IFP Pending USCA] filed by Oscar Dantzler (Service Date: 12/14/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk) Length Certification: 8 pages. [20-5334] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:45 AM]
December 10, 2020 MOTION [1875600] to stay filed by Oscar Dantzler (Service Date: 12/14/2020 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4 pages. [20-5334] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:39 AM]
November 20, 2020 CERTIFIED MAILand FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1872577] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 1888] of order [ # 1872225-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/21/2020 from Oscar Dantzler. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:52 PM]
November 20, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1872225] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 12/21/2020. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:37 AM]
November 13, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1871200] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 1697] of order [ # 1871130-3 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/14/2020 from Oscar Dantzler. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 05:53 PM]
November 13, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871130] filed directing party to file payment of docketing fee APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 12/14/2020; directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis APPELLANT motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court due 12/14/2020, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:46 PM]
November 13, 2020 NOTICE [1871124] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is denied [Case Number 20-5334: IFP Denied USDC] [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:32 PM]
November 13, 2020 NOTICE [1871121] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is filed [Case Number 20-5334: IFP Pending USDC] [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:28 PM]
November 13, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1871120] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01505-TNM filed by Oscar Dantzler. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5334. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:27 PM]
November 13, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5334] [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Oscar Dantzler v. DOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Agents One-Five, United States Department of Justice Office
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Commission of Human Rights Office of the Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Micheal McClananhan, Individually and in his capacity as the State of Louisiana President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deash Gay, Esq; Individually and in her capacity as the Executive Assistant/EQS Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, Individually and in his capacity as the U.S Attorney General
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Agents One-Five, Louisiana Commission of Human Rights Office of the Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: Alison Nadine Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Bel Edwards, Individually and in his capacity as the State of Louisiana Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bryan A. Vorndran, Individually and his capacity as the U.S FBI Special Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Agents One-Five, N.A.A.C.P. Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith Hills, Individually and in his capacity as the Director
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Derrick Johnson, Individually and in his capacity as the National President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christa David, MPA, Individually and in her capacity as the Administrative Assistant/ Intake Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leah Raby, Dr; Individually and in her capacity as the Executive Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Agents One-Five, U.S.E.E.O.C. Office
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruby Sustaita, Individually and in her capacity as the Regional Attorney
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Travis Nicholson, Individually and his capacity as the Acting Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher A. Wray, Individually and in his capacity as the F.B.I. Director
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Agents One-Five, United States Federal Bureau of Investigation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oscar Dantzler
Represented By: Oscar Dantzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?