Roger Shekar v. James Duff, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Roger Shekar
Defendant / Appellee: James Duff, Anthony Scirica, Rebecca Pallmeyer, Frank Easterbrook, Diane Sykes, Diane P. Wood, Sarah Schrup, Collins Fitzpatrick, Michael Kanne, Ruben Castillo, Ronald Guzman, Sharon Coleman, Robert Gettleman, Sheila Finnegan, Amy Coney Barrett, James Richmond, Christopher Conway, Thomas Bruton, Lorenzo Walker, Tiana Davis, Catrina Livermore, Gino J. Agnello, Jason Wojdylo, Thomas Walsh, Jane Doe, Staff Attorney of Seventh Circuit as an individual, John Doe, Staff Attorney, Annette Panter, Pro Se Clerk 1 of Seventh circuit, Steve Gilman, also known as Henchman of Defendant Gettleman, Emmerson Buie, Michael E. Horowitz, Maureen Merin, John Lausch, Donald Washington, Stephen Linder, a Federal Grand Jury Indicted, Federal Jury convicted felon and hitman hired by defendants Pallmeyer, Bruton, Castillo, Easterbrook , to murder the Plaintiff, Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman, also known as El Chapo Guzman, also known as Fugitive Felon, Christopher Dammons and Stephen Linder, a Federal Grand Jury Indicted, Federal Jury convicted felon and hitman hired by defendants Pallmeyer, Bruton, Castillo, Easterbrook, to murder the Plaintiff
Case Number: 22-5211
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1966237] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1965785-2 ]; extending Clerk order [ # 1958704-5 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 01/30/2023. APPENDIX due 01/30/2023, Failure to respond may result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [22-5211] [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:48 AM]
September 23, 2022 MOTION [1965785] to extend time to file motion filed by Roger Shekar (Service Date: 09/23/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: The motion complies with page length and /or word count requirements. [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/23/2022 12:07 PM]
September 12, 2022 PETITION [1963159] To Compel The Third Party As To Their Identification _Produce E mail Documents filed by Appellant Roger Shekar [Service Date: 09/12/2022 by Email] Length Certification: The document complies page length. [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/12/2022 03:19 PM]
September 11, 2022 SUPPLEMENT [1962915] to petition for other relief [ # 1962658-2 ] filed by Roger Shekar [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/11/2022 07:07 PM]
September 11, 2022 PETITION [1962917] To Strike and remove inappropriate notifications /distribution to unrelated third parties filed by Appellant Roger Shekar [Service Date: 09/11/2022 by 3rd Party, Email] Length Certification: Document complies with Circuit Rule as to page limitations excluding Exhibits. [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/11/2022 08:42 PM]
September 8, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1962664] to petition for other relief [ # 1962658-2 ] filed by Roger Shekar. [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/08/2022 02:50 PM]
September 8, 2022 PETITION [1962658] Sanction,Suspension,Referral to Senate Judiciary committee to remove Respondent Pan from Judiciary for High Crimes and Misdemeanor;Referral to USDOJ for Criminal Prosecution for criminal violations of First, Fourteenth Amendment Rights of the Petitioner filed by Appellant Roger Shekar [Service Date: 09/08/2022 by 3rd Party] Length Certification: The Petition Complies with the Page length allowed and are SIX pages excluding the caption sheet. [22-5211] (Shekar, Roger) [Entered: 09/08/2022 02:29 PM]
September 6, 2022 RECEIPT [1962625] received from Illegible [no date of signature] for document [ # 1958704-5 ] sent to Appellant Roger Shekar [22-5211] [Entered: 09/08/2022 11:52 AM]
September 2, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1961931] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1959641-2 ] [22-5211] [Entered: 09/02/2022 09:09 AM]
August 16, 2022 MOTION [1959641] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Roger Shekar (Service Date: 08/17/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1 page. [22-5211] [Entered: 08/17/2022 08:53 AM]
August 10, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1958688] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02123-UNA filed by Roger Shekar. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5211. [22-5211] [Entered: 08/10/2022 01:19 PM]
August 10, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1958704] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/29/2022. APPENDIX due 09/29/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5211] [Entered: 08/10/2022 01:50 PM]
August 10, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1958719] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8679 5589] of order [ # 1958704-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 09/09/2022 from Roger Shekar. [22-5211] [Entered: 08/10/2022 02:36 PM]
August 10, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5211] [Entered: 08/10/2022 01:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roger Shekar v. James Duff, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roger Shekar
Represented By: Roger Shekar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony Scirica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rebecca Pallmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frank Easterbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diane Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diane P. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sarah Schrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Collins Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Kanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruben Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronald Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sharon Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Gettleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sheila Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Coney Barrett
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas Bruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorenzo Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tiana Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Catrina Livermore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gino J. Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jason Wojdylo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Doe, Staff Attorney of Seventh Circuit as an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, Staff Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Annette Panter, Pro Se Clerk 1 of Seventh circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steve Gilman, also known as Henchman of Defendant Gettleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emmerson Buie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael E. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maureen Merin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Lausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen Linder, a Federal Grand Jury Indicted, Federal Jury convicted felon and hitman hired by defendants Pallmeyer, Bruton, Castillo, Easterbrook , to murder the Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman, also known as El Chapo Guzman, also known as Fugitive Felon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Dammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen Linder, a Federal Grand Jury Indicted, Federal Jury convicted felon and hitman hired by defendants Pallmeyer, Bruton, Castillo, Easterbrook, to murder the Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?