Johnson v. Arapahoe County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Eduardo A. Johnson |
Defendant: |
Arapahoe County Sheriff's Department, Mark Ortler, Matt Walker, Rob Hoffman, Jon Schott and Dennis Erickson |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv02096 |
Filed: |
October 5, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael E. Hegarty |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 17, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER. The plaintiffs Motion on Taxation of Cost 128 filed 3/24/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/17/2011.(sah, )
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
122
Minute Entry for Jury Trial - Day One held on 2/22/2010 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Jury selected. Evidence entered. ORDERED: 107 Motion To Permit a Telephone/Video Teleconferrence of Wittness [sic] is DENIED. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar) (rebcd)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing
110
ORDER. Defendant Mark Ortlers Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 91 filed 03/12/2009, is DENIED. Plaintiff Motion for Reconsideration of Order Adoptin g in Part and Rejecting in Part Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 92 filed 03/16/2009, is DENIED. The plaintiffs Second Motion for Status on Civil Case 101 filed 01/06/2010, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/08/2010.(sah, )
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing
100
SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/1/09. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 2/22/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/5/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
99
MINUTE ORDER granting 97 Motion for Order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/17/09. Telephonic Setting Conference set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.(rebsec, )
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing
90
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 88 filed12/18/2008 is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 88 filed 12/18/2008 respectfully is REJECTED otherwise. The Defendants Motion and Brief for Summary Judgment 44 filed 06/23/2008, is DENIED as to the plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claim and his Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claims against Mark Ortler the Defendants Motion and Brief for Summary Judgment 44 filed 6/23/2008 is GRANTED otherwise. The Plaintiffs Motion and Brief for Summary Judgment 52 filed Ju06/01/2008, is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/02/2009.(sah, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?