February 17, 2016 |
Filing
271
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 270 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/17/2016.(cthom, )
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing
268
ORDER granting 267 the Parties Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/28/2012.(ervsl, )
|
October 31, 2011 |
Filing
252
ORDER Court vacates the 11/7/11 trial date and all associated deadlines. All pending motions are denied as moot. Dismissal Paper due by 1/6/2012. Motion to substitute the Department of Corrections as the defendnat shall be filed on or before 1/5/12. The 228 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum is vacated, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/31/11. (gmssl, )
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
192
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assist in Locating Volunteer Counsel by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/13/2011. (erv, )
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
190
ORDER THIS MATTER comes before the Court on reassignment to Judge William J. Martnez. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before February 23, 2011, a Joint Status Report, not to exceed 4 pages in length, exclusive of signature blocks. Status Report due by 2/23/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2011. (erv, )
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing
180
AMENDED ORDER Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/19/2011. (erv, )
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
177
ORDER Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/16/2010. (erv, )
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing
172
ORDER that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge issued August 18, 2010 164 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion styled Dispositive Motion filed January 6, 2010 114 , is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that De fendants Motion for Summary Judgment, filed December 21, 2009 107 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth in the Recommendation. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants Objection to the Recommendation, filed September 24, 2010 170 is DENIED AS MOOT. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/30/2010.(erv, )
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing
158
ORDER denying 155 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Order for Oregon Dept. of Corrections to Follow the Order by U.S. District Court of Colorado to Allow Me to Proceed with Legal Material by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/12/2010.(erv, )
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
153
ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for a Order for Oregon Dept. Of Corrections to Follow the Order by the U.S. District Court of Colorado to allow me to proceed with Legal Material to proceed with litigation issues before the court 147 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time 148 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 30, 2010, to file his reply in support of his dispositive motion. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel 149 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/2010.(kmtcd, )
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing
104
MINUTE ORDER granting in part 100 Plaintiffs letter to the Clerk of Court dated November 19, 2009, docketed as a Motion to obtain docket text and a case inquiry report. The Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet and the Cour ts financial report regarding payments made and balance due for the filing fee in this case. To the extent Plaintiff seeks guidance regarding dispositive motions, Plaintiff is again advised that the Court does not respond to letters. Further, the Court cannot give legal advice. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/09.(erv, )
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing
99
ORDER the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge Tafoya, dated October 1, 2009 90 , is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs pro se Cause for Preliminary Injunction and his Declaration in support, 57 & 58 filed June 25, 2009, is DENIED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/09.(erv, )
|
November 5, 2009 |
Filing
97
ORDER DENYING RELEASE OF INFORMATION 96 Motion Hearing, Denying 78 MOTION to Compel filed by Derrick L. Aranda, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/5/09. (erv, )
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
90
RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge. It is recommended that Plaintiff's "Cause for Preliminary Injunction" 57 be denied by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/01/09. (jjh, )
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing
88
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2009. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 57 , filed June 25, 2009] is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT and a written Recommendation will issue . As to the request for production of documents 13, 15 and 18, Defendants have supplemented their responses on September 17, 2009. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before October 05, 2009. A Motion Hearing is set for November 04, 2009 at 9:00 a.m., limited to 1-1/2 hours. Plaintiffs Oral Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline is granted. Discovery cut-off extended to November 20, 2009 and dispostive motion deadline extended to December 21, 2009. Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to March 11, 2010 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom C-201. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd) (Modified on 9/23/2009 corrected link to 57 )(erv, ).
|
June 18, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 48 Report and Recommendations; denying 31 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Denying as Moot 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify; by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/18/09.(erv, )
|
June 16, 2009 |
Filing
53
ORDER Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/16/09. (erv, )
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
48
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is Recommended that the Defendants Motion to Dismiss 31 be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/26/2009. (sah, )
|