September 28, 2009 |
Filing
127
ORDER. The Recommendation of United State07/28/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Defendant Elaine Meyers Motion For Summary Judgment 105 filed 05/29/2009, is GRANTED. Defendant Dr. Pitchers Motion For Summary Judgment 107 filed05/29/2009, is GRANTED . Plaintiffs claims against defendants, Elaine Meyer and Jill Pitcher, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Trial Preparation Conference, currently scheduled for 10/02/2009, at 9:30 a.m., as well as the trial, currently set to commence on Monday, 10/1 9/2009, are VACATED. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendants, Elaine Meyer and Jill Pitcher, against plaintiff, Clarence A. Walker. Judgment further SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendants, Lieutenant Harry Courtney, misidentified in the original c aption as Lt. Cortney, and Trent Rold, D.D.S., identified in the caption as Dentists (sic) Rold, and against plaintiff, Clarence A. Walker, as to all claims for relief and causes of action asserted against them in this action, in accordance with my prior Order Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 79 entered Apri04/07/2009. All defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/28/2009.(sah, )
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing
119
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT. It is RECOMMENDED that Meyer's Motion for Summary Judgement 105 BE GRANTED, that Pitcher's Motion for Summary Judgment 107 BE GRANTED. Accordingly, it is recommended that this case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant Pitcher's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses and for Sanctions 91 and Plaintiff's Motion to Order Sanctions Against Defendant [sic] Attorney, Terry Cipoletti, for Harassment and Abusive Deposition 100 are DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/28/2009. (sah, )
|
July 8, 2009 |
Filing
117
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 112 filed 06/08/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Plaintiffs Eminent (sic) Emergency Section 1983 Relief Motion To Order Injunctive Relief Against Defendant Meyer and Pitcher 84 filed 04/2 9/2009, is DENIED. Plaintiffs Eminent (sic) Emergency Section 1983 Relief Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury 110 , filed 06/02/2009, which has been construed as a motion asking the court to enter the injunctive relief requested by the original motion, is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/08/2009.(sah, )
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing
112
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. That Plaintiffs Motion for Eminent [sic] Emergency Section 1983 Relief 84 BE DENIED (First Motion) and Motion for Eminent [sic] Emergency Section 1983 Relief 110 BE DENIED AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/08/2009. (sah, )
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing
102
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 10/19/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/2/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/28/2009. (sah, )
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing
97
MINUTE ORDER granting 94 plaintiffs Order to Proceed to Trial by Jury. On 05/27/2009 at 11:00 a.m., the court shall conduct a telephonic setting conference. Counsel for the defendants shall arrange, initiate, and coordinate the conference call necessary to facilitate the setting conference by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/21/2009.(sah, )
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing
83
MINUTE ORDER denying 81 Plaintiffs Motion to Order Injunctive Relief Against Meyer and Pitcher by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/20/2009.(sah, )
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
79
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 73 filed 03/09/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Defendant Lt. Cortneys Motion To Dismiss 34 filed 10/31/2008 is GRANTED. Trent Rold, D.D.S. Motion To Dismiss 51 filed 12/04/2008 is GRAN TED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants, Lieutenant Harry Courtney, misidentified in the caption as Lt. Cortney, Trent Rold, D.D.S., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. At the time final judgment is entered, judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendants, Lieutenant Harry Courtney, misidentified in the caption as Lt. Cortney, Trent Rold, D.D.S., and against plaintiff, Clarence A. Walker. At the time final judgment is entered, defendants shall be AWARDED their costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/07/2009.(sah, )
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing
76
MINUTE ORDER granting 74 Defendant Dr. Pritchers Motion for Leave to Depose Prisoner Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/27/2009.(sah, )
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing
73
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: that Courtneys Motion to Dismiss 34 be GRANTED, that Rolds Motion to Dismiss 51 be GRANTED and that the case against them be dismissed in its entirety pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/09/2009. (sah, )
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
69
MINUTE ORDER denying 66 Plaintiffs Motion for Request for Relief on Defendant Rold and denying 67 Motion to Include Injuries; [sic] Caused by Defendant Rold by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/10/2009.(sah, )
|
January 28, 2009 |
Filing
65
ORDER denying 57 Plaintiffs Motion for Request for Relief by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/28/2009.(sah, )
|