December 22, 2011 |
Filing
204
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/2011. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice [Docket No. 198] is CONVERTED into a Rule 41 Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice and is GRANTED. (jjpsl, )
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing
203
ORDER granting 202 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant City of Aurora. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all of plaintiff's claims against defendant City of Aurora are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/15/11.(mnfsl, )
|
December 14, 2011 |
Filing
201
ORDER granting 200 Amended Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Aurora Defendants. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all of plaintiff's claims against defendants Daniel J. Oates, Ed Tauer, Daniel Byrd, Eric Bugge, Jeremy Sexton, Gennifer Wolf, Jill Bill, and Michael Woodyard are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his or her own attorney's fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/14/11.(mnfsl, )
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
186
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Seven-day Jury Trial set for 2/6/2012 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/20/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/11. (mnfsl, )
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
172
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant Donald Ainsworth's 115 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff John Davis' fifth claim for relief is dismissed. Plaintiff John Davis' sixth and seventh claims for relief may proceed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/11.(mnf, )
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
142
MINUTE ORDER granting 140 Defendants Oates and Tauer's Unopposed Motion toModify Amendment to Scheduling Order Re: the Dispositive Motion Deadline. Scheduling Order 108 is amended. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/30/2011.(mjwcd)
|
January 24, 2011 |
Filing
136
MINUTE ORDER granting 132 Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify Amendment to Scheduling Order Re: Expert Disclosure, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure and Discovery Cutoff and 134 Supplement to Partially Unopposed Motion Modify Amendment to Scheduling Or der Re: Expert Disclosure, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure and Discovery Cutoff. Expert disclosure deadline is extended up to and including 1/31/2011. Rebuttal expert disclosure deadline is extended up to and including 2/28/2011. Discovery deadline is extended up to and including 4/1/2011 for the sole purpose of taking the potential deposition of Defendants' expert witness, Gary Gutterman, M.D, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/24/11.(mnf, )
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
131
MINUTE ORDER granting 129 Unopposed Second Motion to Amend/Modify the Scheduling Order 108 Re: Expert Disclosures up to and including 1/19/2011, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/19/2011.(mjwcd)
|
December 22, 2010 |
Filing
128
MINUTE ORDER granting 126 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Modify 108 the Scheduling Order Re: Expert Disclosures to and including 1/17/2011, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/22/2010.(mjwcd)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
112
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint 111 , defendant Ainsworth's Motion to Dismiss 68 is DENIED as moot, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/10. (pabsec)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
110
MINUTE ORDER granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/24/10.(ebs, )
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing
107
MINUTE ORDER granting 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Acceptance of Amendment to Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/16/2010.(mjwcd)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
94
ORDER granting 92 Joint Motion to Commence Discovery. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2010 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/27/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/7/2010.(mjwcd)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
85
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/31/10. (pabsec)
|
March 19, 2010 |
Filing
83
MINUTE ORDER denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Relief from Stay of Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/19/2010.(mjwcd)
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 74 parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference Scheduled for January 14, 2010. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/14/2010 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2010.(mjwcd )
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion to Vacate Status Conference. Status Conference set for 6/24/09 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/15/09.(ebs, )
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
59
ORDER granting 57 Joint Motion to Vacate Status Conference Scheduled for April 9, 2009. Status Conference reset for 6/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/7/09.(ebs, )
|
March 11, 2009 |
Filing
51
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/11/09. (ebs, )
|
February 18, 2009 |
Filing
42
MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Determination of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Discovery is stayed until further order of court. Parties to contact Magistrate Judge within five days after ruling on Motion to Dismiss to set a status conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/09.(ebs, )
|