Mihelich-Herrera v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Diedre D. Mihelich-Herrera
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv02490
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Defendant to pay plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees in the amount or $3,411.86, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/16/09.(gmssl, )
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. Civil action is remanded to defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 4/20/09.(gmssl, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/23/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/22/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/6/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/9/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mihelich-Herrera v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diedre D. Mihelich-Herrera
Represented By: Patrick C.H. Spencer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?