September 16, 2010 |
Filing
195
ORDER AFFIRMED 187 The July 22, 2010 Order of United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Websters Motion for Summary Judgment; AFFIRMED and ADOPTED 188 Report and Recommendations of United States M agistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland; Denying as moot 135 Motion for Order; granting 139 Defendants Kevin Milyard, Physicians Health Partners, Joseph Fortunato, Beverly Dowis, and Christopher Wade Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 150 Moti on for Order for Depositions [sic] of Various Pleadings; granting 169 Defendant Brian Websters Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; denying 189 Plaintiffs Motion to Object to Magistrates Denial of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant Websters Motion for Summary Judgment, APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; Denying as moot 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Requesting Disposition of Pleadings, Objections, and Resolutions to Motions for De Novo Review Pursuant to Rule 72(b)(3); This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/16/2010.(erv, )
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
187
ORDER: denying 173 Motion to Strike Defendant Websters Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/10.(bnbcd, )
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing
165
ORDER STRIKING Response to 159 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gregg Joseph Savajian. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before April 1, 2010, the plaintiff shall file an amended response to the defendants motion for summary judgment. The amende d response shall comply with the Local Rules of this court and with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall file a reply brief within 15 days after the amended response is filed. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/1/2010. (erv, )
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing
164
ORDER IT IS ORDERED that United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Bolands October 29, 2009 95 is ACCEPTED and, Plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive Relief 21 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the December 17, 2009 Order of Magistrate Judge Boland [ 132] is AFFIRMED and that Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Grant Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories 84 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Bolands Order to Strike Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federa l Rules of Procedure, Rule 56 161 is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 159 be reinstated and this document be re-docketed by the Courts docketing clerk as Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion fo r Summary Judgment 139 ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file any Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment 139 no later than March 4, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Letter Requesting the Status of Case 163 is now moot. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/25/2010.(erv, )
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
161
ORDER: striking 159 Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Federal Civil Rules of Procedure, Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/17/10.(bnbcd, )
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
155
ORDER granting 107 Defendants Second Motion to Seal; granting 109 Defendants Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/26/2010.(erv, )
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER OVERRULING AS MOOT 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall attempt to personally serve a copy of the Amended Prisoner Complaint, summons, order granting leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 and all other orders upon Defendant Brian Webster at the address provided by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be paid by the United States Marshal. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/5/2010. (erv, )
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing
137
MINUTE ORDER denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Request of Hearing Transcripts Recorded for Scheduling Conference Pursuant to Federal Civil Rules, Rule 26 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/22/09.(erv, )
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing
133
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 Amended Complaint filed by Gregg Joseph Savajian, that the Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to defendant Brian Webster pursuant to Local Rule 41.1 for failure to prosecute. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/17/09. (erv, )
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
114
MINUTE ORDER: granting 104 Defendants Motion to Allow Deposition of Plaintiff Gregg Joseph Savajian Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(a)(2). Defendants are permitted to take the deposition of plaintiff Gregg Joseph Savajian on December 8, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. at the Sterling Correctional Facility, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/09.(bnbcd, )
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing
102
ORDER: denying 93 Plaintiffs Motion to Request a Physical Examination by aThird Party Pursuant to Federal Civil Rules of Procedure, Rule 35(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/10/09.(bnbcd, )
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing
96
ORDER: denying as moot 87 Plaintiffs Request for Ruling on Motion forTemporary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. Proc., Rule 12(c), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/09.(bnbcd, )
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
92
ORDER: denying 89 Plaintiffs Second Request For Production of Documents and Other Tangible Discovery Materials to Defendant Christopher Wade, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/22/09.(bnbcd, )
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
73
ORDER: denying 69 the Plaintiffs Motion to Grant Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories Pursuant to Rule 33(a)(1)--Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/09.(bnbcd, )
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
38
ORDER: denying 25 Motion to Show Cause to Arrest/SubpoenaPlaintiffs Medical Records From Defendant by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/7/09.(bnbcd, )
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/29/2009. (sah, )
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/01/09. (jjh, )
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and a Prisoner Complaint on the court's current and proper forms. Prisoner Complaint shall list addresses for all defendants by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/19/2009. (llk, )
|