Carter v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Pauline Carter
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv00505
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees Under EAJA. Defendant to pay plaintiff, attorney fees in the amount of $3,356.83, to plaintiff, in care of plaintiff's attorney, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/22/09.(gms, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendant's 14 Unopposed Motion to Remand. This action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 8/20/09.(lam, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/9/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/10/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/24/2009 by Judge John L. Kane on 6/2/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Carter
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?