Mulvey v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Edward H. Mulvey
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv01012
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 The Stipulated Motion for Award of Attorney Fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. The Defendant pay to Plaintiff reasonable attorney fees in the amount of $5,000.00. The EAJA attorney fee award shall be made payable to Plaintiff's counsel, as assignee for Plaintiff, and mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/22/2009.(sah, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. Civil action is remanded to defendant for administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 11/24/09.(gms, )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint Case Management Plan (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/8/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/8/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/23/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/29/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulvey v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward H. Mulvey
Represented By: Rick P. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?