Lopez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Peggy Lopez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv01096
Filed: May 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Application for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Defendant to pay plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees in amount of $2,350.00, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/8/10.(gmssl, )
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. Civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 12/1/09.(gms, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/20/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/19/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/3/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/3/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Lopez
Represented By: Ruth K. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?