McMillan v. Wiley et al
Plaintiff: Shane McMillan
Defendant: Wiley, Fox, Jones, Javernick, Collins, Fenlon, Madison, Nalley, Watts, Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice, United States and Lappin
Case Number: 1:2009cv01709
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 65 , is GRANTED. In accordance therewith, Claim 1(a), Claim 1(b), and Claim 2, contained in the Second Amended Complaint, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a c laim. Plaintiff's APA Claim, contained in the Request for Relief section of the Second Amended Complaint, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Mix 89 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 86 is DENIED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/14/11.(jjh, )
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 83 Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/11/11.(jjh, )
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Stay. Ordered that case deadline are stayed pending resolution of the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 65 . Ordered that if appropriate, within 5 days of resolution of the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, the p arties shall file a joint status report setting forth agreed upon case deadlines for conducting discovery and filing dispositive motions. If the parties cannot agree, they shall so state in the status report and provide respective proposed schedules by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/05/11.(jjh, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave. However, the motion shall not exceed 25 pages. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/23/11. (wydcd, rrk)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER re 60 Plaintiffs Partially Opposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Order entered on August 19, 2010 55 is amended as follows: Discovery due by 4/29/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2011, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/2011.(erv, )
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/13/10. (lyg, )
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 50 Plaintiffs Motion for Order for the Following Facts to be Considered While Reviewing Defendants Martinez Report. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/2010.(erv, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: 47 Defendants' oral Motion for a Martinez order is granted. Ordered as stated in the document by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/6/2010. (klmcd)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Third Party Tracy Swenas Motion for Permissive Joinder to [sic] Rule 20(A) or for Permissive Intervention Pursuant to Rule 24(b) F.R. Civ. P. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/2010.(klmcd)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendant Bureau of Prisions is dismissed as parties to this action because it is immune from suit. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to removed Defendant Bureau of Prisons as a named party to the suit. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer for Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/05/2010. (sah, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER overruling 9 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered that Mr. McMillan shall have 30 days to cure the deficiency if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/19/09.(jjh, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/01/09. (jjh, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 07/24/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. Wiley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?