Vernon et al v. Qwest Communications International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Vernon, Rory Patrick Durkin and Bryan Sandquist
Defendant: Qwest Communications International Inc., Qwest Services Corporation, Qwest Corporation, Qwest Communications Corporation and Qwest Broadband Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01840
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 USCA ORDER: Denying Permission to Appeal re: 175 USCA LETTER. Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and Fed. R. App. P. 5, on 05/01/13. (dbrow, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration. This court will GRANT the Qwest Defendants' Renewed 132 Motion to Compel Arbitration and stay this matter pending further proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/8/12.(lsw, )
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER In light of my order staying this case 110 , all currently pending motions are denied without prejudice and may be re-filed as necessary once the stay is lifted; denying 79 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; denying 81 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Motion for Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/3/2011.(ervsl, )
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Court's Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Stay and Requesting Leave to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/2/2010.(erv, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Stay, that this matter is hereby STAYED through the Supreme Courts resolution of AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Concepcion, U.S., 130 S. Ct. 3322 (May 24, 2010). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitratio n 26 is STRICKEN with leave to re-file within twenty-one days of the Supreme Courts resolution of AT&T Mobility, LLC v. Concepcion, U.S., 130 S. Ct. 3322 (May 24, 2010) so that the parties briefs will take into account the aforementioned trilogy of Supreme Court cases. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/2010.(erv, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 83 Defendants Qwest Communications International, Inc., Qwest Services Corp., Qwest Corp., Qwest Communications Company, LLC., and Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Unopposed Motion to Deem Filings in Compliance with Conferral Requirements by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/7/2010.(erv, )
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Reassign Related Actions, for Partial Coordination, and to Stay Briefing of Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration; The class action cases present different claims, facts and allegations and consolidating the two cases for discovery and briefing on the motions to compel is not proper at this time. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/28/2010.(erv, ) (Modified on 2/1/2010 corrected spacing)(erv, ).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants are granted to leave to file a new motion regarding PlaintiffsThird Amended Class Action Complaint. Entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/09. (wydcd, rrk)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 41 Second Amended Class Action Complaint within 5 business days of this Order; Granting 48 Joint Motion for Extension and Stipulation Concerning Motion to Amen; ORDERS that Defendants' Moti on To Compel Arbitration 26 shall be deemed to apply and relate to the Third Amended Class Action Complaint when such complaint is filed, Defendants shall not be required to refile their Motion to Compel Arbitration; and ORDERS that Defendants shal l not be required to file a responsive pleading or any additional Rule 12(b) motion related to the Third Amended Class Action Complaint until the Court has ruled on the pending Motion to Compel Arbitration 26 , If the Motion to Compel Arbitration is denied, Defendants shall file a responsive pleading and/or any additional Rule 12(b) motion within 20 days of the Court's order. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/2/09.(erv, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/5/09. (cbssec)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint on or before September 2, 1009. Defendants may have up to and including September 15, 2009, to file a responsive pleading, including but not limited to, a motion to compel arbitration; granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for defendants. Attorney Deanna D. Dailey and Steven M. Sprenger terminated by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/20/09.(erv, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 10/16/2009 at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/17/09. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon et al v. Qwest Communications International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Vernon
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Patrick Durkin
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Sandquist
Represented By: Daniel C. Bryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications International Inc.
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Services Corporation
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Corporation
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications Corporation
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Broadband Services, Inc.
Represented By: Randall Thor Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?