Schmidt v. DJO, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Schmidt
Defendant: DJO, LLC, I-Flow Corporation, Abbott Laboratories and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02683
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER the parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report, Status Report due by 2/23/2011, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/11. (lyg, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Defendant I-Flow Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Granting in part and denying in part 24 Defendant DJO, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/12/10.(ebs, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. 2nd, 5th, 7th and 9th claims for relief which are asserted exclusively as to defendants Abbott Laboratories and Abbot Laboratories, Inc. are dismissed. Denying as moot 27 Defendants' Abbott Laboratories and Abbot Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in Defendans I-Flow Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and DJO LLC's Motion to Dismiss, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/2/10.(gmssl, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/2/2010, granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendant I-Flow Corporation's Motion to Temporarily Stay All Proceedings; Status Report due by 4/1/2010. Status Conference set for 5/3/2010 09:15 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/22/2010. (sah, )
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for February 12, 2010, is vacated. Status Conference set for 3/2/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/5/2010.(erv, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. DJO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Schmidt
Represented By: Scott Martin Kleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?