Guinn v. Lakewood Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
Defendant: Lakewood Police Department, Nancy Hooper, Jefferson County District Attorney's Office, Jeff Gillio, Jefferson County Public Defender's Office, Angela Jorgenson, Jefferson County Probation Department, Phillip McNulty, Arp and Jefferson County Combined Court's
Case Number: 1:2010cv00827
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED re 34 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge; granting 4 Defendants Jefferson County District Attorneys Offices and Jefferson County Deputy District Attorney Nancy Hoopers Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 City of Lakewoods Motion to Dismiss and the Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/16/2010.(erv, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motions Hearing held on 7/23/2010, taking under advisement 4 Motion to Dismiss and 11 Motion to Dismiss. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Status Conference was held on 7/13/2010. ORDERED: Defendants Jefferson County District Attorney's Office and Deputy District Attorney Nancy Hooper 's Motion to Stay Discovery # 14 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Motion for Discovery # 20 is DENIED; Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Lakewood Police Department # 26 is WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE; A Motions Hearing on Motion to Dismiss # 4 , and on Motion to Dismiss # 11 is set for 7/23/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 7/13/2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/19/10. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinn v. Lakewood Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Gillio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Public Defender's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Combined Court's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?