Russell v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Larry Russell
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01811
Filed: July 30, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2010 11 Featured Case Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/22/2010. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/24/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 2/4/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/4/10. (gmssl, )
February 17, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. Civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/17/11.(gmssl, )
March 17, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 parties' Stipulated Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees. Defendant to pay Plaintiff reasonable attorney fees in the amount of $4,900.00, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/17/11.(gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Russell v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Russell
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]