Handy v. Diggins et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Defendant: Diggins, V. Connors and Scott
Case Number: 1:2010cv02022
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER DISMISSING CASE of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/03/13. (jjhsl, )
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Appointment Order. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall select, notify, and appoint counsel to represent the pro se litigant in this civil matter by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/11/13. (jjhsl, )
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Affirmng in Part and Rejecting in Part Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 243 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED IN PART AND REJECTED IN PART. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 204 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/29/13.(jjhsl, )
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 222 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. ORDERED that the Panel of Islamic Clerks is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this case, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/09/12.(jjhsl, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MINUTE ORDER granting 230 Motion for Court to Order Clerk to Provide Plaintiff with a Copy of Magistrate's Recommendations, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/19/12.(sgrim)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Defer or Deny Defendents [sic] Motion for Summary Judgment 206 is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/24/12.(sgrim)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Joint Motion for Leave to File Instanter 201 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Defendant's Motion and Brief for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/17/12.(sgrim)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery 188 is DENIED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/12.(sgrim)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER granting 179 Motion for Subpoena. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff one signed subpoena, featuring the caption of this case, but otherwise blank by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/06/12.(jjhsl, )
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying without prejudice 176 Motion for Court Order Sterritt Fuller to Take Deposition Upon Written Questions by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/18/12.(jjhsl, )
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 172 Motion for Court to Order Defendants or Clerk of the Court to Send Plaintiff Copies of the Second Amended Complaint and Exhibits. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of his Second Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 153) and the Exhibits thereto (Doc. No. 93-2) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/09/12.(jjhsl, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER granting 164 Motion for Court to Set Scheduling Confernece. Discovery due by 6/5/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/10/12.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 4/10/2012 to correct where hearing is held (jjhsl, ).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 141 Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/23/12.(jjhsl, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 93 GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART consistent with the Recommendation by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/08/12.(jjhsl, )
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time 146 and "Motion for Court to Order Defendants or Clerk of the Court to Send Plaintiff Copy of Dispositive Motion 147 are GRANTED Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment no later than February 21, 2012. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 141 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/06/12.(jjhsl, )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Order. Defense counsel shall supplement disclosures on or before October 7, 2011. For further information, please see attached minutes. (FTR: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2011 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, granting in part 98 Motion to Quash, denying 105 Motion for Leave without prejudice, and taking under advisement 114 Motion for Order. The Motion for Order 114 has been denied as to Requests for Production Nos. 4, 5, and 6, however the court will hear further argument on the remaining discovery issues at the Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. For further information, please see attached minutes. (FTR: Nick Richards) (kmtcd)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 76 Motion and Affidavit for Order Compelling Sgt. Doizaki to Return Plaintiffs Legal Work and to Allow Plaintiff to Have Forthcoming Discovery in this case; denying 80 Motion for Court Ordered Free Legal Phone Calls, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/18/11.(lsw, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Request the Defendants to Allow the Plaintiff to Have Copies of the Anticipated Deposition 75 is Denied by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/15/11.(jjh, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute ORDER granting 68 Motion for Subpoena to Produce. The Clerk is directed to send four signed subpoenas to Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/06/11.(jjh, )
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 6/2/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/09/11. (jjh, )
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge datedMarch 23, 2011, is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alter native, Motion for Summary Judgment 23 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in this Order. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint 39 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in this Order. ORDERED that Plain tiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint 47 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint 47 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in this Order by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/06/11.(jjh, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying without prejudice 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/3/11.(mnf, )
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Jury Trial and that all issues so triable will be tried to a jury, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/17/2010.(wjc, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 3 Complaint filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/14/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Servie of Process Form)(erv, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/09/2010. (sah, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a certified copy of prisoner's trust fund statement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/19/10. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. Diggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?