Martinez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Caroline M. Martinez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv00654
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Attorney Feesl. The fees shall be made payable to Plaintiff, and sent to Plaintiff's counsel by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/25/12.(jjhsl, )
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Case is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for further fact finding pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/28/12. (gmssl, )
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/25/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/24/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 9/8/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/13/11. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: William George Pharo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline M. Martinez
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?