WildEarth Guardians v. Lamar Utilities Board et al
Plaintiff: |
WildEarth Guardians |
Defendant: |
Lamar Utilities Board and Arkansas River Power Authority |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00742 |
Filed: |
March 23, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Marcia S. Krieger |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 7604 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 11, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 66 Motion to Stay. ORDERS that all proceedings in these cases are hereby stayed through and including September 6, 2013. Within ten days following the September 6, 2013, end of this stay, the parties are ordered to file a status report with this Court indicating the then-current status of this case by Judge David M. Ebel on 07/11/13.(jjhsl, )
|
July 11, 2012 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. Supplement Complaint (43-2) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Each party shall pay its own attorney fees and costs for this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/11/2012.(mjwcd)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
42
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/17/12. (msksec, )
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER Scheduling Conference on the merits set for 5/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/11/2012. (mjwcd)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
36
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is DENIED. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/29/12. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Extend Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to Permit Plaintiff an Opportunity to Conduct Limited Discovery Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a supplemental or amen ded response brief once the limited discovery regarding jurisdiction is completed to 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/24/2011.(wjc, )
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/13/11. (mskcd)
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/6/2011. (mjwcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?