Lamar v. Jones et al
Petitioner: Lamar
Respondent: Susan Jones and John W. Suthers
Case Number: 1:2011cv01028
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 33 Order. By Clerk on 5/17/13. (mnfsl, )
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Opinion on Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (including # 1 and # 12 ) is DENIED. The Motion and Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment on Habeas Claim Two Fed.R. Civ. P. 56, ECF # 27 , and the Motion to Obtain Response to Motion for Summary Judgment on Claim Two Pursuant to D.C.COLO.L.Civ.R. 56.1, ECF # 29 , are DENIED as moot. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/13/2013. (klyon, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO DISMISS IN PART AND FOR ANSWER AND FOR STATE COURT RECORD. The Court will dismiss Claims Three and Four as requested by Mr. Lamar. The 15 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is denied as moot. Within thirty days Respondents are directed to file a n Answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of Claims One and Six. Within thirty days from the date of this Order the Respondents shall file with the Clerk of the Court, in electronic format if available, a copy of the complete record of Mr. Lamar's state court proceedings in Case No. 05CR467, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/21/2011.(wjc, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/16/2011. (sah, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to File Second Pre-Answer Response, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/29/11. (lyg, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/3/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamar v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Suthers
Represented By: Susan Eileen Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?