Rabanal v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Jose G. Rabanal
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv01569
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Jose G. Rabanal against Michael J. Astrue re: 26 Order, by Clerk on 10/18/2013. (klyon, )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/30/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/31/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/14/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/4/13. (sgrim)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Reopen Case, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/14/13.(sgrim)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 10/31/11.(gmssl, )
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. Case shall be placed on the AP Docket, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/11. (gmssl, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies within 30 days from the date of this order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/22/11. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabanal v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose G. Rabanal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?