Magluta v. United States Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Magluta
Defendant: Thomas R. Kane, Michael Nalley, Charles Daniels, United States Federal Bureau of Prisons, Patrick Whalen, Vanec, Javernick, Andy Fenlon, Johnson, Banuelos, Massey, Duval, Stegal, Harold Watts, Milusnic, Ron Wiley and Lariva
Case Number: 1:2011cv02381
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying 155 Motion to Strike and denying as moot 158 Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/26/2014.(trlee, )
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying 141 Motion to Reinstate Scheduling Conference and Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/4/14.(lag)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER that the Motion 138 is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for November 13, 2013 is VACATED. The Scheduling Conference will be reset, if necessary, after adjudication of the pending motions to dismiss 56 , 92 . by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/1/2013.(trlee, )
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 101 ). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/06/13. (alvsl)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re: 122 Motion to Vacate. The 8/7/13 hearing is converted to a Status Conference set for 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/31/13.(dkals, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 108 ) is hereby STRICKEN; it isFURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Information for Temporary Restraining Order and Second Verifie d Complaint for Declarative Relief, Temporary, and/or Permanent Injunction (ECF Nos. 112 & 113 ) are hereby STRICKEN; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike Document 108 (ECF No. 111 ) and Motion to Strike Documents 112 and 113 (ECF No. 115 ) are hereby GRANTED for the reasons stated in this Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/19/13. (alvsl)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER granting 103 Joint Motion to Stay Case for 60 Days and to Vacate. The 4/15/13 Motion Hearing and the 4/24/13 Scheduling Conference are vacated. This case shall be stayed until 6/10/13. The parties shall contact the magistrate judge to reschedule the Scheduling Conference. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/10/13.(dkals, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Severance. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/13.(dkals, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. The 65 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Kane, Watts, Nalley, Nelson, Wetzel, Carter, Kapusta, Janas, Mooneyham, Villa, and Ruiz Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is granted in part and denied in part. The 59 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Wiley Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is granted. Defendants Thomas Kane, Harold Watts, Michael Nalley, M. Carter, Janas, Mooneyham, Villa, Henry Ruiz, and Ron Wiley are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/5/13.(mnfsl, )
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re: 54 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Salvador Magluta, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/25/12. (sgrim)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the Second Amended Complaint located at Docket No. 27-1. Defendants' 17 , 18 Motions to Dismiss are d enied as moot. All Defendants, new or already served, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 5/25/2012. The 26 second Joint Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference is granted. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/18/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/26/12.(mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magluta v. United States Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banuelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milusnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lariva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Magluta
Represented By: Lawrence E. Besser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?