Howells v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Oliver N. Howells
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv02814
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/7/13.(msksec, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Oliver N. Howells against Michael J. Astrue re: 21 Order, by Clerk on 5/1/2013. (klyon, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Opinion, ORDER and Judgment. The Commissioner of Social Security's decision isREVERSED, and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings. The Clerk shall enter a Judgment in accordance herewith. Any request for costs or attorney fees shall be made within 14 days of the date of this Opinion, Order, and Judgment. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/29/2013. (klyon, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/2/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/2/2012. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/17/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/23/12. (gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howells v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver N. Howells
Represented By: Patrick C.H. Spencer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?