Ramsey v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Vaughn Wilson Ramsey
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv03282
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 06/11/15.(jhawk, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. The Stipulation for Equal Access to Justice Act Attorneys Fees 21 is APPROVED, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/16/12.(sgrim)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The Stipulation for Remand 18 shall be construed as a motion and as such is GRANTED, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/12/12.(sgrim)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiff's Brief due by 5/31/2012. SS Defendant's Brief due by 6/29/2012. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 7/13/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/1/12. (lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Wilson Ramsey
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?