Hull v. Beverage Distributors Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Hull
Defendant: Beverage Distributors Company, LLC, Tom Rogers, John Johnson, Linda Hollman, Ted Halley and Bryan Levins
Case Number: 1:2011cv03287
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER The Magistrate Judges February 14, 2013 Recommendation ECF No. 78 is ADOPTED; Plaintiffs Objection ECF No. 80 to the Recommendation is OVERRULED; Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ECF No. 42 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion to Amend his Amended Complaint ECF No. 65 is DENIED; Plaintiffs claims in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Each party shall bear their own costs; and The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/8/2013.(ervsl, )
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 53 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Original Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 15(a)(2) without prejudice for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A and for failure to submit a copy of the proposed amended complaint with his motion to amend, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/14/2012.(ervsl, )
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/14/2012. (kmtcd)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/2012. (kmtcd)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER. Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (#36,filed May 25, 2012). Being otherwise fully advised, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion 36 is GRANTED. Attorney Allison R. Cohn is relieved of any further representation of Defendants in the above-captioned matter. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/29/2012.(sahsl, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/10/2012. (kmtcd)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/4/2012. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. Beverage Distributors Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Distributors Company, LLC
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rogers
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Johnson
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hollman
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Halley
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Levins
Represented By: Allison Rachel Cohn
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?