Town of Superior, The v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Town of Superior, The
Defendant: Ken Salazar, Daniel M. Ashe, Steve Guertin, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior and Steve Berendzen
Interested_party: Jefferson County, Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2011cv03294
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 126 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/28/12.(dkals, ) Modified on 12/28/2012 to attach correct document (dkals, ).
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 99 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 103 Federal Defendants' Motion to Expedite Resolution of This Case on the Merits and to Schedule a Status Conference; and 121 Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Renew Plaintiffs Joint Motion for PreliminaryInjunction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/21/12.(pabsec)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff City of Goldens Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Version of Opening Brief 98 , is GRANTED. The amended brief is accepted as filed, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/24/12.(sgrim)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Re Motion to Supplement and Complete Record 54 . SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/31/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/1/2012. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/16/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/15/12. (sgrim)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Intervene by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/12. Jefferson Parkway Public Highway Authority is granted permission to intervene as a defendant in this matter. (dkals, ) Modified on 6/29/2012 to correct judge and add text (dkals, ).
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Intervene 24 . The Board ofCounty Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado is granted permission to intervene as a defendant in that consolidated case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/4/12.(pabcd)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 12-cv-00388-PAB shall be consolidated for all purposes with Case Nos. 11-cv-03294-PAB and 12-cv-00034-PAB. 11-cv-03294 shall be the lead case. The parties are directed to file all further pleadings in case No. 11-cv-03294. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/10/12.(cmacd )
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate filed in 12-cv-00034-PAB. This case and 12-cv-00034-PAB shall be consolidated. 11-cv-03294-PAB will constitute the lead case, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/27/12. (gmssl, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Permission to Intervene by the Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado. The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, Colorado is granted permission to intervene as a defendant in this matter pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P. 24(a)(2). By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/17/2012.(jjpsl, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER Court having reviewed 16 the parties' Stipulated Motion to Withdraw, 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is deemed withdrawn without prejudice to renew. The 1/17/12 hearing is vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/10/12.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Superior, The v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Ashe
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Guertin
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Represented By: Ty Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Berendzen
Represented By: Ty Bair
Represented By: Stephen D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Superior, The
Represented By: Melanie Joy Granberg
Represented By: Timothy R. Gablehouse
Represented By: Donn Lee Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Jefferson County, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Eric Thomas Butler
Represented By: Writer Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?