Vorhies v. Astrue
Plaintiff: James L. Vorhis
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv00451
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Teller
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 04/07/15.(jhawk, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/10/12.(sgrim)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. REVERSES the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with a REMAND of the cause to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings as set out above, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/12/12.(lygsl, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiff's Brief due by 6/29/2012. SS Defendant's Brief due by 7/30/2012. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 8/14/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/16/12. (lygsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vorhies v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Vorhis
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Robert Louis Van Saghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?