Coit v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Jill Coit
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras, Colorado Department of Corrections, The, James Welton, Lary Reid, Robert Cantwell, Lloyd Waide, Michael Doussard, Dennis Hougnon, Colin Carson, John Martin, Hatfield, Cathie Holst, Joan Shoemaker, P. Frantz, Martinez-Hochbe-Yenett, Lasso, Anthony DeCesaro, Fields, Scott Hall, Kitty Arnold, Florida Department of Corrections, Reading Committee, Poole and Razdon
Case Number: 1:2012cv00609
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Aristedes Zavaras, Colin Carson, Dennis Hougnon, James Welton, Joan Shoemaker, John Martin, Larry Reid, Lloyd Waide, P. Frantz, Robert Cantwell against Jill Coit entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/30/16. (rkeec)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER that Defendant Carson, Hougnon, Reid, Cantwell, Waide, Zavaras, and Weltons Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 449 and Defendant Shoemakers Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 448 are GRANTED. Summary Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants with respect to Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claims and retaliation claims. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/29/2016.(evana, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 439 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Authorization for Release of Documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/27/2014.(emill)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 431 Defendants motions for summary judgment; denying without prejudice 432 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. In the joint Status Report that is due November 28, 2014, the parties shall set forth a proposed briefing schedule for any renewed/updated motions for summary judgment, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/18/2014.(evana, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER. ORDERED that the Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 387 and 389) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to refile not later than March 31, 2014 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/29/14.(jhawk, )
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Court to Explain What the KeyLocked Symbol Means on Certain Court Entries (Docket No. 406) is STRICKENpursuant to the court's Order (Docket No. 403) placing a stay on this matter and Judge Daniel's Order (Docket No. 404) affirming and adopting the stay by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/04/13.(jjhsl, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER affirming and adopting Report and Recommendations re 340 . See attached order for further information. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/3/2013.(trlee, )
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER granting 395 Unrepresented Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Explain What the Key Locked Symbol Means on Certain Court Entries, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/23/2013.(mjwcd)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MINUTE ORDER denying 378 Unrepresented Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Add Former Defendant Dussart Back Into the Case, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/19/2013.(mjwcd)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MINUTE ORDER denying 369 plaintiff's Motion to Order the CDOC to Approve Specialist Visit for Mole on Plaintiff's Breast. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/12/2013.(mjwcd)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MINUTE ORDER granting 362 Motion to be Present for Voir Dire and Questions to be Asked to Potential Jurors. The parties are directed to review and comply with my Practice Standards with respect to all trial preparation matters and deadlines by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/02/13.(jjhsl, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE ORDER granting 350 plaintiff's Motion for Record of Case Numbers10-cv-00155 [sic] and 12-cv-00609 and 98-cv-2031 to be Sent to Plaintiff. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/2013.(mjwcd)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Permission from this Court to File an Additional Five (5) Extra Requests for Production of Documents from Each Defendant (Docket No. 342) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Correct P laintiffs Error in Plaintiffs Response (Docket No. 346) is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that defendants shall have up to and including July 26, 2013 to place the additional disclosures in the mail for receipt by plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/24/13.(jjhsl, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER that 193 Order to Show Cause is vacated as to defendant Hatfield, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/10/2013. (mjwcd)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS. Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P 72(a) Objections to various oral rulings made by Magistrate Judge Watanabe at the May 28, 2013 hearing (ECF Nos. 325 , 326 and 327 ) are overruled. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/9/13. (mnfsl, )
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MINUTE ORDER Granting 311 Defendant Hatfield's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss and Leave to Re-File Motion to Dismiss. Motion to Dismiss 309 is withdrawn. Defendant Hatfield is given leave to re-file a motion to dismiss on or before 7/5/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/27/2013.(mjwcd)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MINUTE ORDER denying 295 plaintiff's Motion to order Defendants to Produce the Record of Each Disciplinary Hearing Charge and Results Identified in Defendants' Exhibit Coit 01061, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/30/2013.(mjwcd)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing/Motions Hearing held on 5/28/2013. Order to Show Cause 193 is continued to and including 7/10/2013.Granting 238 Motion for Or der. Granting 241 Motion for Order. Denying without prejudice 243 Motion to Produce. Denying 249 Motion for Order. Denying without prejudice 250 Motion for Order. Denying 251 Motion for Order. Denying 277 Motion for O rder. Deadline for Plaintiff to respond to defendants' outstanding interrogatories, requests for production, and/or requests for admission is 6/14/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2013. Scheduling Order 127 is amended. Status Conference set for 7/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 276 plaintiff's Motion to Order the U.S. Marshall Service to Produce Record of Attempt to Serve Susan Hatfield and Sergeant Fitzgerald. Clerk is directed to serve defendants at CDC, pursuant to Minute Order 222 , by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/17/2013.(mjwcd)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MINUTE ORDER denying 279 plaintiff's Motion to Order Defendants to Provide Documents Referenced in their Discovery Submission of Defendant John Martin's Letter Dated December 17, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/16/2013.(mjwcd)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Onjection to Minute Order 178 . ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objection to Order Denying Motion to Correct Typing Errors and Omissions (ECF No. 196) is OVERRULED. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Watanabes minute order (ECF No. 178) is AFFIRMED by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/19/13. (jjhsl, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Show Cause Hearing / Status Conference held on 4/3/2013. On or before 5/17/2013, defendants shall have tapes transcribed and sent to Plaintiff. denying 186 Motion for Order; denying 190 Motion for Order; denying 195 Motion for Order; denying 199 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; denying 202 Motion for Order; denying 204 Motion for Order; denying 213 Motion for Order; granting 216 Motion for Orde r; denying 217 Motion for Order; granting 218 Motion for Order. Order to Show Cause 193 is continued to 5/28/2013 or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER granting 174 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion to Order the U.S. Marshall [sic] Service to Provide Documentation of Their Attempt to Serve Defendant Dussart. Denying 175 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion to Change Deadline for Joind er of Parties/Amendment to Pleading to Order Defendant to Provide Discovery [sic]. denying 176 Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion to Add Excerpts Into Court of Defendant's Production of Narrative Under Discovery [sic]. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/14/2013.(mjwcd)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Adopting and Affirming Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Boland 153 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that that the claims against defendants Michael Duss art, Jane/John Doe #1, Jane/John Doe #2, and Jane/John Doe #3 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the case caption to reflect the dismissal of these defendants by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/04/13.(jjhsl, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER denying 149 Injunction to Compel the FDOC/LCI to Provide Tapes/Disk Player by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/17/13.(jjhsl, )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER denying 137 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion for Assistance for this Court to Serve Defendant Dussart by Allowing Department of Justice Employee Under 28 U.S.C. § 561 Service by U.S. Marshal Access to Dussart's File, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2012.(mjwcd)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 123 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Provide Plaintiff with a Copy of Documents Used to Begin Civil Action in Case 10-cv-00155-LTB, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/2012.(mjwcd)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Order Defendants to Transcribe the Meeting with Plaintiff and CID Investigator Jay Kirby 100 is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Clarification of Defendant's "Response to Final Paragraph of Court Docket No. 45 and to See Caption" 101 is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit 107 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/05/12.(jjhsl, )
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER denying 68 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion captioned "Defendant Are in Violation of Court Order Docket No. 45 and to Order Florida Department of Corrections to Provide Plaintiff an Extra Large Locker to Store this Cases Legal Documents in Her Cell", as set forth in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/23/2012.(mjwcd)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 66 Plaintiff Request Being Allowed [sic] to Serve thisCourt One Original Copy of Motions/Pleadings. Denying 67 Motion for CID Files Under Rule 34. Defendants shall have up to and including 10/5/2012 to respond to the last paragraph of 68 Defendants are in Violation of Court Order Docket No. 45 and To Order Florida Department of Corrections to Provide Plaintiff an Extra Large Locker to Store This Case's Legal Documents in Her Cell, in which plaintiff requests boxes or a locker to store legal documents. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/25/2012.(mjwcd, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion for Defendant's Counsel When Responding to Produce the Entire Administrative Regulation or Rule Quoted [sic] ; Denying 62 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Order Colorado Department of Corrections to Send U.S. Marshal Defendant Dussart's Job Application. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/19/2012.(mjwcd)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER denying 57 plaintiff's Motion on Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/11/2012.(mjwcd)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 9/6/2012. Defendants shall have up to and including 9/26/2012 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Defendant s to Return 2 Cubic Feet of Legal Documents and 12 Books Needed for This Case 43 and Plaintiff's Motion to Require Defendants to Answer Amended Prisoner Complaint and to Provide Promised Transcription From C.I.D. Investigation Jay Kirby' ;s Meeting with Plaintiff 47 .Denying 50 Motion to Have this Court Produce Letters Plaintiff Wrote to the Courts to Judge Ebel and the Courts Replies. Denying 51 Motion Objection to Minute Order and Request for Information on Rules Governin g Ifp Service and Objection to Telephonic Conference Not Rescheduled to Later Date until Plaintiff Had Counsel. Scheduling Conference / Show Cause Hearing set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to file joint Proposed Scheduling Order 10/29/2012. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Correct Spelling of Defendants' Name and to Notify U.S. Marshall of Addresses for Non-Served Defendants. ORDERED that caption to amended to reflect the correct spelling for Hougnon and Dussart by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/22/12.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 8/22/2012 (jjhsl, ).
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion to Have This Court Notify the United States Marshall [sic] to Serve Defendants [sic] Under In Forma Pauperis Rules 28U.S.C. [sic] ss. 1915 Granted in Order Dated June 8, 2012 Per Judge Boland by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/20/12.(jjhsl, )
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Request Named Court Legal Documents so Plaintiff can Obey Court "OrderSetting Telephone Status Conference for Pro Se Plaintiff(s) Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge and Order Drawing Case." [sic] (docket no. 31) is GRANTED INPART AND DENIED IN PART by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/16/12.(jjhsl, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/6/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/2/2012. (mjwcd)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. ORDER denying 21 Motion to Correct Typing Error and Omissions, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/25/2012.(skssl, )
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/08/12. (nmmsl, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 4 Motion Notifying this Court that Lowell Correctional Institution Refuses to Obey Court Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/16/2012.(skssl, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/12. (lygsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coit v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Coit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Welton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lary Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Doussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Hougnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie Holst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez-Hochbe-Yenett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reading Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?