Ankeney v. Jones
Petitioner: Randal Ankeney
Respondent: Susan Jones, Tom Clements and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00808
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 33 Order on 9/27/12. (lygsl, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ORDERED that the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 and/or 28 U.S.C. § 2241 1 is denied and this case is dismissed with prejudice. ORDERED that there is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability. ORDERED that Applicant's motions to admit or deny allegations 28 , for a hearing 29 , to appoint counsel 30 , and for summary judgment 31 are DENIED as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/25/12.(lygsl, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Second ORDER for State Court Record. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send copies of this order to the following: (1) Clerk of the Court Larimer County Justice Center;(2) Assistant Solicitor General Appellate Division Office of the Attorney General; and (3) Court Services Manager State Court Administrator's Office, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/31/12. (lygsl, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for State Court Record, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/17/12. (lygsl, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/13/2012. (skssl, )
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/02/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ankeney v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randal Ankeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Jones
Represented By: Ryan Alan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Clements
Represented By: Ryan Alan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: Ryan Alan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?