Tejan v. Jones
Plaintiff: Joshua Tejan
Defendant: Dana Busto, Rusty Lander, Joe Ortiz, Aristedes Zavaras and Susan Jones
Case Number: 1:2012cv01156
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 31 is ADOPTED; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 19 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint ECF No. 35 is DENIED; and The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs claims. All parties shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/25/2013.(ervsl, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 25 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiffs Amended Complaint ECF No. 5 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to defendant Joe Ortiz, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to remove defendant Joe Ortiz from the caption of this case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/4/2012.(ervsl, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/2/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejan v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Tejan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Busto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?