Marjerrison v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Jessica Sabrina Marjerrison
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv01365
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. ORDERED that the stipulated motion for fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act 23 is GRANTED. Attorney fees in the amount of $5,600.00 are awarded to and shall be made payable to Plaintiff, sent to him care of his attorney at the address provided in the stipulated motion by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/02/14. (jjhsl, )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT. ORDERED that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further fact finding as directed in this Order pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) by Clerk on 09/16/13. (jjhsl, )
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/19/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/19/2012. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/3/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/7/12. (sgrim)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 filed by Jessica Sabrina Marjerrison, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/29/12. (gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marjerrison v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Sabrina Marjerrison
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?