Dean v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Dorothy M. Dean
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv01851
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The Stipulation to Attorneys Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act 22 is APPROVED, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/15/13. (sgrim)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINAL JUDGMENT. Final judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Courts decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993). Plaintiff may have his costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of the court's order by Clerk on 02/27/13. (jjhsl, )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/28/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/28/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 2/11/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/3/12.(sgrim)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/28/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/4/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 1/18/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/19/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy M. Dean
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?