Willitts v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Rex E. Willitts
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv02242
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 UNOPPOSED AMENDED MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION OF ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 406(b)(1). by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/15/2015.(cthom, )
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Plaintiffs Unopposed Amended Application for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs Under EAJA, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/13/2014.(ervsl, )
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER the Commissioners decision is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for rehearing, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/19/2013. (ervsl, )
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another judge of this Court. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/6/2013. (klyon, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 2/18/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 3/20/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/3/2013 by Judge John L. Kane on 12/17/12. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willitts v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex E. Willitts
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?