Carbajal v. St. Anthony Central Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Dean Carbajal
Defendant: St. Anthony Central Hospital, Centura Health, Chuang, (I) Chuang, Stephan M. Swan, Stephan (I) M. Swan, Gregory J. Englund, Gregory (I) J. Englund, Marci L. Hansue, Marci (I) L. Hansue, Michael O'Niell, Michael (I) O'Niell, Jay Lopez, Jay (I) Lopez, Larry Black, Larry (I) Black, Thomas, (I) Thomas, Steven Carter, Steven (I) Carter, Gilberto Lucio, Gilberto (I) Lucio and City and County of Denver
Case Number: 1:2012cv02257
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER. ORDERED that the "Second Motion for Transcripts of All Trial Proceedings and the Record for Preparation of the Pending Appeal" 412 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/04/16.(jhawk, )
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 391 Defendants' Motion Seeking Attorney fees and Costs. Defendants are awarded reasonable attorney fees of $82,674 pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988(b). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/2015.(mlace, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER Defendants shall submit a supplemental brief. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/10/2015. (mlace, )
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Jay (I) Lopez, Larry (I) Black, Michael (I) O'Niell against Dean Carbajal re: 383 Jury Trial - Completed. By Clerk on 8/19/15. (kfinn)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 STIPULATION and ORDER Governing the Custody and Disposition of Trial Exhibits, Transcripts, and Paper. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/18/15. (kfinn)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting 356 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/4/2015. (mlace, )
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/28/15. Amended Motion for Leave to Have a Legal Box for Each of Plaintiff's Cases That He Is Presently Litigating Pro Se # 324 is DENIED as moot.(lgale, )
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER re: 351 Notice (Other) filed by Dean Carbajal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/27/2015. (mlace, )
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/15. Motion for Leave to Take Videotaped Preservation Depositions of Out-of-State Witnesses Gregory J. Englund and Marci L. Hansue # 337 is GRANTED.(lgale, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER approving 317 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/23/2015. 323 Denver Defendants' Objections to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and 326 Plaintiff Dean Carbajal's Con temporaneous Objections to the United States Magistrate Judge Kristen Mix's Recommendation are overruled. 239 Denver Defendants' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, 241 Defendants Stephen M. Swan and Apex's Motion for Summary Jud gment, and 243 The St. Anthony Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment are granted. 327 Plaintiff Dean Carbajal's Motion for Leave To File an Objection to the Magistrate's Recommendation in Excess of the Standard Page Limitation is denied as moot.(mlace, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER denying 332 Motion For Leave To File Reply in Support of Denver Defendants' Objections to Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/16/15.(dkals, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/13/15. Motion to Reopen Discovery for the Purpose of Disclosing Mr. Carbajal's Recent Diagnosis and Treatment for an Infection Related to His Catheterization, and for a Court Ordered Medical Examination # 314 is DENIED.(lgale, )
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER That the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 298 , filed January 15, 2015, is approved and adopted as an order of this court; That the objections stated in Plaintiff Mr. Carbajals Contemporaneous Objection to the Honorable Magi strate Kristen Mixs Recommendation 298 Denying Leave To Amend 307 , filed February 17, 2015, are overruled; That Plaintiffs Motion To File Amended Complaint 284 , filed December 23, 2104, is denied, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/27/2015.(evana, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/27/15. Motion for Leave to Have a Legal Box for Each of the Plaintiffs Cases That Are Presently being Litigated [# 300 ] is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTE ORDER granting 303 Motion for Leave to Correct Plaintiff's Exhibit 30 with Complete Text as Opposed to Abstract that was Submitted via Errata Sheet. Amended Exhibit 30 [#303-1] is hereby substituted for original Exhibit 30 [#288-4]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/2015. (alowe)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/15/15. Motion for Leave to Submit an Errata Sheet Correcting Evidence Index [Doc. #274] is GRANTED. (lgale, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 281 Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Responses. The Motion is denied to the extent that the Medical Defendants seek to have Plaintiff's Responses stricken. The Motion is granted to the extent that the Medical Defendants seek an extension of time in which to file a Reply. Replies due by 1/15/2015. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/18/2014. (alowe)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying 258 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/15/2014.(alowe)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/30/14. Motion for Extension of Time or Stay of Proceedings Until the Medical and Denver Defendants Comply With [Their] Discovery Obligations [#253] and on Plaintiff's accompanying Declaration of Dean Carbajal 254 is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set 7/24/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set 8/10/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/14. (rebsec)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER: The court SHALL CONDUCT a telephonic setting conference on Tuesday, 10/28/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn to set this matter for combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference and trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/2014. (alowe)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 233 Motion for Leave To File Motion For Summary Judgment in Excess of 20 Page Limit by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/30/14.(jhawk, )
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/30/14. Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [#221] is GRANTED in part. The discovery deadline is extended to September 8, 2014 for the sole purpose of continuing Plaintiff's deposition, if necessary, and for nonparties to respond to Plaintiff's subpoenas issued by the Court on July 30, 2014. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to October 8, 2014. (lgale)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 196 Motion for Appointment [of] Expert Pursuant to the Court's Order [Doc. # 145 ]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/11/2014.(klyon, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/14. Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline and Modification of Scheduling Order 214 is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/2/14. Motion for Leave to Take Prisoner Deposition [#207] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Denver Defendants may take Plaintiff's deposition with regard to this litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deposition shall take place at Arkansas Valley Correctional Facility or, if Plaintiff is moved to a different correctional facility subsequent to this Order, at Plaintiff's new correctional facility. (lgale)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 174 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/14. Discovery due by 6/3/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2014.(lag)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/4/14. (lag)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order [# 160 ] is DENIED. Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Joinder [sic] Parties [# 153 ] is GRANTED. The deadline for amendment of the complaint and join der of parties is extended to February 19, 2014. Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Denver Defendant's First Set of Discovery [# 158 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the Denver Defendants' First Set of Discovery on or before February 12, 2014. Defendants'Joint Motion for Protective Order [# 164 ] is DENIED without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/29/2014.(klyon, )
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting Defendant City and County of Denver's 151 Motion to Clarify Order # 133 and Amending Same. The court CLARIFIES and CONFIRMS that there are no claims remaining in this lawsuit in which the City and County of Denver is implicate d as a defendant. The Order Re: Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge [# 133 ] IS AMENDED at pages 18-19, paragraph 12 as follows:That defendants Dr. Chuang, Supervising Physician, in his official and individual capacity; Lieutenant Th omas, Lieutenant for the Denver Police Department, in his individual and Official Capacity; Captain Steven Carter, Captain for the Denver Police Department, in his individual and Official Capacity; Gilberto Lucio, Police Officer for the Denver Police Department, in his individual and Official Capacity; and the City and County of Denver, a political subdivision of the State of Colorado, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/10/2013. (klyon, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER granting 148 Joinder in Response to Plaintiff's Objection to the District Court's September 6, 2013 Order re: Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Filed by Defendants Centura Health, Gregory J. Englund, Marci L. Hanshue, [and] St. Anthony Central Hospital. The Motion is deemed jointly filed by Defendants St. Anthony Central Hospital, Centura Health, Gregory J. Englund, Marci L. Hansue, Ryan Chuang, Stephen Swan, and Apex. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/14/2013.(klyon, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying 146 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/30/2013.(trlee, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 89 Motion for an Order Directing DOC to Provide Mr. Carbajal Certified Account Statements and a Money Order to Pay the Filing Fee as Ordered. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/27/13. (kfinn, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER; Defendants' Chung and Swan 96 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. Defendants Chung and Swan shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response 86 to their Motion to Dismiss 7 on or before 2/15/2013; It is further ORDERED that the Motion for Extension 96 is GRANTED. Denver Defendants shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response 86 to their pending Motion to Dismiss 73 on or before 2/15/2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/6/2013.(klmcd, )
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER. Motion to Strike 92 is DENIED. Motion for Extension 93 is GRANTED in part. The St. Anthony Defendants shall file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response 86 on or before 2/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/1/13. (kfinn, )
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. The obligations stated in the Order to Show Cause issued 12/3/2012 # 63 are DISCHARGED. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2012. (klyon, )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint; the Clerk shall accept Plaintiff's Amended Prisoner Complaint [57-1] for filing as of the date of this Order; Defendants who have already been served and entered their appear ances in this case shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Prisoner Complaint [57-1] on or before 12/19/2012; the Clerk shall attempt to obtain a waiver of service from Defendant Apex; denying as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/28/12. (kfinn, )
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Assigning Case, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/18/12. (nmmsl, )
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/3/12 DENYING as premature 14 Motion for Leave to Serve by U.S. Marshals Service. (nmmsl, )
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 9 Motion to Compel and For Leave to Proceed with Service by US Marshal, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/20/12.(nmmsl, )
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/24/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carbajal v. St. Anthony Central Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anthony Central Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan M. Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan (I) M. Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Englund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory (I) J. Englund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci L. Hansue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci (I) L. Hansue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Niell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) O'Niell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay (I) Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry (I) Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven (I) Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto (I) Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?