Afola v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Lagalia A. Afola and Lagalia (I) A. Afola
Defendant: Steve (I) L. Brown, Sr., Corrections Corporation of America, Brigham Sloan, Brigham (I) Sloan, David Oba, David (I) Oba, Mandy Marquez, Mandy (I) Marquez, Mary Bueno-Sandoval, Mary (I) Bueno-Sandovol, Troy Abdulla, Troy (I) Abdulla, Trujillo, Trujillo (I), Marty Leyba, Mary (I) Layba, Angie Turner, Angie (I) Turner, Steve L. Brown, Sr., Robert (I) Fowler, Leon Kelly, Leon (I) Kelly, Robert Fowler and Gregory Kirkland
Case Number: 1:2012cv02394
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Corrections Corporation of American With Prejudice. All parties to pay their own costs and fees by Judge John L. Kane on 07/07/14. (jhawk, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Dismissing with Prejudice Defendant Gregory Kirkland. The joint stipulated motion to dismiss all claims against Defendant Gregory Kirkland, Doc. 109 , is granted. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/2/2014.(klyon, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendants Warden Brigham Sloan, David Oba, M.D., Mandy Marquez, R.N., Mary Bueno-Sandoval, LPN, Captain Troy Abudlla, Corrections Officer Trujillo, Sergeant Mary Leyba, Angie Turner, RN, HSA, and Steve L. Brown, Sr. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or her own attorney fees and costs by Judge John L. Kane on 06/30/14.(jhawk, )
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off and Dispositive Motions Deadlines Discovery due by 6/20/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/18/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 06/02/14.(jhawk, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Concerning Bent County Correctional Facility Medical Logbook by Judge John L. Kane on 03/31/14. (jhawk, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion for In Camera Review. Defendant shall hand deliver the Bent County Correctional Facility medical logbook, CCA-Griswold 15205- 15233, in unredacted form, to the Clerk, United States District Court, District of Colorado located at: 901 19th Street, # A-105, Denver, CO 80294-3589, whereupon I will conduct an in camera review of its contents. The delivery shall be made on or before April 1, 2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 03/18/14.(jhawk, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to Conduct Depositions of Incarcerated Persons by Judge John L. Kane on 02/05/14.(jhawk, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Keon Kelly, MD With Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees by Judge John L. Kane on 01/09/14.(jjhsl, )
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 73 Motion to Compel by Judge John L. Kane on 10/21/13.(jjhsl, )
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Assistant Attorney General Kathryn A. Starnella is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Gregory Kirkland by Judge John L. Kane on 10/17/13.(jjhsl, )
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge John L. Kane on 08/19/13. (jjhsl, )
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Plaintiffs' request for attorney fees by Judge John L. Kane on 06/10/13.(jjhsl, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Client Representative to Appear at Settlement Conference by Telephone 40 and Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiff Afola to Attend Settlement Conference by Phone 43 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/15/13.(sgrim)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Instructions for Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) by Magistrate Judge Mix. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom C204, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/30/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afola v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve (I) L. Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham (I) Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Oba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David (I) Oba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy (I) Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Bueno-Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary (I) Bueno-Sandovol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Abdulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy (I) Abdulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trujillo (I)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Leyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary (I) Layba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie (I) Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve L. Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon (I) Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lagalia A. Afola
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lagalia (I) A. Afola
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?