Yellin v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Linda Kay Yellin
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv02789
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Amend the Courts March 31, 2014 Order granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Application for Attorneys Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, filed March 26, 2014 ECF No. 27 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/3/2014.(evana, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Plaintiffs Unopposed Application for Attorneys Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/31/2014.(evana, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk Pursuant to and in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a) and re: 22 Order Reversing Administrative Law Judges Decision and Remanding to the Commissioner, entered by the Honorable William J. Martnez, United States Distric t Judge, on January 2, 2014, IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioners decision is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for rehearing. Plaintiff is AWARDED her costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 1/6/2014. (ervsl, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Reversing Administrative Law Judge's Decision and Remanding to the Commissioner by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/02/14. (jjhsl, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 2/26/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 3/28/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/12/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/17/13. (sgrim)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/26/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellin v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kay Yellin
Represented By: Ruth K. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?