Allen v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Julie Allen
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03086
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the case is reopened for the limited purpose of ruling on the instant motion and shall then be closed. The Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees 25 is GRANTED. The Plaintiff's counsel is awarded attorney fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $36,700. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/26/15.(msksec, )
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Julie Allen against Michael J. Astrue re: 21 Order, by Clerk on 12/19/2013. (klyon, )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Opinion and ORDER. The Court REVERSES the Commissioner's Decision to denybenefits. The Court REMANDS the matter for an immediate award of benefits. Upon application made within 14 days, Ms. Allen shall be entitled to an award of reasonable attorney fees pursuant to the EAJA The Clerk shall enter a Judgment in accordance herewith. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/18/2013. (klyon, )
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/13/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/12/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/27/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/27/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Allen
Represented By: Stephanie J. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?