Alarid v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Robert A. Alarid
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv03308
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 17 Order. By Clerk on 12/5/13. (mnfsl, )
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER. The Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Any request for attorney fees shall be made within 14 days. The Clerk shall enter a Judgment in accordance herewith. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/4/13. (mnfsl, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 7/8/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 8/7/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 8/22/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 5/29/13. (mnfsl, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 1/7/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alarid v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Alarid
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?