Harper v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Geoffrey C. Harper
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge John L. Kane on 07/07/15.(jhawk, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Order to Approve Stipulation of Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Ordered that the Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $4882.50. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/3/13.(mnfsl, )
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 22 Order on Motion to Remand to Agency on 7/18/13. (lygsl, )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/16/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/17/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/2/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/26/13. (sgrim)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Order Regarding Instructions for Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases by Judge John L. Kane on 1/7/13. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey C. Harper
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?