San Juan Citizens Alliance v. United States Department of Interior et al

Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of The Interior
Intervenor_defendant: Western Energy Alliance
Case Number: 1:2013cv02466
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of The Interior against San Juan Citizens Alliance re: 52 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, entered on 09/30/2014. (athom, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 41 filed February 20, 2014, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The objections 43 of Western Energy Alliance are OVERRULED. The Motion To Intervene by Western Energy Alliance 11 filed October 7, 2013, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/29/2014. (trlee, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/16/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 5/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 5/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/5/14. (rebsec,)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/12/13. (sgrim)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: I recuse myself from further service in this action. The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another magistrate judge. The scheduling conference and motion hearing set for this afternoon at 1:30 p.m.,is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/2013. (klyon, )
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support ofMotion to Intervene by Western Energy Alliance. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene by Western Energy Alliance. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/21/2013.(klyon, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 11/22/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Juan Citizens Alliance v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of The Interior
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Megan McCrea Anderson O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?