March 31, 2015 |
Filing
118
FINAL JUDGMENT Pursuant to the 117 ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS of Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel entered on March 31, 2015 it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff DANIELE CHAFIN recovers nothing, the action is dismissed on the merits, and Defendant NICHOLAS STASI; KELLI JAYCOX; MICHAEL KELLY, and THE CITY OF DURANGO is AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1., by Clerk on 3/31/2015. (evana, )
|
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
116
MINUTE ORDER granting 115 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of 18 Pages. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/12/2014.(alowe)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Oral Argument on Outstanding Objections to Order to Stay Discovery ECF No. 91 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Order on Motion to Stay Discovery ECF No. 87 a re OVERRULED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Date to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment with Affidavit ECF No. 82 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. I will grant Plaintiff an extension of time to respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, but deny his motion to the extent it requests an extension to take discovery. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants motion by Friday, September 26, 2014, that conforms with Section III.B of my Practice Standards. In light of this, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Extend Date to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 75 is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/16/2014.(evana, )
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing
98
MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 95 and Statement of Material Facts ECF No. 96 , filed erroneously in CM/ECF as a motion for summary judgment) are STRICKEN with leave to refile. Per Section III.B of my Practice Standards, the Movants Statement of Material Facts must be included in the summary judgment motion. It may not be filed in a separate document. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Up to 20 Pages ECF No. 94 is GRANTED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/3/2014.(evana, )
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing
86
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 83 Motion for Leave, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/3/2014.(trlee, )
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Stay Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/25/2014. (cpear)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing
77
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2014, taking under advisement 59 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Defendants may file a written reply in support of their motion by close of business on 6/19/2014. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
68
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Plaintiffs Motion for Conference #5 on Discovery Disputes. The Court construes the motion as a request for a hearing on Defendants pending motion to stay and will grant such request. According ly, counsel for the parties are directed to appear before the Court for a hearing regarding Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery docket # 59 on Tuesday, June 17, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A501 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/2/2014.(evana, )
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
63
MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #4 on Discovery Disputes, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2014. (cpear)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
54
MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #3 on Discovery Disputes. Discovery Hearing set for 5/21/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/20/2014. (cpear)
|
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
49
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference #2 on Discovery Disputes. Counsel for the partiess shall appear before the Court for a conference regarding the matter on 5/6/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/25/2014. (cpear)
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
45
MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot 28 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), In light of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint on March 7, 2014 ECF No. 44 , by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/10/2014.(evana, )
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
43
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/6/2014. Counsel to file a joint motion with the Court in La Plata County requesting the documents from Plaintiff 's sealed criminal file. 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the [37-1] Second Amended Complaint as of this date. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
41
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 39 Plaintiff's Notice of "Exhibits to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint." This was erroneously filed as a motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2014. (mehcd)
|
February 11, 2014 |
Filing
36
MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Conference on Discovery Dispute. Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 3/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2014. (mehcd)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing
30
Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/30/14. (jhawk, )
|