Gonzales et al v. City of Trinidad, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Gonzales, Felicia Valdez and Danika Gonzales
Defendant: City of Trinidad, Colorado, Arsenio Vigil, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin and Arsenio (I) Vigil
Interested Party: The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District
Case Number: 1:2015cv00049
Filed: January 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Las Animas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re: #47 the Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant City of Trinidad. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant City of Trinidad ECF No. #47 is APPROVED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted against the City of Trinidad are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/2016. (evana, )
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting #46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Dismissal of Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil With Prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or her own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/2016.(evana, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party - Defendant City of Trinidad by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Collignon, Casie)
October 20, 2016 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party -Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Collignon, Casie)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER The minute order issued on July 6, 2015 ECF No. #44 is VACATED. The Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case ECF No. #43 is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 with leave to be reopened upon a showing of good cause, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/7/2015. (evana, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 VACATED MINUTE ORDER Denying #43 The Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the parties failure to provide a basis for the requested relief. However, should the parties choose to refile the motion with appropriate support, I will consider the request for an administrative closure under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/6/2015.(evana, ) (Modified on 7/7/2015 Vacated pursuant to the #45 Minute Order)(evana, ).
July 1, 2015 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Collignon, Casie)
June 25, 2015 Filing 42 MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 6/25/2015. (mdave, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena to the State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez (Collignon, Casie)
June 19, 2015 Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 6/19/2015. Settlement negotiations were held on 6/18/2015-6/19/2015, and no settlement has been reached as to any claims in this action. (mdave, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion for a One Week Extension of Time to Respond to the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District's Original and Supplemental Motions to Quash by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/17/2015. Plaintiffs may file their response[s] to the Original and Supplemental Motions to Quash on or before 6/26/2015.(mdave, )
June 17, 2015 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM regarding #37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 Supplemental MOTION to Quash Partially Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed To the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District, or alternatively, For the Entry of a Protec filed by Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/17/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
June 17, 2015 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 Supplemental MOTION to Quash Partially Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed To the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District, or alternatively, For the Entry of a Protective Order, #32 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District or Alternatively, for Entry of a Protective Order (One Week Extension Requested) by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Schacht, Nathan)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding #35 Supplemental MOTION to Quash Partially Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed To the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District, or alternatively, For the Entry of a Protective Order filed by The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/15/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
June 15, 2015 Filing 35 Supplemental MOTION to Quash Partially Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed To the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District, or alternatively, For the Entry of a Protective Order by Interested Party The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Sueanna)
June 6, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Defendants City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio Vigil, Arsenio (I) Vigil (Poppe, Nicholas)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District or Alternatively, for Entry of a Protective Order filed by The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/29/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
May 29, 2015 Filing 32 First MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to the Probation Department for the Third Judicial District or Alternatively, for Entry of a Protective Order by Interested Party The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B)(Johnson, Sueanna)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/4/2015. (evana, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 30 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio Vigil, Arsenio (I) Vigil. (Kloster, Marni) Modified text and linkage on 3/20/2015 (athom, ).
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDERby Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/11/2015. Discovery due by 9/11/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2015. (mdave )
March 11, 2015 Filing 28 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2015, Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2015. (mdave )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/4/2015.(mdave)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez and filed by Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio (I) Vigil, Arsenio Vigil, City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/4/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
March 4, 2015 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez and by Defendants City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio Vigil, Arsenio (I) Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Kloster, Marni)
March 4, 2015 Filing 23 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Schacht, Nathan)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/3/2015.(mdave )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio (I) Vigil, Arsenio Vigil, City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
March 3, 2015 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio Vigil, Arsenio (I) Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Poppe, Nicholas)
March 3, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Andrew Nathan on behalf of All Defendants Attorney J. Andrew Nathan added to party City of Trinidad, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney J. Andrew Nathan added to party Phil Martin(pty:dft), Attorney J. Andrew Nathan added to party Phil (I) Martin(pty:dft), Attorney J. Andrew Nathan added to party Arsenio Vigil(pty:dft), Attorney J. Andrew Nathan added to party Arsenio (I) Vigil(pty:dft) (Nathan, J.)
March 3, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Christaan Poppe on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party City of Trinidad, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Phil Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Phil (I) Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Arsenio Vigil(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Arsenio (I) Vigil(pty:dft) (Poppe, Nicholas)
February 26, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party City of Trinidad, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party Phil Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party Phil (I) Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party Arsenio Vigil(pty:dft), Attorney Marni Nathan Kloster added to party Arsenio (I) Vigil(pty:dft) by City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Phil (I) Martin, Arsenio Vigil, Arsenio (I) Vigil.(Kloster, Marni)
February 24, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jaclyn B. Freeman on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Jaclyn B. Freeman added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Jaclyn B. Freeman added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Freeman, Jaclyn)
January 15, 2015 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - City, #2 Waiver of Service - Martin, #3 Waiver of Service - Vigil)(Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/13/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/12/15. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
January 12, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron J. Thompson on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Aaron J. Thompson added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron J. Thompson added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Thompson, Aaron)
January 9, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc David Flink on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Marc David Flink added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Marc David Flink added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Flink, Marc)
January 8, 2015 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Phil Martin. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: #1 Summons Arsenio Vigil, #2 Summons City of Trinidad, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
January 8, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Schacht on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Nathan Andrew Schacht added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Andrew Schacht added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Schacht, Nathan)
January 8, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Collignon, Casie)
January 8, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara R. Neel on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Sara R. Neel added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Neel, Sara)
January 8, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Wallace, Rebecca)
January 8, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Silverstein on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Mark Silverstein added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark)
January 8, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to City of Trinidad by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 8, 2015 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. The summons submitted is not on the court approved form, and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jofox )
January 8, 2015 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jofox )
January 8, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Arsenio Vigil (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4214710)Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Danika D. Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Felicia A. Valdez(pty:pla), filed by Danika D. Gonzales, Felicia A. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons City of Trinidad, #5 Summons Martin, #6 Summons Vigil)(Karlsgodt, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. City of Trinidad, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Valdez
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Jaclyn B. Freeman
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Schacht
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Aaron John Thompson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danika Gonzales
Represented By: Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace
Represented By: Sara R. Neel
Represented By: Jaclyn B. Freeman
Represented By: Mark Silverstein
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Schacht
Represented By: Marc David Flink
Represented By: Aaron John Thompson
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Trinidad, Colorado
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenio Vigil
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Martin
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil (I) Martin
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenio (I) Vigil
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District
Represented By: Sueanna Park Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?